New York Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Robert E Grossman
Case #: 8:21-bk-70670
Case Filed:Apr 09, 2021
Plan Confirmed:Jul 15, 2022

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$500,001 to $1 million
Est. Liabilities $500,001 to $1 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business
Small BusinessYes

Debtor
Magnacoustics, Inc.
1995 Park St
Atlantic Beach, NY 11509-1243
Represented By
Sandra E. Mayerson
Mayerson & Hartheimer, PLLC
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Long Island Federal Courthouse 560 Federal Plaza - Room 560
Central Islip, NY 11722


Docket last updated: 04/08/2021 8:00 PM EDT
Friday, April 09, 2021
1 1 48 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Fri 04/09 11:53 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Small Business Non-Individual Subchapter V. Fee Amount $ 1738. Filed by Sandra E. Mayerson on behalf of Magnacoustics, Inc. Chapter 11 Subchapter V Plan Due by 07/8/2021. (Mayerson, Sandra)
Related: [-]
14 14 court Deficient Filing Chapter 11 Tue 04/13 7:37 AM
Deficient Filing Chapter 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to FBR 1073-3 due 4/9/2021. Small Business Statement of Operations Subchapter V due by 4/16/2021. Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individuals Official Form 206Sum due by 4/23/2021. Schedule A/B due 4/23/2021. Schedule D due 4/23/2021. Schedule E/F due 4/23/2021. Schedule G due 4/23/2021. Schedule H due 4/23/2021. Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non Individual Debtors Official Form 202 due 4/23/2021. List of Equity Security Holders due 4/23/2021. Incomplete Filings due by 4/23/2021. (lkg)
Related: [-]