Ross et al v. Robinhood Financial, LLC et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:21-md-02989
Lead case: 1:21-md-02989
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Cecilia M Altonaga |
Case #: | 1:21-cv-21338 |
Nature of Suit | 850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange |
Cause | 15:0001 Antitrust Litigation |
Case Filed: | Apr 07, 2021 |
Terminated: | Apr 08, 2021 |
Case in other court: | Texas Southern, 4:21-cv-00292 |
Last checked: Monday Oct 04, 2021 6:01 AM EDT |
Defendant
Stash Financial, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Maplelane Capital, LLC
51 Astor Place, 10th Floor
New York, NY 10022 |
|
Defendant
Melvin Capital Management, LP
|
|
Defendant
Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC
Greenberg Traurig, P.A. 777 South Flagler Drive Suite 300 East
West Palm Beach, FL 33401 |
|
Defendant
Open to the Public Investing, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Point72 Asset Management, L.P.
72 Cummings Point Road
Stamford, CT 06902 |
|
Defendant
ROBINHOOD MARKETS INC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
ROBINHOOD SECURITIES LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Robinhood Financial LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Sequoia Capital Operations LLC
|
|
Defendant
Square, LLC
|
|
Defendant
M1 Finance, LLC
|
|
Defendant
TD AMERITRADE INC.
200 S. 108th Avenue
Omaha, NE 68154 |
|
Defendant
TD Ameritrade Clearing, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
TD Ameritrade Holding Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Tastyworks, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
The Charles Schwab Corporation
|
|
Defendant
The Depository Trust & Clearing Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Trading 212 LTD.
|
|
Defendant
Trading 212 UK Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Webull Financial, LLC
|
|
Defendant
E*TRADE Financial Holdings, LLC
|
|
Defendant
APEX CLEARING CORPORATION
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ally Financial Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Alpaca Securities LLC
|
|
Defendant
Cash App Investing LLC
|
|
Defendant
Charles Schwab & Co. Inc.
211 Main Street
San Francisco, CA 94105 |
|
Defendant
Citadel Enterprise Americas, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Citadel Securities, LLC
|
|
Defendant
D1 Capital Partners, L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Dough LLC
|
|
Defendant
Interactive Brokers, LLC
|
|
Defendant
E*Trade Financial Corporation
|
|
Defendant
E*Trade Securities LLC
|
|
Defendant
FF Trade Republic Growth, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Free Freetrade, LTD.
|
|
Defendant
Fumi Holdings, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
IG Group Holdings PLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Ryan Zachary Ross
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
C. Louis Bunya
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Erika Mercado
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Drew Hunnicutt
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Barclays Bank P.L.C.
Terminated: 05/27/2021
|
|
Defendant
Etoro USA Securities, LLC
Terminated: 03/04/2021
|
Docket last updated: 05/28/2025 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, May 27, 2021 | ||
26 | 26
![]() ORDER that Defendant Barclays Bank PLC is dismissed from this action without prejudice re (318 in case 1:21-md-02989-CMA) Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 5/27/2021. Related Cases: 1:21-md-02989-CMA, 1:21-cv-21338-CMA. See attached document for full details. (mc) |
|
Thursday, April 08, 2021 | ||
25 | 25
![]() THIRD ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSE-OUT. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 4/8/2021. See attached document for full details. (mc) |
|
transfer
MDL Tag-Along/Transfer In Case Receipt
Thu 04/08 9:52 AM
MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from Southern District of Texas. Case Number 4:21-cv-00292 with documents 1-21. Assigned FLSD Case Number 1:21-cv-21338-CMA on 4/7/2021. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 1:21-md-02989-CMA. (mc) |
||
Wednesday, April 07, 2021 | ||
23 | 23 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. (pes) | |
22 | 22
![]() Case transferred in from Texas Southern; Case Number 4:21-cv-00292. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(pes) |
|
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Wed 04/07 1:59 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. (pes) |
||
Friday, April 02, 2021 | ||
21 | 21
![]() |
|
Interdistrict transfer to Southern District of Florida. Case transferred electronically. (lgouadi, 4) | ||
Wednesday, March 24, 2021 | ||
20 | 20
![]() |
|
19 | 19
![]() |
|
Tuesday, March 23, 2021 | ||
18 | 18
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
Att: 7
![]() |
||
Att: 8
![]() |
||
Att: 9
![]() |
||
Att: 10
![]() |
||
Att: 11
![]() |
||
Att: 12
![]() |
||
Att: 13
![]() |
||
Att: 14
![]() |
||
Att: 15
![]() |
||
Att: 16
![]() |
||
Att: 17
![]() |
||
Att: 18
![]() |
||
Att: 19
![]() |
||
Att: 20
![]() |
||
Att: 21
![]() |
||
Att: 22
![]() |
||
Att: 23
![]() |
||
Att: 24
![]() |
||
Att: 25
![]() |
||
Att: 26
![]() |
||
Att: 27
![]() |
||
Att: 28
![]() |
||
Att: 29
![]() |
||
Att: 30
![]() |
||
Att: 31
![]() |
||
Att: 32
![]() |
||
Att: 33
![]() |
||
Summons Not Issued as to Square, LLC due to these deficiencies: The defendant's name on the Summons form does not match the name on the docket sheet. Attorney or Plaintiff notified of deficiencies by NEF, filed.(JacquelineMata, 4) | ||
Monday, March 22, 2021 | ||
17 | 17
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
Att: 7
![]() |
||
Att: 8
![]() |
||
Att: 9
![]() |
||
Att: 10
![]() |
||
Att: 11
![]() |
||
Att: 12
![]() |
||
Att: 13
![]() |
||
Att: 14
![]() |
||
Att: 15
![]() |
||
Att: 16
![]() |
||
Att: 17
![]() |
||
Att: 18
![]() |
||
Att: 19
![]() |
||
Att: 20
![]() |
||
Att: 21
![]() |
||
Att: 22
![]() |
||
Att: 23
![]() |
||
Att: 24
![]() |
||
Att: 25
![]() |
||
Att: 26
![]() |
||
Att: 27
![]() |
||
Att: 28
![]() |
||
Att: 29
![]() |
||
Att: 30
![]() |
||
Att: 31
![]() |
||
Att: 32
![]() |
||
Att: 33
![]() |
||
Att: 34
![]() |
||
Tuesday, March 09, 2021 | ||
13 | 13
![]() |
|
Monday, March 08, 2021 | ||
16 | 16
![]() |
|
15 | 15
![]() |
|
14 | 14
![]() |
|
12 | 12
![]() |
|
11 | 11
![]() |
|
10 | 10
![]() |
|
9 | 9
![]() |
|
8 | 8
![]() |
|
Wednesday, March 03, 2021 | ||
7 | 7
![]() |
|
Tuesday, March 02, 2021 | ||
6 | 6
![]() |
|
Monday, February 22, 2021 | ||
5 | 5
![]() |
|
Thursday, February 11, 2021 | ||
4 | 4
![]() |
|
Tuesday, February 02, 2021 | ||
3 | 3
![]() |
|
Friday, January 29, 2021 | ||
2 | 2
![]() |
|
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |