Nevada District Court
Judge:Jennifer A Dorsey
Referred: Brenda Weksler
Case #: 2:21-cv-00593
Nature of Suit350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Cause28:1446 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Case Filed:Apr 12, 2021
Terminated:Feb 14, 2023
Case in other court:District Court Clark County, Nevada, A-21--827510-C
Last checked: Saturday Oct 09, 2021 2:01 AM PDT
Defendant
Holiday Motor Coach, LLC
Represented By
Matthew Havili
Alverson, Taylor, & Sanders
contact info
Kurt R. Bonds
Alverson Taylor & Sanders
contact info
Defendant
Steve Sommers
Plaintiff
Fidele Ntihabose
Represented By
Peter Maitland Angulo
Angulo Law Group, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Tuesday, February 14, 2023
31 31 2 pgs order Order on Stipulation ~Util - Terminate Case Tue 02/14 3:41 PM
ORDER granting30 Stipulation of dismissal with prejudice. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 2/14/2023. Case terminated. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 08, 2023
30 30 motion Stipulation Wed 02/08 4:12 PM
STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL of Complaint with Prejudice by Defendant Holiday Motor Coach, LLC. (Bonds, Kurt) (dismissal)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 20, 2022
minutes Settlement Conference Tue 12/20 3:07 PM
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - A Settlement Conference was held on 12/20/2022 before Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. Pla Counsel: Peter Maitland Angulo ; Def Counsel: Kurt R. Bonds; Matthew Havili ; Time of Hearing: 10:15 a.m. to 12:08 p.m. In addition to counsel, Plaintiff Fidele Ntihabose was present. Also, DMC Insurance, Inc.'s Senior Claims Specialist Roberta Krumper was present on behalf of Defendants. The Court heard presentations from counsel and the parties. A settlement was reached. The parties are to execute settlement documents, complete settlement, and file dismissal paperwork by 2/20/2023. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - RA)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 19, 2022
minord Minute Order Mon 12/19 11:54 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 12/19/2022. Due to unforeseen circumstances, IT IS ORDERED that the pre-Settlement Conference Telephonic Conference set for 12/19/2022 is VACATED. The Settlement Conference scheduled for 12/20/2022 will remain on calendar. Using the previously circulated Zoom invitation, Plaintiff is kindly directed to log into Zoom at 10:00 a.m., and Defendants are kindly directed to log into Zoom at 10:45 a.m. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - RA)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 20, 2022
27 27 4 pgs order Order Setting Settlement Conference Thu 10/20 9:44 AM
ORDER setting Settlement Conference. A pre-Settlement Conference is set for 12/19/2022 at 03:00 PM - Telephonic - before Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. Settlement Conference set for 12/20/2022 at 10:00 AM by Videoconference before Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 10/20/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 19, 2022
minutes Motion Hearing Order on Motion for Summary Judgment Wed 10/19 3:37 PM
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Motion Hearing held on 10/19/2022 before Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey. Crtrm Administrator: M. Johansen ; Pla Counsel: Peter Angulo ; Def Counsel: Matthew Havili and Jarod Penniman ; Court Reporter: Amber McClane ; Time of Hearing: 3:13 p.m. - 3:25 p.m. ; Courtroom: 6D ; The court made preliminary remarks and heard arguments of counsel regarding the defendant's motion for summary judgment ECF No. 20 . As stated on the record, the motion for summary judgment is denied. This case is referred to the Honorable Brenda Weksler, United States Magistrate for the scheduling of a settlement conference. The requirement to submit a proposed joint pretrial order is stayed until ten days after that settlement conference. The minutes of this proceeding and the transcript will serve as the Court's official ruling. No separate order to follow. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAJ)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 10, 2022
minord Minute Order Mon 10/10 10:36 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 10/10/2022. By Deputy Clerk: Danielle Cacciabaudo. Hearing re:20 Motion for Summary Judgment. Due to a scheduling conflict, the Motion Hearing set for 10/12/2022 is vacated and reset for 10/19/2022 at 03:00 PM on a stacked motion calendar in LV Courtroom 6D before Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey. The hearing will be conducted IN PERSON; telephonic or video appearance will not be permitted. Counsel is reminded that proper courtroom attire is expected. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 20, 2022
24 24 respm Reply Tue 09/20 10:50 PM
REPLY to Response to20 Motion for Summary Judgment,, by Defendants Holiday Motor Coach, LLC, Steve Sommers.(Bonds, Kurt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit J
Wednesday, September 14, 2022
minord Minute Order Setting Hearing on Motion Wed 09/14 11:59 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 9/14/2022. By Deputy Clerk: Danielle Cacciabaudo. IT IS ORDERED that the Motion for Summary Judgment 20 will be heard on the 3:00 p.m. stacked motion calendar in Courtroom 6D on October 12, 2022. The hearing will be conducted IN PERSON; telephonic or video appearance will not be permitted. Counsel is reminded that proper courtroom attire is expected. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 06, 2022
22 22 respm Response Tue 09/06 10:40 AM
RESPONSE to20 Motion for Summary Judgment,, by Plaintiff Fidele Ntihabose. Replies due by 9/20/2022.(Angulo, Peter)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7,
Att: 8 Exhibit 8,
Att: 9 Exhibit 10,
Att: 10 Exhibit 11,
Att: 11 Exhibit 12,
Att: 12 Exhibit 13,
Att: 13 Exhibit 14
Monday, August 15, 2022
misc QC Notice Mon 08/15 8:07 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 5-1(b). ECF No.20 was not filed pursuant to LR IC 5-1(b) by attorneys Kurt R. Bonds and Matthew M. Havili. Please note the signatory must be the attorney or pro se party who electronically files the document. No further action is required concerning this document at this time. Do not refile document. (no image attached) (SLD)
Related: [-]
Sunday, August 14, 2022
20 20 motion Motion Summary Judgment Sun 08/14 11:51 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendants Holiday Motor Coach, LLC, Steve Sommers. Responses due by 9/4/2022.(Bonds, Kurt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Uber Accident Report,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Interrogatory Responses,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Plaintiff's February 20, 2019 Letter,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit D - Plaintiff's March 5, 2019 Letter,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit E - Deposition of Fidele Ntihabose,
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit F - Plaintiff's Photograph of License Plate,
Att: 7 Exhibit Exhibit G - Driver's Log,
Att: 8 Exhibit Exhibit H - Deposition of Berk Buttars,
Att: 9 Exhibit Exhibit I - Deposition of Steve Sommer
Thursday, March 24, 2022
19 19 notice Notice Appearance Thu 03/24 2:23 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Kurt R. Bonds on behalf of Defendant Holiday Motor Coach, LLC. Steve Sommers (Bonds, Kurt)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 07, 2022
18 18 7 pgs order Order on Stipulation Scheduling Order Mon 03/07 10:59 AM
ORDER Granting17 Stipulation to Extend Discovery Deadlines. Discovery due by 7/17/2022. Motions due by 8/14/2022. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 9/12/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 3/7/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KF)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 04, 2022
17 17 motion Stipulation Fri 03/04 10:32 AM
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Third Request) re Discovery by Plaintiff Fidele Ntihabose. (Angulo, Peter)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 03, 2022
16 16 4 pgs order Order on Stipulation Scheduling Order Tue 01/04 10:02 AM
ORDER granting15 Stipulation; Discovery due by 4/18/2022. Motions due by 5/16/2022. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 6/14/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 1/3/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 29, 2021
15 15 motion Stipulation Wed 12/29 3:42 PM
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Second Request) re Discovery by Defendant Holiday Motor Coach, LLC. (Bonds, Kurt)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 17, 2021
14 14 notice Notice AO 85 Consent to Mag Judge Fri 09/17 11:29 AM
NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC § 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website -[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (HAM)
Related: [-]
13 13 4 pgs order Order on Stipulation Scheduling Order Fri 09/17 11:29 AM
ORDER granting12 Stipulation; Discovery due by 1/16/2022. Motions due by 2/14/2022. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 3/16/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 9/17/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 16, 2021
12 12 motion Stipulation Thu 09/16 4:44 PM
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re Discovery by Plaintiff Fidele Ntihabose. (Angulo, Peter)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 08, 2021
11 11 6 pgs order Order on Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order Tue 06/08 12:28 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER granting10 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order; Discovery due by 10/18/2021. Motions due by 11/16/2021. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 12/16/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 6/8/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 04, 2021
10 10 motion Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order Fri 06/04 10:46 AM
Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Fidele Ntihabose. (Angulo, Peter)
Related: [-]
Saturday, May 15, 2021
9 9 notice Notice Other Sat 05/15 11:57 AM
NOTICE of Telephonic FRCP 26(f) Conference by Fidele Ntihabose. (Angulo, Peter)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 12, 2021
8 8 misc Status Report Wed 05/12 2:56 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendant Holiday Motor Coach, LLC. (Havili, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 30, 2021
7 7 minord Minute Order Order on Ex Parte Motion Fri 04/30 3:11 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 4/30/2021. Before the Court is a motion by plaintiff to extend the time for service upon defendant Steve Sommers. ECF No.4 . Defendant Holiday Motor Coach, LLC, did not respond to the motion, and the deadline to do so has lapsed. Under Rule 4, the Court "must" extend the time for service upon a showing of good cause. Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m); Lemoge v. United States , 587 F.3d 1188, 1198 (9th Cir. 2009). Here, the Court in its discretion finds that there exists good cause for an extension. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that plaintiff's motion is granted on the basis of good cause and under LR 7-2(d). The deadline for service upon defendant Sommers is extended up to and including June 29, 2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DCh)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 26, 2021
6 6 misc Statement in Removal Case Mon 04/26 1:00 PM
STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Holiday Motor Coach, LLC. (Bonds, Kurt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Tuesday, April 20, 2021
5 5 answer Answer to Petition for Removal Tue 04/20 10:32 AM
ANSWER re1 Petition for Removal, filed by Holiday Motor Coach, LLC. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 6/4/2021.(Bonds, Kurt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 13, 2021
3 3 misc Certificate Interested Parties Tue 04/13 3:02 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Holiday Motor Coach, LLC. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Bonds, Kurt)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 12, 2021
2 2 minord Minute Order Removal Case Mon 04/12 3:10 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 4/12/2021. Statement regarding removed action is due by 4/27/2021. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 5/12/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Petition Removal Mon 04/12 1:55 PM
PETITION FOR REMOVAL from District Court Clark County Nevada, Case Number A-21-827510-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0978-6443620) by Holiday Motor Coach, LLC. (Bonds, Kurt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Assign Judges in Civil Case Mon 04/12 3:10 PM
Case randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (HAM)
Related: [-]