Ramsbottom et al v. Ashton et al
Tennessee Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Aleta A Trauger |
Referred: | Jeffery S Frensley |
Case #: | 3:21-cv-00272 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 18:1595 Civil Remedy |
Case Filed: | Apr 05, 2021 |
Last checked: Saturday Oct 02, 2021 4:36 AM CDT |
Defendant
Amorphous Music, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Lorin Ashton
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Bassnectar Touring, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
C3 Presents, L.L.C.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Redlight Management, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
ABC Corporations, One through Ten
|
|
Defendant
Carlos Donohue
3337 NE 79 th Ave.,
Portland, OR 97213 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
John Does, One through Ten
|
|
Plaintiff
Alexis Bowling
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rachel Ramsbottom
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jenna Houston
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Interactive Giving Fund
Terminated: 08/09/2021
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Gnarlos Industries, L.L.C.
Terminated: 08/31/2021
3337 NE 79 th Ave.,
Portland, OR 97213 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jane Doe #1
Terminated: 07/20/2021
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/28/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
218 | 218
order
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 04/25 11:25 AM
ORDER granting217 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motion for Richard Jancasz to Appear Pro Hac Vice is granted. Signed by Lynda M. Hill, Clerk of Court, on 04/25/2024. (lh) |
|
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
misc
Annotation - Bar Status
Wed 04/24 10:35 AM
NY State Bar status verified as active for Richard J. Jancasz not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured . (kc) |
||
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
217 | 217
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 04/23 8:15 AM
MOTION for attorney Richard Jancasz to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-4063235) by Lorin Ashton.(Peal, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment COGS Richard Jancaz |