New York Eastern District Court
Case #: 1:21-cr-00191
Case Filed:Apr 07, 2021
Last checked: Friday Apr 09, 2021 3:35 AM EDT
Defendant
Mileta Miljanic (1)
Represented By
Lawrence DiGiansante
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Kayla C Bensing
U.S. Attorney'S Office, Edny
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/06/2022 11:21 AM EDT
Tuesday, February 23, 2021
1 1 3 pgs COMPLAINT as to Mileta Miljanic (1). (Chin, Felix) [1:21-mj-00238-RML]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 24, 2021
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy:Arraignment as to Mileta Miljanic (1) Count Complaint held on 2/24/2021, Initial Appearance as to Mileta Miljanic held on 2/24/2021. AUSAs Kayla Bensing & Mathew Miller appeared via video. Ret. counsel Lawrence DiGiansante appeared via video. Dft appeared via video. Pretrial Officer Anna Lee appeared via teleconference. Dft arraigned on the complaint. Preliminary hearing waived. Dfse counsel presented a bail application with 4 sureties; govt opposed; court denied the application. Order of detention entered. Rule 5f warnings given to the govt. (Webex Log # 2/24/21 3:45-4:30.) (Chin, Felix) [1:21-mj-00238-RML]
Related: [-]
2 2 1 pgs ORDER OF DETENTION as to Mileta Miljanic. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 2/24/2021. (Chin, Felix) [1:21-mj-00238-RML]
Related: [-]
3 3 3 pgs RULE 5f ORDER as to Mileta Miljanic. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 2/24/2021. (Chin, Felix) [1:21-mj-00238-RML]
Related: [-]
4 4 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Lawrence DiGiansante appearing for Mileta Miljanic (Chin, Felix) [1:21-mj-00238-RML]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 17, 2021
5 5 1 pgs ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Mileta Miljanic Time excluded from 3/16/2021 until 4/16/2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 3/17/2021. (Herrera, Isaiah) [1:21-mj-00238-RML]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 30, 2021
6 6 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Mileta Miljanic held on February 24, 2021, before Judge Levy. Court Reporter/Transcriber Fiore Reporting and Transcription Service, Inc., Telephone number 203-929-9992. Email address: cmfiore@sbcglobal.net. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.File redaction request using event "Redaction Request - Transcript" located under "Other Filings - Other Documents". Redaction Request due 4/20/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/30/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/28/2021. (Hong, Loan) [1:21-mj-00238-RML]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 07, 2021
7 7 4 pgs INDICTMENT as to Mileta Miljanic (1) count(s) 1. (Marziliano, August)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Criminal Information Sheet