Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:20-bk-23669

New Jersey Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Kathryn C Ferguson
Case #: 3:21-ap-01238
Nature of Suit11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Apr 09, 2021
Terminated:Oct 21, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Maria Parrella-Turco
Represented By
Maria Parrella-Turco
contact info
Defendant
Honor Yoga Management, LLC
Represented By
Honor Yoga Management, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Andrea Dobin
McManimon, Scotland & Baumann, LLC 427 Riverview Plaza
Trenton, NJ 08611
Represented By
Michele M. Dudas
Mcmanimon, Scotland & Baumann, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:08 PM EDT
Wednesday, April 20, 2022
court Receipt - Generic - Adversary - Court Use Only Wed 04/20 2:39 PM
Receipt of Adversary Filing Fee Amount $ 350.00, Receipt Number 624806. Fee received from Andrea Dobin (mrg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 21, 2021
utility Close Adversary Case Thu 10/21 3:03 PM
Adversary Case (3:21-ap-1238) Closed. (ckk)
Related: [-]
Saturday, September 18, 2021
14 14 2 pgs court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Sun 09/19 12:10 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 09/18/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 14, 2021
13 13 2 pgs order Money Judgment Thu 09/16 11:09 AM
ORDER GRANTING DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST ALL DEFENDANTS in favor of ANDREA DOBIN, CHAPTER 7 TRUSTEE and against MARIA PARRELLA-TURCO and HONOR YOGA MANAGEMENT, LLC Money Judgment in the amount of $289,158.00 Related [+] . Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 9/14/2021 (ckk)
Related: [-] 11 Request to Enter Default Judgment filed by Plaintiff Andrea Dobin
Monday, September 13, 2021
11 11 misc Request to Enter Default Judgment Mon 09/13 12:27 PM
Request to Enter Default Judgment Against Maria Parrella-Turco and Honor Yoga Management filed by Michele M. Dudas on behalf of Andrea Dobin. (Dudas, Michele)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 5 pgs Affidavit in Support
Att: 2 2 pgs Proposed Order
Att: 3 2 pgs Certification of Service
Saturday, June 19, 2021
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Sun 06/20 12:13 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 06/19/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
court Notice of Returned Mail Mon 06/21 8:57 AM
Returned Mail Notice. The court has received notification that the US Postal Service has determined that the following parties have an address that is undeliverable: Maria Parrella-Turco; Honor Yoga Management, LLC - Reason Undeliverable: INCOMPLETE ADDRESS , Related [+] (las)
Related: [-] 10 BNC Certificate of Notice - Order
Tuesday, June 15, 2021
9 9 2 pgs order File Default Papers Thu 06/17 11:20 AM
Order to File Default Judgment Papers. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 6/15/2021. Deadline to file default papers is 9/13/2021. (ghm)
Related: [-]
court Hearing Held Wed 06/16 11:06 AM
Minute of 6/15/2021 Outcome: DEFAULT ENTERED - PLAINTIFF TO MOVE FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHIN 90 DAYS Related [+] (ckk)
Related: [-] 3 Summons Issued
Friday, June 04, 2021
8 8 2 pgs misc Document Fri 06/04 9:31 AM
Document re: Letter to Judge Ferguson Requesting Extension of Time to Obtain Default Judgment filed by Michele M. Dudas on behalf of Andrea Dobin. (Dudas, Michele)
Related: [-]
Sunday, May 23, 2021
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Mon 05/24 12:17 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/23/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
court Notice of Returned Mail Tue 06/01 10:21 AM
Returned Mail Notice. The court has received notification that the US Postal Service has determined that the following parties have an address that is undeliverable: Maria Parrella-Turco; Honor Yoga Management, LLC Reason Undeliverable: INCOMPLETE ADDRESS , Related [+] (las)
Related: [-] 7 BNC Certificate of Notice - Order
Friday, May 21, 2021
6 6 1 pgs court Entry of Default Fri 05/21 1:38 PM
Entry of Default against MARIA PARRELLA-TURCO and HONOR YOGA MANAGEMENT, LLC Related [+] The following parties were served: Plaintiff, Plaintiff's Attorney, Defendants. (ghm)
Related: [-] 4 Request to Enter Default filed by Plaintiff Andrea Dobin
5 5 1 pgs misc Support Fri 05/21 9:59 AM
Proposed Entry of Default in support of Related [+] filed by Michele M. Dudas on behalf of Andrea Dobin. (Dudas, Michele)
Related: [-] 4 Request to Enter Default filed by Plaintiff Andrea Dobin
4 4 misc Request to Enter Default Fri 05/21 9:38 AM
Request to Enter Default Against Maria Parrella-Turco and Honor Yoga Management, LLC filed by Michele M. Dudas on behalf of Andrea Dobin. (Dudas, Michele)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit in Support
Att: 2 Certification of Service
Friday, April 09, 2021
3 3 1 pgs court Summons Issued Fri 04/09 4:35 PM
Summons Issued to Andrea Dobin for Service on Honor Yoga Management, LLC Answer due on 5/10/2021; Maria Parrella-Turco Answer due on 5/10/2021 Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 6/15/2021 at 02:15 PM at KCF - Courtroom 2, Trenton. (gan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 6 pgs Joint Order Scheduling Pretrial Proceedings and Trial
2 2 misc Certification and Agreement to Pay Filing Fee Fri 04/09 11:57 AM
Certification and Agreement to Pay Filing Fee filed by Michele M. Dudas on behalf of Andrea Dobin. (Dudas, Michele)
Related: [-]
1 1 15 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 04/09 11:31 AM
Adversary case 21-01238 Complaint by Andrea Dobin against Maria Parrella-Turco ; Honor Yoga Management, LLC. Receipt Number EST ACCT, Fee Amount $ 350.. (11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)) (Dudas, Michele)
Related: [-]