Connecticut District Court
Judge:Jeffrey A Meyer
Case #: 3:21-cv-00489
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Apr 08, 2021
Terminated:Sep 17, 2021
Last checked: Tuesday Oct 05, 2021 4:32 AM EDT
Defendant
High Watch Recovery Center, Inc.
Represented By
Jody N. Cappello
Wssllp
contact info
Siddharth Sinha
Winget, Spadafora & Schwartzberg
contact info
Plaintiff
Julia Federle
Represented By
Paige Alexandra Munro-Delotto
Munro-Delotto Law LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, September 17, 2021
28 28 order Order Dismissing Case Fri 09/17 3:51 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. The parties have reported that this action has been settled in full. Rather than continue to keep the case open on the docket, the Clerk is directed to administratively close the file without prejudice to reopening on or before October 17, 2021 . If the parties wish to file a stipulation of dismissal (for approval by the court or simply for inclusion in the courts file), they may do so on or before October 17, 2021 . The dates set forth in this order may be extended for good cause pursuant to a motion filed in accordance with Local Rule 7. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 9/17/21.(Barry, Donna)
Related: [-]
27 27 minutes Settlement Conference Fri 09/17 2:57 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge S. Dave Vatti: Settlement Conference held on 9/16/2021. Total Time: 9 hours and 27 minutes. (Ellis, Bernadette)
Related: [-]
notice Judicial Evaluation Program Survey Fri 09/17 3:53 PM
JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Barry, Donna)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 02, 2021
26 26 2 pgs order Order Mon 08/02 1:36 PM
ORDER: A Settlement Conference is set for 9/16/21 at 9:30 a.m. Please see the attached Settlement Conference Order for detailed instructions and deadlines. Signed by Judge S. Dave Vatti on 8/2/21. (Ellis, Bernadette)
Related: [-]
25 25 minutes Settlement Conference Mon 08/02 12:48 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge S. Dave Vatti: Telephonic Pre-Settlement Conference held on 8/2/2021. Total time: 8 minutes. (Ellis, Bernadette)
Related: [-]
notice Notice Regarding Hearing Via Zoom Mon 08/02 2:12 PM
NOTICE regarding hearing via Zoom: The Settlement Conference scheduled for 9/16/21 at 9:30 a.m. will be conducted via Zoom. The video link is https://www.zoomgov.com/j/1610527719?pwd=ei9rbW9obU93b09TeXBLWk1XVTJOZz09 and call in number is +1 551 285 1373. Meeting ID: 161 052 7719 Meeting Password: 593130 Please note: Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, screenshots, streaming, and rebroadcasting in any form, of court proceedings. The Judicial Conference of the United States, which governs the practices of the federal courts, has prohibited it. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the court. (Ellis, Bernadette)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 22, 2021
24 24 notice Notice (Other) Thu 07/22 2:16 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL: A telephonic pre-settlement conference is set for 10:00 a.m. on Monday, August 2, 2021 , before Judge S. Dave Vatti. A date for the settlement conference will be set during the telephone call. As the Court will require parties or their representatives with settlement authority to attend the settlement conference, counsel should obtain dates of unavailability from their clients over the next sixty days and have their own calendars available to aid in scheduling. During the telephone call, counsel should be prepared to discuss what, if any, information needs to be exchanged and anything else that needs to be accomplished prior to the settlement conference for the discussion to be productive. If either counsel develops a firm, unavoidable conflict on August 2, 2021 at 10:00 a.m., s/he should not file a motion for continuance but rather should call Chambers as soon as possible with opposing counsel on the line to work out an alternate day and time for the pre-settlement telephone conference. Parties shall call 866-434-5269 and enter the following access code: 2006808 . (Ellis, Bernadette)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 21, 2021
23 23 notice Notice (Other) Wed 07/21 5:16 PM
NOTICE: Counsel for the parties shall confer and contact chambers of Judge S. Dave Vatti at 203-579-5593 within the next 3 business days, and propose dates/times for which all counsel are available for a telephonic pre-settlement conference during the week of August 2, 2021. (Ellis, Bernadette)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 20, 2021
22 22 order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Tue 07/20 8:38 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge S. Dave Vatti for the purpose of conducting a settlement conference. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 7/20/21. (Barry, Donna)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 19, 2021
21 21 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Tue 07/20 7:51 AM
ORDER granting20 Motion for Extension of Time to respond to the complaint. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 7/19/21. (Barry, Donna)
Related: [-]
utility Set Deadlines/Hearings Tue 07/20 8:06 AM
GENERAL SCHEDULING ORDER. The parties' Rule 26(f) Planning Report (Doc. #19 ) is hereby APPROVED as modified by this order. All discovery shall be completed by January 31, 2022 , and all other interim discovery dates set forth in the parties' Rule 26(f) Report are hereby adopted. Any dispositive summary judgment motions shall be filed by March 15, 2022. , and any response to dispositive summary judgment motions shall be filed by April 15, 2022. . The parties' joint trial memorandum is due by March 15, 2022 , or within 30 days of the Court's ruling on dispositive summary judgment motions, whichever date is later. The Court will thereafter set a trial date, and the parties should be prepared to proceed to jury selection within 30 days of the filing of the joint trial memorandum. Please refer to Judge Meyer's webpage on the District of Connecticut website for Judge Meyer's "Instructions for Discovery Disputes" and "Instructions for Joint Trial Memorandum" and "Pretrial Preferences" and "Trial Preferences." The parties are encouraged to commence discovery forthwith and to arrange their schedules in contemplation of the briefing deadlines for any dispositive motions, because the Court is unlikely to grant a future request for an extension of the scheduling order absent extraordinary and unforeseeable circumstances. A telephonic status conference will be held on October 28, 2021 at 4:00 p.m. . Parties are instructed to call 877-402-9753; Access Code 8576007#. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 07/19/2021.(Barry, Donna)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 16, 2021
20 20 motion Extension of Time Fri 07/16 12:54 PM
Second MOTION for Extension of Time Response to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by High Watch Recovery Center, Inc.. (Sinha, Siddharth)
Related: [-]
19 19 16 pgs misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Fri 07/16 12:17 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Cappello, Jody)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 08, 2021
18 18 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Fri 07/09 2:05 PM
ORDER granting17 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 7/8/21. (Barry, Donna)
Related: [-]
utility Update Answer Deadline Fri 07/09 2:07 PM
Answer deadline updated for High Watch Recovery Center, Inc. to 7/22/2021 . (Barry, Donna)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 06, 2021
17 17 motion Extension of Time Tue 07/06 3:08 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time until July 22, 2021 Response to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint13 Amended Complaint by High Watch Recovery Center, Inc.. (Sinha, Siddharth)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 25, 2021
16 16 order Order on Motion for More Definite Statement Tue 06/29 4:19 PM
ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT (Doc. #11 ). The Court DENIES as moot the motion for more definite statement in light of the filing of an amended complaint and without prejudice to any motion as directed against the amended complaint. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 06/25/21. (Barry, Donna)
Related: [-]
15 15 order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Tue 06/29 4:17 PM
ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT (Doc. #13 ). The Court GRANTS the motion for leave to file the amended complaint and deems the amended complaint to be filed. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 6/25/21. (Barry, Donna)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 24, 2021
14 14 2 pgs motion Amend/Correct Mon 06/28 9:12 AM
MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Julia Federle. (Freberg, B)
Related: [-]
13 13 30+ pgs cmp Amended Complaint Thu 06/24 4:48 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT and Motion for Leave to File against High Watch Recovery Center, Inc., filed by Julia Federle.(Munro-Delotto, Paige)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint Out of Time
Saturday, June 12, 2021
12 12 order Order ~Util - Set Motion and Rcmd Ruling Deadlines/Hearings Mon 06/14 9:51 PM
ORDER. Plaintiff shall file any objection or other response to the motion for more definite statement by June 21, 2021 . Alternatively, plaintiff may wish by June 21, 2021 to simply file an amended complaint that states separate counts for each individual cause of action. The complaint confusingly aggregates and intermixes multiple state and federal law claims within each of the five pleaded counts. The standard practice for federal court complaints is for each separate actionable claimed violation of the law to be pleaded as a separate count of a complaint. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 6/12/21.(Barry, Donna)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 11, 2021
11 11 9 pgs motion More Definite Statement Fri 06/11 4:45 PM
MOTION for More Definite Statement by High Watch Recovery Center, Inc..Responses due by 7/2/2021(Sinha, Siddharth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appendix Unreported Caselaw
Friday, April 16, 2021
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 04/16 5:09 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Siddharth Sinha on behalf of High Watch Recovery Center, Inc. (Sinha, Siddharth)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 15, 2021
9 9 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 04/15 1:40 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to High Watch Recovery Center, Inc. waiver sent on 4/12/2021, answer due 6/11/2021 filed by Julia Federle. (Munro-Delotto, Paige)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 04/15 11:24 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jody N. Cappello on behalf of High Watch Recovery Center, Inc. (Cappello, Jody)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 12, 2021
7 7 service Electronic Summons Issued Mon 04/12 9:42 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *High Watch Recovery Center, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Paige Alexandra Munro-Delotto* *Munro-Delotto Law LLC* *400 Westminster Street, Suite 200* *Providence, RI 02903*. (Freberg, B)
Related: [-]
6 6 order Electronic Service Documents Mon 04/12 9:39 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of5 Notice,3 Electronic Filing Order,1 Complaint filed by Julia Federle,4 Protective Order,2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines Signed by Clerk on 4/12/2021.(Freberg, B)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 08, 2021
5 5 notice Notice Mon 04/12 9:38 AM
NOTICE to Counsel Re Initial Discovery Protocols. Signed by Clerk on 4/8/2021.(Freberg, B)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Discovery Attachment
4 4 5 pgs order Protective Order Mon 04/12 9:36 AM
STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 4/8/2021.(Freberg, B)
Related: [-]
3 3 order Electronic Filing Order Mon 04/12 9:35 AM
ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 4/8/2021.(Freberg, B)
Related: [-]
2 2 1 pgs order Order on Pretrial Deadlines Mon 04/12 9:34 AM
Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 6/7/2021; Discovery due by 10/8/2021; Dispositive Motions due by 11/12/2021. Signed by Clerk on 4/8/2021.(Freberg, B)
Related: [-]
1 1 32 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 04/08 8:29 AM
COMPLAINT against HIGH WATCH RECOVERY CENTER, INC. ( Filing fee $402 receipt number ACTDC-6463414.), filed by JULIA FEDERLE.(Munro-Delotto, Paige)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet
Request for Clerk to issue summons as to High Watch Recovery Center, Inc. (Munro-Delotto, Paige) Modified on 4/8/2021 to edit text (Walker, J.).
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Thu 04/08 10:12 AM
Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer added. (Oliver, T.)
Related: [-]
service Request to Issue Summons Thu 04/08 9:02 AM
Request for Clerk to issue summons as to High Watch Recovery Center, Inc. (Munro-Delotto, Paige) Modified on 4/8/2021 to edit text (Walker, J.)
Related: [-]