Hatch et al v. Optum Government Solutions Inc
Arkansas Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Lee P Rudofsky |
Case #: | 4:21-cv-00274 |
Nature of Suit | 710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act |
Cause | 29:201 Denial of Overtime Compensation |
Case Filed: | Apr 08, 2021 |
Terminated: | Feb 13, 2023 |
Last checked: Tuesday Oct 05, 2021 3:59 AM CDT |
Defendant
Optum Government Solutions Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
TotalMed Staffing Inc
|
|
Plaintiff
Tristan Traylor
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Plaintiff
Taquilla Hatch
Terminated: 08/11/2021
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Monday, February 13, 2023 | ||
33 | 33
order
Order
Mon 02/13 4:52 PM
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: The32 Stipulation of Dismissal is self-executing. The Clerk is directed to administratively terminate this case. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 2/13/2023. (hml) |
|
32 | 32
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Mon 02/13 11:46 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice, Joint by Tristan Traylor. (Sanford, Joshua) |
|
Wednesday, October 12, 2022 | ||
31 | 31
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 10/12 10:39 AM
AMENDED FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Bench Trial reset for 6/20/2023 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock, Arkansas Courtroom #1D before Judge Lee P. Rudofsky. Discovery due by 1/20/2023; Motions due by 2/20/2023; Status Report due by 2/20/2023; and Pretrial Disclosure Sheet due by 5/22/2023. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 10/12/2022. (hml) |
|
30 | 30
order
Order on Motion to Stay
Wed 10/12 10:34 AM
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER denying29 Joint Motion to Stay. It is time for this case to be resolved or to move forward. The Court will, however, extend the discovery deadline November 14, 2022 to January 20, 2023. A new scheduling order will be forthcoming. No further extensions absent extraordinary circumstances. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 10/12/2022. (hml) |
|
Monday, October 10, 2022 | ||
29 | 29
motion
Stay
Mon 10/10 4:59 PM
Joint MOTION to Stay Deadlines Pending Settlement Discussions by Optum Government Solutions Inc (Hoffman, Ashton) |
|
Tuesday, August 30, 2022 | ||
28 | 28
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Tue 08/30 2:11 PM
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting27 Joint Motion to Extend Discovery Deadline. Discovery deadline extended to 11/14/2022. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 8/30/2022. (hml) |
|
27 | 27
motion
Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Tue 08/30 10:24 AM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Optum Government Solutions Inc (Hoffman, Ashton) |
|
Tuesday, January 25, 2022 | ||
26 | 26
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 01/25 2:12 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Ashton Prager Hoffman on behalf of Optum Government Solutions Inc (Hoffman, Ashton) |
|
Tuesday, January 18, 2022 | ||
25 | 25
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 01/18 11:45 AM
FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Bench Trial set for 2/7/2023 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock, Arkansas Courtroom #1D before Judge Lee P. Rudofsky. Motions to Amend and Join Other Parties due by 8/11/2022; Discovery due by 9/30/2022; Motions due by 10/10/2022; Status Report due by 10/10/2022; and Pretrial Disclosure Sheet due by 1/9/2023. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 1/18/2022. (hml) |
|
Monday, January 17, 2022 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting
Mon 01/17 4:13 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Tristan Traylor. -- Joint Rule 26(f) Report (Ford, Daniel) |
|
Wednesday, November 10, 2021 | ||
23 | 23
order
Initial Scheduling Order
Wed 11/10 9:32 AM
INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Report due by 1/18/2022 and Bench Trial set for 2/7/2023 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock, Arkansas Courtroom #1D before Judge Lee P. Rudofsky. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 11/10/2021. (hml) |
|
Monday, October 25, 2021 | ||
22 | 22
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Mon 10/25 3:22 PM
ANSWER to17 Amended Complaint by TotalMed Staffing Inc.(Rupe, Alan) |
|
21 | 21
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 10/25 3:14 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Alan L. Rupe on behalf of TotalMed Staffing Inc (Rupe, Alan) |
|
Friday, October 08, 2021 | ||
20 | 20
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Fri 10/08 9:01 AM
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting19 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Amanda J. Fray terminated. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 10/8/2021. (hml) |
|
19 | 19
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Fri 10/08 8:52 AM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Optum Government Solutions Inc (Fray, Amanda) |
|
Wednesday, August 25, 2021 | ||
18 | 18
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Wed 08/25 8:47 AM
Defendant Optum Government Solutions, Inc.'s ANSWER to17 Amended Complaint by Optum Government Solutions Inc.(Fray, Amanda) |
|
Wednesday, August 11, 2021 | ||
17 | 17
cmp
Amended Complaint
Wed 08/11 2:54 PM
FIRST AMENDED Complaint against Optum Government Solutions Inc, TotalMed Staffing Inc, filed by Tristan Traylor. (summons issued to TotalMed Staffing, Inc. and returned to attorney for plaintiff) (jap) |
|
Tuesday, August 10, 2021 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Tue 08/10 1:25 PM
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting in part15 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint. Answer or responsive pleading due seven days from the date of this order. No further extensions. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 8/10/2021. (hml) |
|
Friday, August 06, 2021 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Fri 08/06 4:04 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, by Optum Government Solutions Inc (Fray, Amanda) |
|
Friday, July 09, 2021 | ||
14 | 14
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Fri 07/09 11:32 AM
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 07/09/2021. (gvl) |
|
Thursday, July 08, 2021 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Thu 07/08 3:15 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Plead or Move In Response to Complaint by Taquilla Hatch, Tristan Traylor (Sanford, Joshua) |
|
Thursday, June 17, 2021 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Thu 06/17 11:05 AM
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re1 Complaint. Answer due by 7/9/2021. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 6/17/2021. (hml) |
|
Wednesday, June 16, 2021 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Wed 06/16 4:32 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, by Optum Government Solutions Inc (Fray, Amanda) |
|
Wednesday, June 09, 2021 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 06/09 9:56 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Eric R. Magnus on behalf of Optum Government Solutions Inc (Magnus, Eric) |
|
Monday, June 07, 2021 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Consent to Join Collective Action
Mon 06/07 4:37 PM
CONSENT To Join Collective Action filed by Taquilla Hatch, Tristan Traylor as to Dennis Cole. (Ford, Daniel) |
|
Thursday, June 03, 2021 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 06/03 9:55 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda J. Fray on behalf of Optum Government Solutions Inc (Fray, Amanda) |
|
Tuesday, June 01, 2021 | ||
misc
Docket Note
Tue 06/01 10:08 AM
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) DOCKET NOTE: This case is assigned to the docket of United States District Judge Lee P. Rudofsky. Magistrate Judge Edie R. Ervin is now associated to this case due to the retirement of Magistrate Judge Beth Deere. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 6/1/2021. (ajt) |
||
Wednesday, May 26, 2021 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order on Motion to Strike
Wed 05/26 9:38 AM
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting5 Motion to Strike ECF No. 2 and to Remove Filing From ECF. The Court strikes the filing and, because it is mistakenly filed attorney work-product, the Court orders it removed from the docket entirely. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 5/26/2021. (hml) |
|
Tuesday, May 25, 2021 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued
Tue 05/25 2:24 PM
Summons Issued as to Optum Government Solutions Inc and returned to counsel for plaintiffs. (jap) |
|
5 | 5
motion
Strike
Tue 05/25 2:16 PM
MOTION to Strike2 Notice (Other), and to Remove Filing from ECF by Taquilla Hatch, Tristan Traylor (Sanford, Joshua) |
|
4 | 4
utility
Notice of Docket Correction
Tue 05/25 12:30 PM
NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION2 Consent Notice. CORRECTION: The original document was attached to the docket entry in error (wrong image file)). The correct document was added to docket entry2 and is attached hereto for review by the parties pursuant to instruction from the filing attorney. (jak) |
|
Thursday, May 20, 2021 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 05/20 11:59 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Taquilla Hatch. Optum Government Solutions Inc served on 4/12/2021. (Sanford, Joshua) |
|
Wednesday, May 12, 2021 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 05/12 5:58 PM
NOTICE by Taquilla Hatch, Tristan Traylor of Consent to Join -- Jennifer Richardson (Ford, Daniel) |
|
Thursday, April 08, 2021 | ||
1 | 1
15
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Thu 04/08 4:43 PM
ORIGINAL COMPLAINT-COLLECTIVE ACTION against Optum Government Solutions Inc filed by Tristan Traylor, Taquilla Hatch. (Fee $402 paid. Receipt Number LIT081604.) Summons issued and returned to counsel.(ajt) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |