CONLEY v 3M COMPANY et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885
Florida Northern District Court | |
Judge: | M Casey Rodgers |
Referred: | Gary R Jones |
Case #: | 3:21-cv-00585 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Apr 06, 2021 |
Case in other court: | Minnesota, 0:21-cv-00828 |
Last checked: Sunday Oct 03, 2021 5:09 AM EDT |
Defendant
3M COMPANY
|
|
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
|
|
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
|
|
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
|
|
Defendant
AEARO LLC
|
|
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
JEREMY RAY CONLEY
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 57 minutes ago |
Friday, April 23, 2021 | ||
12 | 12
![]() SHORT FORM AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by JEREMY RAY CONLEY. (ECKLAND, JEFF) |
|
11 | 11
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by VINCE C REUTER on behalf of JEREMY RAY CONLEY (REUTER, VINCE) |
|
10 | 10
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by JARED M REAMS on behalf of JEREMY RAY CONLEY (REAMS, JARED) |
|
9 | 9
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by JEFF H ECKLAND on behalf of JEREMY RAY CONLEY (ECKLAND, JEFF) |
|
Tuesday, April 06, 2021 | ||
8 | 8
![]() PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 17 ORDER GOVERNING ADOPTION OF MASTER COMPLAINT AND SHORT FORM COMPLAINT FOR FILED CASES. Any Plaintiff whose case becomes part of this MDL after the date of this Order, either by a direct filing and assignment to this Court (if permitted by subsequent order of the Court) or by transfer from another district or from another judge in this district, must file a Short Form Complaint within 20 days from the date of transfer or, if originally filed in this district, assignment to this Court. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/16/2019. (Amended (Short Form) Complaint due by 4/26/2021 .) (djb) |
|
7 | 7
![]() Case transferred in from District of Minnesota; Case Number 0:21-cv-00828. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
6 | 6
misc
Docket Annotation
Tue 04/06 11:21 AM
(Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE: This case has been transferred/extracted to the Northern District of Florida. (MMP) |
|
5 | 5
![]() CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-103) transferring case to the Northern District of Florida per the MDL Panel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to the Honorable M. Casey Rodgers.(MMP) Modified text on 4/6/2021 (MMP) |
|
Friday, March 26, 2021 | ||
4 | 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Chief Judge John R. Tunheim per MDL list, referred to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Please use case number 21-cv-828 (JRT/KMM). (MMP) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/6/2021.] | |
3 | 3
![]() |
|
2 | 2
![]() |
|
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |