Original Case: 1:18-cv-05292

Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:21-cv-00876
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Case Filed:Apr 06, 2021
Terminated:Oct 18, 2021
Last checked: Thursday Apr 08, 2021 6:15 AM EDT
Petitioner - Appellee
Isacco Jacky Saada
Represented By
Richard Min
Burger Green & Min LLP
contact info
Respondent - Appellant
Narkis Aliza Golan
Represented By
Daniel H. Levi
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
contact info
Karen King
Morvillo Abramowitz Grand Iason & Anello P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 02/13/2023 1:56 PM EST
Tuesday, April 06, 2021
1 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Narkis Aliza Golan, FILED. [3072204] [21-876] [Entered: 04/07/2021 08:14 AM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax
Att: 2 19 pgs Case FILED
2 2 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Narkis Aliza Golan, district court receipt # ANYEDC-14347191, FILED.[3072206] [21-876] [Entered: 04/07/2021 08:18 AM]
Related: [-]
3 3 16 pgs DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER, dated 03/29/2021, RECEIVED.[3072207] [21-876] [Entered: 04/07/2021 08:20 AM]
Related: [-]
4 4 1 pgs DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 04/06/2021, RECEIVED.[3072208] [21-876] [Entered: 04/07/2021 08:21 AM]
Related: [-]
5 5 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3072210] [21-876] [Entered: 04/07/2021 08:23 AM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed
Att: 2 19 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED
6 6 35 pgs MOTION, for emergency stay of the proceedings before the District Court, on behalf of Appellant Narkis Aliza Golan, FILED. Service date 04/06/2021 by 3rd party, email.[3072219] [21-876] [Entered: 04/07/2021 08:34 AM]
Related: [-]
8 8 2 pgs LETTER, dated 04/06/2021, on behalf of Appellant Narkis Aliza Golan, Pursuant to Local Rule 4.3, RECEIVED.[3072223] [21-876] [Entered: 04/07/2021 08:40 AM]
Related: [-]