Missouri Western District Court
Judge:Brian C Wimes
Case #: 4:21-cv-00229
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Apr 05, 2021
Last checked: Saturday Oct 02, 2021 6:56 AM CDT
Defendant
Secretary Denis McDonough
Secretary of Department of Veterans Affairs 810 Vermont Ave. NW
Washington DC, DC 20420
Represented By
Elizabeth D Hatting
United States Attorney'S Office-Kcmo
contact info
Plaintiff
James Ethan Machauf
2512 West 75th Place
Prairie Village, KS 64133
Represented By
Edward Andrew Stump
The Law Offices Of Edward A. Stump, Llc.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Wednesday, September 15, 2021
minutes Scheduling Conference Wed 09/15 11:48 AM
Minute Entry. Proceedings held before District Judge Brian C. Wimes: SCHEDULING TELECONFERENCE held on 9/15/2021. Counsel appearing for Plaintiff(s): Edward Stump. Counsel appearing for Defendant(s): Elizabeth Hatting. Time in court: 10:37 a.m. to 10:45 a.m. To order a transcript of this hearing please contact Denise Halasey, 816-512-5657, denise_halasey@mow.uscourts.gov. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Anderson, Christy)
Related: [-]
order Order Wed 09/15 2:41 PM
ORDER - Pursuant to the phone conference held on September 15, 2021, the Parties are to comply with all discovery requests within 30 days . If all discovery is not produced in said time, the Parties may file a motion to compel. Signed on 9/15/21 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Anderson, Christy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 19, 2021
15 15 order Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases Thu 08/19 4:31 PM
ORDERED the motion to consolidate (Doc. #8) is, in light of the consolidation order (Doc. #22)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 05, 2021
14 14 notice Notice of Filing Tue 08/17 3:49 PM
NOTICE OF CONSOLIDATION. DO NOT FILE IN THIS CASE. All future filing will be done in the lead case 4:20-cv-00218-BCW . (Kern, Kendra)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 29, 2021
13 13 notice Notice of Hearing Thu 07/29 3:05 PM
AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING - This is the official notice for this hearing. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. Scheduling Teleconference is reset to 9/15/2021 10:30 AM before District Judge Brian C. Wimes. (Anderson, Christy)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 21, 2021
notice Notice of Filing Wed 07/21 1:13 AM
NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your post-mediation status report is due within 10 calendar days after the mediation. See MAP FAQs on Court's website for specifics and submit report(s) to: map@mow.uscourts.gov. (ADI, MAP)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 15, 2021
12 12 discov Certificate of service of initial Rule 26 disclosures Thu 07/15 11:24 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Edward Andrew Stump on behalf of Plaintiff James Ethan Machauf.(Stump, Edward)
Related: [-]
11 11 discov Certificate of service of initial Rule 26 disclosures Thu 07/15 4:22 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Elizabeth D Hatting on behalf of Defendant Denis McDonough.(Hatting, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
10 10 adr Designation of Mediator Thu 07/15 2:53 PM
DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming John Phillips(Hatting, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 14, 2021
notice Notice of Filing Wed 07/14 1:02 AM
NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 13, 2021
9 9 order Rule 16 Notice Tue 07/13 2:33 PM
RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 8/25/2021. Rule 26 conference due by 8/11/2021. Scheduling Conference set for 9/7/2021 11:00 AM before District Judge Brian C. Wimes. Signed on 7/13/21 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. (Anderson, Christy)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 09, 2021
8 8 motion Consolidate Cases Fri 07/09 11:49 PM
Joint MOTION to consolidate cases filed by Edward Andrew Stump on behalf of James Ethan Machauf. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 7/23/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Stump, Edward)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 08, 2021
7 7 misc Proposed Scheduling Order Thu 07/08 4:07 PM
Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by all parties by James Ethan Machauf. (Stump, Edward)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Thu 07/08 4:05 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) planning meeting. (Stump, Edward)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 29, 2021
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 06/29 4:24 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,,,,,, on behalf of Denis McDonough.(Hatting, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 05, 2021
4 4 service Return of Service of Complaint Executed Wed 05/05 5:25 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by James Ethan Machauf. Denis Richard McDonough served on 4/29/2021, answer due 5/20/2021. (Stump, Edward)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 30, 2021
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 04/30 11:04 AM
NOTICE of appearance by Elizabeth D Hatting on behalf of Denis Richard McDonough (Attorney Elizabeth D Hatting added to party Denis Richard McDonough(pty:dft))(Hatting, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 28, 2021
service Summons Issued Wed 04/28 10:50 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Denis Richard McDonough, c/o U.S. Attorney's Office for Western District, KC, MO. (Woods, Gloria)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 05, 2021
2 2 notice Notice of MAPN Mon 04/05 10:40 AM
NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS. Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Woods, Gloria)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 MAP General Order
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 04/05 2:56 AM
COMPLAINT against Denis Richard McDonough filed by Edward Andrew Stump on behalf of James Ethan Machauf. Filing fee $402, receipt number AMOWDC-7362303. Service due by 7/6/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court.(Stump, Edward)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Federal Petition Exhibit #1 Right to File Complaint20210405_00193199,
Att: 2 Exhibit Federal Petition Exhibit #2 Formal Discrimination Complaint VA Form 4939 for James Machauf,
Att: 3 Exhibit Federal Petition Exhibit #3 Claims allowed by the EEO20210405_00205797,
Att: 4 Exhibit Federal Petition Exhibit #4 James Machauf Designation of Representative EEOC Case,
Att: 5 Exhibit Federal Petition Exhibit #5 Formal EEO Complaint by James Machauf from 2018 against the VA,
Att: 6 Exhibit Federal Petition Exhibit #6 File Stamped Petition for Service for Plaintiff James Machauf on Robert Wilkie,
Att: 7 Exhibit Federal Petition Exhibit #7 Claimants Rebuttal Statement to EEO20210405_00254903,
Att: 8 Exhibit Federal Petition Exhibit #8 April 26 Sick Leave Certification20210405_00334210,
Att: 9 Exhibit Federal Petition Exhibit #9 Reprimand James Machauf June 6th 2019,
Att: 10 Exhibit Federal Petition Exhibit #10 March 27th 2019 Proposed Reprimand,
Att: 11 Exhibit Federal Petition Exhibit #11 Response to March 27 Reprimand20210405_00412172,
Att: 12 Exhibit Federal Petition Exhibit #12 Direct Complaint by Kelly Foudray20210405_00470852,
Att: 13 Civil Cover Sheet Attachment to Federal Petition being the Civil Cover Sheet20210405_02510136