Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:21-bk-40059

Idaho Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Joseph M Meier
Case #: 4:21-ap-08013
Nature of Suit72 Bankruptcy - Injunctive relief - other
91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment
Case Filed:Apr 08, 2021
Terminated:Sep 19, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
Michael Breen, NV
Represented By
Louis V. Spiker
Angstman Johnson
contact info
Matthew Todd Christensen
Angstman Johnson, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Ronald Mezzetta, CA
Represented By
Louis V. Spiker
Angstman Johnson
contact info
Matthew Todd Christensen
Angstman Johnson, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Divinia Water, Inc.
149 Chesnut St.
Idaho Falls, ID 83402
Represented By
Brian Michael Rothschild
Parsons Behle & Latimer
contact info


Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Monday, September 19, 2022
court|utility Close Adversary Case|Disposition of Adversary Mon 09/19 9:45 AM
Disposition of Adversary 4:21-ap-8013 , Adversary Case 4:21-ap-8013 Closed (kll)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 11, 2022
39 39 court Court's Certificate of Service Thu 08/11 9:17 AM
Court's Certificate of Service re38 Order Dismissing Case - AP A notice of entry of the related document has been served on Registered Participants as reflected by the Notice of Electronic Filing. A Notice of Entry has also been served by First Class Mail Addressed to: Michael Breen PO Box 269 Sonoma, CA 95476; Ronald Mezzetta 1201 East MacArthur Street Sonoma, CA 95476 Related [+] (cm)
Related: [-] 38 Order Dismissing Case - AP
38 38 order Dismissing Case - AP Thu 08/11 9:10 AM
Order Dismissing Case - AP Signed on 8/11/2022. (cm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 19, 2022
37 37 trustee Status Report Tue 07/19 4:10 PM
Status Report and Consent to Dismissal Filed by Plaintiff Divinia Water, Inc.. (Rothschild, Brian)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 13, 2022
36 36 utility Status Request Wed 07/13 12:11 PM
Request to the Plaintiff to provide an update on case status. Status request due date 7/22/2022. (kll)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 29, 2021
35 35 misc Minute Entry Hearing Continued Wed 12/01 6:05 PM
Hearing Continued/Rescheduled Appearances: Brian Rothschild Attorney for Plaintiff Report of Proceedings: The Court will CONTINUE the status conference to February 15, 2022 at 10:00 am. . Please note the Courts new call in number: Judge Meiers Conference Number: 1-669-254-5252 Access Code: 160 093 0120 Audio File Location: Telephone Status hearing to be held on 2/15/2022 at 10:00 AM at Telephonic Hearing. (dj)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 15, 2021
34 34 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Hearing Fri 10/15 10:27 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Hearing Notice Date 10/15/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 13, 2021
33 33 court Court's Certificate of Service Wed 10/13 8:17 AM
Court's Certificate of Service re32 Notice of Hearing A notice of entry of the related document has been served on Registered Participants as reflected by the Notice of Electronic Filing. A Notice of Entry has also been served by First Class Mail Addressed to: Michael Breen and Ronald Mezzetta at the address on record. Related [+] (kll)
Related: [-] 32 Notice of Hearing
32 32 notice Notice of Hearing Wed 10/13 8:14 AM
Amended Notice of Hearing Signed on 10/13/2021 Related [+]. Status hearing to be held on 11/29/2021 at 10:00 AM at Telephonic Hearing. (kll)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Divinia Water, Inc.
Tuesday, October 12, 2021
31 31 misc Minute Entry Hearing Continued Tue 10/12 3:37 PM
Hearing Continued/Rescheduled Appearances: Brian Rothschild Attorney for Plaintiff Report of Proceedings: After discussion with Mr. Rothchild the Court will CONTINUE the Status Hearing to be heard on November 29, 2021 at 10:00 am as a telephonic. This will allow Defendant to obtain notice or obtain counsel, Court Clerk is to send out a Notice of Status Hearing to pro se Defendants. Audio File Location: Telephone Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 11/29/2021 at 10:00 AM at Telephonic Hearing. (dj)
Related: [-] 29 Notice of Hearing
Wednesday, September 29, 2021
30 30 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Hearing Wed 09/29 10:22 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Hearing Notice Date 09/29/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 27, 2021
29 29 notice Notice of Hearing Mon 09/27 2:50 PM
Notice of Status Hearing Signed on 9/27/2021 Related [+]. Status hearing to be held on 10/12/2021 at 10:00 AM at Telephonic Hearing. (kll)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Divinia Water, Inc.
Thursday, September 02, 2021
28 28 misc Returned Mail Thu 09/02 3:41 PM
Returned mail received for Michael Breen & Ronald Mezzetta Related [+] (kll)
Related: [-] 25 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Friday, August 27, 2021
27 27 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Fri 08/27 10:24 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Notice Date 08/27/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
26 26 misc Certificate of Service Fri 08/27 1:35 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Defendants Michael Breen, Ronald Mezzetta Related [+]. (Christensen, Matthew)
Related: [-] 25 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Wednesday, August 25, 2021
25 25 order Withdraw As Attorney Wed 08/25 10:22 AM
Order Granting Motion To Withdraw As Attorney Related [+] Signed on 8/25/2021. (kll)
Related: [-] 23
Monday, August 23, 2021
24 24 misc Statement of No Objection Mon 08/23 6:22 PM
Statement of No Objection - In accordance with LBR 2002.2(d)(3) the moving party hereby certifies that no objection has been filed or received to the motion/application filed as Doc. Number23 . Filed by Defendants Michael Breen, Ronald Mezzetta Related [+]. (Spiker, Louis)
Related: [-] 23 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney for Michael Breen and Ronald Mezzetta
Wednesday, August 04, 2021
utility Notification by the Clerk's Office Wed 08/04 3:35 PM
Notification by the Clerks Office: Clerk added an Objection deadline of August 20, 2021, based on the notice given [21 days + 3 for mailing]. No further action is required. Related [+] (kll)
Related: [-] 23 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Defendant Michael Breen, Defendant Ronald Mezzetta
Tuesday, July 27, 2021
23 23 motion Withdraw As Attorney Tue 07/27 12:22 PM
Motion to Withdraw as Attorney for Michael Breen and Ronald Mezzetta Filed by Defendants Michael Breen, Ronald Mezzetta (Spiker, Louis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Louis V. Spiker in Support of Motion to Withdraw
Thursday, May 27, 2021
22 22 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Hearing Thu 05/27 10:36 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Hearing Notice Date 05/27/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 25, 2021
21 21 notice Notice of Hearing Tue 05/25 12:46 PM
Notice of Hearing Signed on 5/25/2021 Related [+]. Pre Trial Conference hearing to be held on 6/28/2021 at 09:30 AM Telephonic Hearing for1 , (kll)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Divinia Water, Inc.
20 20 order Preliminary Injunction Tue 05/25 12:42 PM
Order Granting Motion For Preliminary Injunction Related [+] Signed on 5/25/2021. (kll)
Related: [-] 3
Wednesday, May 19, 2021
18 18 audio Thu 05/20 6:05 AM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 5/18/2021 1:45:47 PM ]. File Size [ 81228 KB ]. Run Time [ 02:49:14 ]. (admin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 18, 2021
19 19 court Minute Entry Hearing Held (Other) Thu 05/20 7:50 AM
Hearing Held Appearances: Brian Rothschild Attorney for Defendant; Gary Rainsdon Trustee; Mathew Christensen Attorney for Plaintiff Report of Proceedings: Opening statement by Mr. Rothschild. Parties Stipulated to admitting Exhibits for Defendant A-D, F and G, Exhibits admitted. EVIDENCE AND TESTIMONY: Steven Sedlmayr sworn and examined by Mr. Rothschild exhibit J offered and admitted, counsel request the Court to take judicial notice of the Motion for Summary Judgment Dkt#19 that was filed in Adv. Case# 21-8006 Cross Examination by Mr. Christensen, Cross Examination by Mr. Rainsdon. Re Direct by Mr. Rothschil, Re Cross Examination by Mr. Christensen. Remy Sedlmayr sworn and examined by Mr. Rothschild. Parties rest: Evidentiary record deemed closed. Closing arguments made by Mr. Rothschild and Mr. Christensen with questions by the Court. After an evidentiary hearing and arguments made the Court issues its findings of fact and conclusions of law, reserving the right to amend, supplement or issue written findings at a later date as to the Motion for Preliminary Injunction. The Court finds and concludes that the Motion will be GRANTED effective immediately. Mr. Rothschild is to submit an appropriate order with approval by Mr. Christensen and Mr. Rainsdon. Audio File Location: POC-CTRMB Related [+] (dj)
Related: [-] 3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff Divinia Water, Inc.
utility Corrective Entry Tue 05/18 12:32 PM
Corrective Action: Counsel to please contact the Court Calendar for numbers to file the appropriate exhibits in the future. Related [+] (kll)
Related: [-] 12 Exhibit List filed by Plaintiff Divinia Water, Inc.
Monday, May 17, 2021
17 17 misc Judicial Notice (Request) Mon 05/17 7:14 PM
Request for Judicial Notice of Docketed Items, (1) Chapter 11 Plan of Reorganization and (2) Motion for Partial Summary Judgment under 11 U.S.C. § 510(b) Filed by Plaintiff Divinia Water, Inc. Related [+]. (Rothschild, Brian)
Related: [-] 3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction for Interim Declaratory Relief and Temporary Injunctive Relief Under 28 U.S.C. § 2201(a), 11 U.S.C. §§ 105(a) and 362(a), and Fed. R. Bankr. P. 7065
Friday, May 14, 2021
16 16 answer Reply Fri 05/14 5:46 PM
Reply to Related [+] Filed by Plaintiff Divinia Water, Inc. (Rothschild, Brian)
Related: [-] 3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction for Interim Declaratory Relief and Temporary Injunctive Relief Under 28 U.S.C. § 2201(a), 11 U.S.C. §§ 105(a) and 362(a), and Fed. R. Bankr. P. 7065 filed by Plaintiff Divinia Water, Inc.
Tuesday, May 11, 2021
15 15 misc Witness List Tue 05/11 11:41 PM
Witness List Filed by Defendants Michael Breen, Ronald Mezzetta. (Spiker, Louis)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Exhibit List Tue 05/11 11:40 PM
Exhibit List Filed by Defendants Michael Breen, Ronald Mezzetta. (Spiker, Louis)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Opposition Brief/Memorandum Tue 05/11 11:39 PM
Brief/Memorandum in Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction Filed by Defendants Michael Breen, Ronald Mezzetta Related [+]. (Spiker, Louis)
Related: [-] 3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction for Interim Declaratory Relief and Temporary Injunctive Relief Under 28 U.S.C. § 2201(a), 11 U.S.C. §§ 105(a) and 362(a), and Fed. R. Bankr. P. 7065
12 12 misc Exhibit List Tue 05/11 4:35 PM
Exhibit List for Hearing Scheduled for May 18, 2021, at 1:30 p.m. Filed by Plaintiff Divinia Water, Inc.. (Rothschild, Brian)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Witness List Tue 05/11 4:34 PM
Witness List for Hearing Scheduled for May 18, 2021, at 1:30 p.m. on Motion for Temporary Injunctive Relief Filed by Plaintiff Divinia Water, Inc.. (Rothschild, Brian)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 10, 2021
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 05/10 6:51 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Defendants Michael Breen, Ronald Mezzetta (Spiker, Louis)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 28, 2021
9 9 notice Notice of Hearing Wed 04/28 6:37 PM
Notice of Hearing Filed by Plaintiff Divinia Water, Inc. Related [+]. Motion for Preliminary Injunction hearing to be held on 5/18/2021 at 01:30 PM Pocatello for3 , (Rothschild, Brian)
Related: [-] 3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction for Interim Declaratory Relief and Temporary Injunctive Relief Under 28 U.S.C. § 2201(a), 11 U.S.C. §§ 105(a) and 362(a), and Fed. R. Bankr. P. 7065 Filed by Plaintiff Divinia Water, Inc. filed by Plaintiff Divinia Water, Inc.
Friday, April 16, 2021
8 8 cmp Summons Service Executed Fri 04/16 2:18 PM
Summons Service Executed on Michael Breen 4/15/2021 (Rothschild, Brian)
Related: [-]
7 7 cmp Summons Service Executed Fri 04/16 2:16 PM
Summons Service Executed on Ronald Mezzetta 4/16/2021 (Rothschild, Brian)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 09, 2021
6 6 court Summons Issued Fri 04/09 11:24 AM
Summons Issued on Michael Breen Date Issued 4/9/2021, Answer Due 5/10/2021; Ronald Mezzetta Date Issued 4/9/2021, Answer Due 5/10/2021 (ck)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 08, 2021
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 04/08 7:27 PM
Notice of Appearance by Louis V. Spiker Filed by Defendants Michael Breen, Ronald Mezzetta. (Spiker, Louis)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 04/08 7:22 PM
Notice of Appearance by Matthew Todd Christensen Filed by Defendants Michael Breen, Ronald Mezzetta. (Christensen, Matthew)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Preliminary Injunction Thu 04/08 3:39 PM
Motion for Preliminary Injunction for Interim Declaratory Relief and Temporary Injunctive Relief Under 28 U.S.C. § 2201(a), 11 U.S.C. §§ 105(a) and 362(a), and Fed. R. Bankr. P. 7065 Filed by Plaintiff Divinia Water, Inc. (Rothschild, Brian)
Related: [-]
2 2 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Thu 04/08 3:21 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 21-08013 JMM] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A7694877. Fee amount 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 04/08 3:13 PM
Adversary case 21-08013 72 (Injunctive relief - other): Complaint by Divinia Water, Inc. against Michael Breen, Ronald Mezzetta. Fee Amount $350 (Rothschild, Brian)
Related: [-]