New Jersey District Court
Judge:Robert Kirsch
Referred: Tonianne J Bongiovanni
Case #: 3:21-cv-08429
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Apr 06, 2021
Re-opened:Feb 24, 2022
Terminated:Aug 13, 2021
Last checked: Sunday Oct 03, 2021 5:47 AM EDT
Defendant
JOHN DOE #1
Defendant
JOHN DOE #2
Plaintiff
ASMAR ABDULLAH
Represented By
ROBERT GARRETT SELLERS
Law Office Of Robert G. Sellers
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
50 50 7 pgs order Order Wed 04/09 2:21 PM
ORDER Directing the Facility to produce records within 14 days of the entrance of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 4/7/2025. (amv)
Related: [-]