New York Southern District Court
Judge:John G Koeltl
Case #: 1:21-cv-02897
Nature of Suit422 Bankruptcy - Appeal 28 USC 158
Cause28:0158 Notice of Appeal re Bankruptcy Matter (BA
Case Filed:Apr 05, 2021
Terminated:Mar 23, 2022
Case in other court:USBC-SDNY, 21-B-10249 (MG)

Debtor
Navient Solutions, LLC

,
Last checked: Saturday Oct 02, 2021 8:32 AM EDT
ADR Provider
Law Offices of Michael B. Wolk, P.C.
Represented By
Michael Bryan Wolk
Law Offices Of Michael B. Wolk, P.C.
contact info
ADR Provider
Public Interest Capital, LLC
Represented By
Michael Bryan Wolk
Law Offices Of Michael B. Wolk, P.C.
contact info
ADR Provider
Michael B Wolk
Represented By
Michael Bryan Wolk
Law Offices Of Michael B. Wolk, P.C.
contact info
Appellant
Sarah Bannister
Represented By
Austin Connell Smith
Smith Law Group LLP
contact info
Appellant
Brandon Hood
Represented By
Austin Connell Smith
Smith Law Group LLP
contact info
Appellant
LaBarron Tate
Represented By
Austin Connell Smith
Smith Law Group LLP
contact info
Appellee
Navient Solutions, LLC
Represented By
Annelyse Gibbons
Kirkland & Ellis Llp (nyc)
contact info
Stephen Edward Hessler
Kirkland & Ellis Llp (nyc)
contact info
Chad John Husnick
Kirkland & Ellis Llp (il)
contact info
In Re
Navient Solutions, LLC


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Wednesday, June 07, 2023
37 37 appeal USCA Mandate Wed 06/07 10:58 AM
MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) as to36 Notice of Appeal, filed by LaBarron Tate, Brandon Hood, Sarah Bannister USCA Case Number 22-1376 UPON DUE CONSIDERATION, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that the judgment and order of the district court, entered March 23, 2022, and the order of the same court denying a motion for reconsideration, entered May 12, 2022, are AFFIRMED.. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Issued As Mandate: 06/07/2023..(nd)
Related: [-]
appeal Transmission of USCA Mandate/Order to District Judge Wed 06/07 11:01 AM
Transmission of USCA Mandate to the District Judge re:37 USCA Mandate,,..(nd)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 28, 2022
36 36 appeal Notice of Appeal Tue 06/28 11:06 AM
NOTICE OF APPEAL from31 Order, Set Deadlines,,34 Memorandum & Opinion,. Document filed by Sarah Bannister, Brandon Hood, LaBarron Tate. Form C and Form D are due within 14 days to the Court of Appeals, Second Circuit..(Smith, Austin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A (judgment and order affirming bankruptcy court dated March 23, 2022),
Att: 2 Exhibit B (order denying motion for rehearing dated May 12, 2022)
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Appeal Tue 06/28 10:48 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT APPEAL. Notice to attorney Austin Smith to RE-FILE Document No. 35 Notice of Appeal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the order/judgment being appealed was not selected. Re-file the appeal using the event type Notice of Appeal found under the event list Appeal Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - select the correct order/judgment being appealed - Do Not Pay the Appeal Fee Again. (tp)
Related: [-]
appeal Appeal Fee Paid via Pay.gov Tue 06/28 11:45 AM
Appeal Fee Paid electronically via Pay.gov: for36 Notice of Appeal. Filing fee $ 505.00. Pay.gov receipt number BNYSDC-26267413, paid on 6/10/2022. (tp)
Related: [-]
appeal Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA Tue 06/28 11:45 AM
Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re:36 Notice of Appeal. (tp)
Related: [-]
appeal Appeal Record Sent to USCA - Electronic File Tue 06/28 11:46 AM
Appeal Record Sent to USCA (Electronic File). Certified Indexed record on Appeal Electronic Files for36 Notice of Appeal, filed by LaBarron Tate, Brandon Hood, Sarah Bannister were transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (tp)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 10, 2022
35 35 appeal Notice of Appeal Fri 06/10 1:01 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL. Document filed by Sarah Bannister, Brandon Hood, LaBarron Tate. Filing fee $ 505.00, receipt number BNYSDC-26267413. Form C and Form D are due within 14 days to the Court of Appeals, Second Circuit..(Smith, Austin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Thursday, May 12, 2022
34 34 8 pgs order Memorandum & Opinion Thu 05/12 10:26 AM
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re:30 MOTION for Reconsideration . filed by LaBarron Tate, Brandon Hood, Sarah Bannister. The Court has considered all of the arguments of the parties. To the extent not addressed above, the arguments are either moot or without merit. For the foregoing reasons, the motion for reconsideration is denied. The Clerk is directed to close ECF No. 30. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 5/11/2022) (kv)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 02, 2022
33 33 respm Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Mon 05/02 6:41 PM
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:30 MOTION for Reconsideration . . Document filed by Sarah Bannister, Brandon Hood, LaBarron Tate..(Smith, Austin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 21, 2022
32 32 respm Response to Motion Thu 04/21 4:14 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re:30 MOTION for Reconsideration . Navient's Response to Appellant's Motion for Rehearing . Document filed by Navient Solutions, LLC..(Husnick, Chad)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 07, 2022
31 31 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Thu 04/07 6:50 PM
ORDER: The appellee should respond to the motion for reconsideration by April 21, 2022. The appellants may reply by May 2, 2022. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 4/7/2022) ( Appellant Reply Brief due by 5/2/2022., Appellee Brief due by 4/21/2022.) (ks)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 06, 2022
30 30 motion Reconsideration Wed 04/06 9:36 PM
MOTION for Reconsideration . Document filed by Sarah Bannister, Brandon Hood, LaBarron Tate..(Smith, Austin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 23, 2022
29 29 order Judgment - Clerk Wed 03/23 3:49 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT re:28 Memorandum & Opinion in favor of Navient Solutions, LLC against Brandon Hood, LaBarron Tate, Sarah Bannister. It is, ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED: That for the reasons stated in the Court's Memorandum Opinion and Order dated March 23, 2022, the Court has considered all of the arguments of the parties. To the extent not addressed herein, the arguments are either moot or without merit. The orders of the bankruptcy court are affirmed; accordingly, the case is closed. (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 3/23/2022) (km)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Right to Appeal
28 28 37 pgs order Memorandum & Opinion Wed 03/23 12:02 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re: denying4 MOTION to Withdraw Reference for a Mandatory Withdrawal of a Proceeding to the District Court under 28 U.S.C. 157(d) and for a temporary, status quo, stay under FRBP 5011(c) and/or FRBP 8007(e) and/or the inherent power of an Article III District filed by Michael B Wolk, Law Offices of Michael B. Wolk, P.C., Public Interest Capital, LLC. For these reasons, the motion to withdraw the reference to the bankruptcy judge is denied. The Court has considered all of the arguments of the parties. To the extent not addressed herein, the arguments are either moot or without merit. For the foregoing reasons, the orders of the bankruptcy court are affirmed. The Clerk is directed to close all pending motions and to close this case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 3/23/2022) (tg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 10, 2022
27 27 19 pgs appeal Appellants Reply Brief Thu 02/10 6:36 PM
Appellant's REPLY BRIEF. Document filed by Sarah Bannister, Brandon Hood, LaBarron Tate..(Smith, Austin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 26, 2022
26 26 78 pgs appeal Appellees Brief Wed 01/26 4:50 PM
Appellee's BRIEF. Document filed by Navient Solutions, LLC. Appellant Reply Brief due by 2/9/2022..(Husnick, Chad)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 04, 2022
25 25 36 pgs appeal Appellants Brief Tue 01/04 8:34 PM
Appellant's BRIEF. Document filed by Sarah Bannister, Brandon Hood, LaBarron Tate. Appellee Brief due by 2/3/2022..(Smith, Austin)
Related: [-]
24 24 appeal Designation of Bankruptcy Record on Appeal Tue 01/04 8:30 PM
APPENDIX DESIGNATION OF BANKRUPTCY RECORD ON APPEAL Document filed by Appellants Sarah Bannister, Brandon Hood, LaBarron Tate..(Smith, Austin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 JA 240-269,
Att: 2 JA 270-299,
Att: 3 JA 300-315,
Att: 4 JA 315-359,
Att: 5 JA 360-395,
Att: 6 JA 396-1283
23 23 appeal Appellants Brief Tue 01/04 7:36 PM
Appellant's BRIEF. Document filed by Sarah Bannister, Brandon Hood, LaBarron Tate. Appellee Brief due by 2/3/2022..(Smith, Austin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 07, 2021
22 22 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Tue 12/07 11:27 AM
ORDER: A bankruptcy appeal in this action has been filed with the Court. It is hereby ordered that: 1. The appellant shall file and serve a brief with any supporting papers by January 4, 2022; 2. Response(s) to the appellant's brief shall be filed and served by January 26, 2022; 3. Replies to the response(s) shall be filed and served by February 10, 2022. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 12/6/2021) ( Appellant Brief due by 1/4/2022., Reply to Response to Brief due by 2/10/2022., Responses to Brief due by 1/26/2022) (ks)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 18, 2021
21 21 motion Leave to Appeal Wed 05/19 12:00 AM
MOTION for Leave to Appeal Document filed by Sarah Bannister..(Smith, Austin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 27, 2021
20 20 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Tue 04/27 5:58 PM
ORDER granting18 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. APPLICATION GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 4/27/2021) (ks)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 26, 2021
19 19 respm Response in Support of Motion Mon 04/26 7:37 AM
LETTER RESPONSE in Support of Motion addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Michael B. Wolk, Esq. dated April 26, 2021 re:18 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time for a Coterminous Extension pursuant to the Court's Scheduling Order issued two days ago [Dkt. 14] in a related matter addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Michael B. Wolk, Esq. dated April 23, 2021 . Document filed by Public Interest Capital, LLC..(Wolk, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 23, 2021
18 18 motion Extension of Time Fri 04/23 9:54 AM
FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time for a Coterminous Extension pursuant to the Court's Scheduling Order issued two days ago [Dkt. 14] in a related matter addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Michael B. Wolk, Esq. dated April 23, 2021. Document filed by Public Interest Capital, LLC..(Wolk, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 21, 2021
17 17 service Certificate of Service Other Wed 04/21 7:03 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Document filed by Navient Solutions, LLC..(Husnick, Chad)
Related: [-]
16 16 respoth Declaration in Support (non-motion) Wed 04/21 6:32 PM
DECLARATION of Chad J. Husnick in Support re:15 Objection (non-motion),,. Document filed by Navient Solutions, LLC..(Husnick, Chad)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
15 15 respoth Objection (non-motion) Wed 04/21 6:29 PM
Objection re:4 MOTION to Withdraw Reference for a Mandatory Withdrawal of a Proceeding to the District Court under 28 U.S.C. 157(d) and for a temporary, status quo, stay under FRBP 5011(c) and/or FRBP 8007(e) and/or the inherent power of an Article III District / Navient Solutions, LLC's Objection to Motion to Withdraw Reference for a Mandatory Withdrawal of a Proceeding to the District Court Under 28 U.S.C. § 157(D) . Document filed by Navient Solutions, LLC..(Husnick, Chad)
Related: [-]
13 13 respm Response to Motion Wed 04/21 10:13 AM
LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Chad J. Husnick dated April 21, 2021 re:12 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Austin C. Smith dated 4/19/2021. . Document filed by Navient Solutions, LLC..(Husnick, Chad)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 20, 2021
14 14 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Wed 04/21 11:05 AM
ORDER granting12 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. APPLICATION GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 4/20/2021) (ks)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 19, 2021
12 12 motion Extension of Time Mon 04/19 11:32 PM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Austin C. Smith dated 4/19/2021. Document filed by Sarah Bannister, Brandon Hood, LaBarron Tate..(Smith, Austin)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Certificate of Service Other Mon 04/19 6:01 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Document filed by Navient Solutions, LLC..(Husnick, Chad)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 16, 2021
10 10 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Fri 04/16 5:12 PM
ORDER denying5 Motion to Stay re:5 EMERGENCY LETTER MOTION to Stay re:4 MOTION to Withdraw Reference for a Mandatory Withdrawal of a Proceeding to the District Court under 28 U.S.C. 157(d) and for a temporary, status quo, stay under FRBP 5011(c) and/or FRBP 8007(e) and/or t. For the reasons explained on the record at today's teleconference, the application for an emergency stay in ECF No. 5 is denied. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 4/16/2021) (ks)
Related: [-]
9 9 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 04/16 11:45 AM
LETTER REPLY to Response to Motion addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Michael B. Wolk, Esq. dated April 16, 2021 re:4 MOTION to Withdraw Reference for a Mandatory Withdrawal of a Proceeding to the District Court under 28 U.S.C. 157(d) and for a temporary, status quo, stay under FRBP 5011(c) and/or FRBP 8007(e) and/or the inherent power of an Article III District, 5 EMERGENCY LETTER MOTION to Stay re: 4 MOTION to Withdraw Reference for a Mandatory Withdrawal of a Proceeding to the District Court under 28 U.S.C. 157(d) and for a temporary, status quo, stay under FRBP 5011(c) and/or FRBP 8007(e) and/or t . Document filed by Public Interest Capital, LLC..(Wolk, Michael)
Related: [-]
8 8 respm Response to Motion Fri 04/16 8:27 AM
LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Chad J. Husnick dated April 16, 2021 re:5 EMERGENCY LETTER MOTION to Stay re:4 MOTION to Withdraw Reference for a Mandatory Withdrawal of a Proceeding to the District Court under 28 U.S.C. 157(d) and for a temporary, status quo, stay under FRBP 5011(c) and/or FRBP 8007(e) and/or t . Document filed by Navient Solutions, LLC..(Husnick, Chad)
Related: [-]
minutes Oral Argument Tue 04/20 3:41 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John G. Koeltl: Oral Argument held on 4/16/2021 re:5 EMERGENCY LETTER MOTION to Stay re:4 MOTION to Withdraw Reference, for a Mandatory Withdrawal of a Proceeding to the District Court under 28 U.S.C. 157(d) and for a temporary, status quo, stay under FRBP 5011(c) and/or FRBP 8007(e) and/or t. Filed by Public Interest Capital, LLC. (Fletcher, Donnie)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 15, 2021
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 04/15 7:24 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Chad John Husnick on behalf of Navient Solutions, LLC..(Husnick, Chad)
Related: [-]
6 6 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Thu 04/15 4:42 PM
ORDER: The parties are directed to appear for a teleconference on Friday, April 16, 2021 at 3:30 p.m. by dialing 888-363-4749, code 8140049. Navient Solutions, LLC is directed to submit a response to the motion for an emergency stay by 9:00 a.m. on April 16, 2021. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 4/15/2021) ( Responses due by 4/16/2021, Telephone Conference set for 4/16/2021 at 03:30 PM before Judge John G. Koeltl.) (ks)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Stay Thu 04/15 10:05 AM
EMERGENCY LETTER MOTION to Stay re:4 MOTION to Withdraw Reference for a Mandatory Withdrawal of a Proceeding to the District Court under 28 U.S.C. 157(d) and for a temporary, status quo, stay under FRBP 5011(c) and/or FRBP 8007(e) and/or the inherent power of an Article III District, 1 Bankruptcy Appeal, addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Michael B. Wolk, Esq. dated April 15, 2021. Document filed by Public Interest Capital, LLC..(Wolk, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 14, 2021
4 4 motion Withdraw Reference Wed 04/14 4:36 PM
MOTION to Withdraw Reference for a Mandatory Withdrawal of a Proceeding to the District Court under 28 U.S.C. 157(d) and for a temporary, status quo, stay under FRBP 5011(c) and/or FRBP 8007(e) and/or the inherent power of an Article III District Court . Document filed by Public Interest Capital, LLC, Law Offices of Michael B. Wolk, P.C., Michael B Wolk..(Wolk, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for a Mandatory Withdrawal of a Proceeding to the District Court under 28 U.S.C. 157(d) and for a temporary, status quo, stay under FRBP 5011(c) and/or FRBP 80907(e) and/or the inherent power of an Article III District Court,
Att: 2 Affidavit Attorney Document Declaration of Michael B. Wolk in Support of Motion,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit A,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit B,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit C,
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit D,
Att: 7 Exhibit Exhibit E,
Att: 8 Exhibit Exhibit F,
Att: 9 Exhibit Exhibit G
Thursday, April 08, 2021
utility Case Declined as Not Related Thu 04/08 9:18 AM
CASE DECLINED AS NOT RELATED. Case referred as related to 20cv4458 and declined by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil and returned to wheel for assignment. (wb)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment Thu 04/08 9:20 AM
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge John G. Koeltl. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(wb)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Thu 04/08 9:20 AM
Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (wb)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 05, 2021
3 3 misc Statement of Relatedness Mon 04/05 5:44 PM
STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 20-cv-4458. Document filed by Sarah Bannister, Brandon Hood, LaBarron Tate.(bkar)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Mon 04/05 5:38 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (bkar)
Related: [-]
1 1 appeal Bankruptcy Appeal Mon 04/05 5:35 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL FROM THE BANKRUPTCY COURT TO THE S.D.N.Y. from the Order of Judge Martin Glenn dated March 12, 2021. Bankruptcy Court Case Numbers: 21-B-10249 (MG). Certified copies of file received.Document filed by LaBarron Tate, Brandon Hood, Sarah Bannister.(bkar)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D
utility Bankruptcy Appeal Referred as Possibly Related/Similar - Atty Mon 04/05 5:42 PM
BANKRUPTCY APPEAL CASE REFERRED BY ATTORNEY TO Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil as possibly related to 20-cv-4458. (bkar)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Mon 04/05 5:44 PM
Case Designated ECF. (bkar)
Related: [-]