Stitch Editing Ltd. v. TikTok, Inc. et al
California Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Cathy Ann Bencivengo |
Referred: | Bernard G Skomal |
Case #: | 3:21-cv-00626 |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Cause | 15:1051 Trademark Infringement |
Case Filed: | Apr 12, 2021 |
Terminated: | Aug 12, 2021 |
Last checked: Saturday Oct 09, 2021 1:27 AM PDT |
Counter Claimant
ByteDance Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Counter Claimant
TikTok LLC
|
Represented By
|
Counter Claimant
TikTok Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Counter Claimant
TikTok, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Stitch Editing Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
ByteDance Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
TikTok LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
TikTok Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
TikTok, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Stitch Editing Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Wednesday, August 18, 2021 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Transfer Letter Received
Wed 08/18 11:16 AM
Transfer Letter Received from Central District of California. Case number in other court is 2:21-cv-06636 (jpp) |
|
Thursday, August 12, 2021 | ||
22 | 22
utility
Report Regarding Patent & Trademark Closing
Tue 09/07 2:42 PM
REPORT of Patent and Trademark Closing, regarding patent and/or trademark number(s) 4,742,447, re20 Case Transferred Out to Another District,. cc:USPTO (rmc) |
|
20 | 20
order
Case Transferred Out - District FORM
Thu 08/12 10:19 AM
Case transferred to District of Central District of California, Western Division. Files transferred electronically to: *District of Central District of California, Western Division*.* 312 N Spring St Ste G23, Los Angeles, CA 90012*. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 8/12/2021. (anh) Modified on 8/12/2021 (anh). (Main Document 20 replaced on 8/12/2021) (anh) |
|
Att: 1 Order | ||
Monday, August 09, 2021 | ||
19 | 19
answer
Answer to Complaint Counterclaim
Mon 08/09 2:17 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by ByteDance Ltd., TikTok LLC, TikTok, Inc., TikTok Ltd..(Schouten, Andrew) (anh) |
|
Friday, August 06, 2021 | ||
18 | 18
respm
Reply - Other
Fri 08/06 8:50 AM
REPLY - Other re12 Order to Show Cause in Response to Order to Show Cause Why Case Should Not be Transferred to the Central District of California filed by Stitch Editing Ltd.. (Skale, Andrew) |
|
Friday, July 30, 2021 | ||
17 | 17
minutes
~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Fri 07/30 3:40 PM
Minute Order. In light of Defendants' opposition to Plaintiff's response to the Court's Order to Show Cause Why Case Should Not Be Transferred to the Central District of California [Doc. No.16 ], Plaintiff may file a reply to Defendant's opposition, in writing not to exceed five pages, on or before 8/6/2021. Upon receipt of the reply, the Court will take the matter under submission and issue an order in due course. (ag) |
|
16 | 16
respm
Reply - Other
Fri 07/30 1:38 PM
REPLY - Other re12 Order to Show Cause,15 Response - Other Opposition to Plaintiff's Response to Order to Show Cause Why Case Should Not Be Transferred to the Central District of California filed by ByteDance Ltd., TikTok LLC, TikTok Ltd., TikTok, Inc.. (Schouten, Andrew) |
|
Thursday, July 22, 2021 | ||
15 | 15
respm
Response - Other
Thu 07/22 9:07 AM
RESPONSE re12 Order to Show Cause Why Case Should Not be Transferred to the Central District of California filed by Stitch Editing Ltd.. (Skale, Andrew) (anh) |
|
Wednesday, July 07, 2021 | ||
14 | 14
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
Wed 07/07 10:34 AM
ORDER Granting Joint Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Order to Show Cause [Doc. No.13 ]. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 7/7/2021. (anh) |
|
Tuesday, July 06, 2021 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Extension of Time to File
Tue 07/06 12:12 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File To respond to Order to Show Cause Why Case Should Not Be Transferred to the Central District of California [Doc No. 12] by Stitch Editing Ltd.. (Skale, Andrew) (anh) |
|
Wednesday, June 23, 2021 | ||
12 | 12
2
pgs
order
Order to Show Cause
Wed 06/23 9:56 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Why Case Should Not Be Transferred to the Central District of California. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 6/23/2021.(anh) |
|
11 | 11
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Wed 06/23 9:55 AM
ORDER Granting Joint Motion to Extend Time for Defendants to Respond to Complaint [Doc. No.9 ]. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 6/23/2021. (anh) |
|
Friday, June 11, 2021 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Party With Financial Interest
Fri 06/11 1:12 PM
NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by ByteDance Ltd., TikTok LLC, TikTok Ltd., TikTok, Inc. . No Parties With Financial Interest.(Schouten, Andrew) |
|
Att: 1 Proof of Service | ||
9 | 9
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Fri 06/11 1:08 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Complaint by ByteDance Ltd., TikTok LLC, TikTok Ltd., TikTok, Inc..(Schouten, Andrew)Attorney Andrew Edward Schouten added to party ByteDance Ltd.(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Edward Schouten added to party TikTok LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Edward Schouten added to party TikTok Ltd.(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Edward Schouten added to party TikTok, Inc.(pty:dft) |
|
Att: 1 Proof of Service | ||
Monday, May 10, 2021 | ||
8 | 8
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Mon 05/10 2:12 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Stitch Editing Ltd., as to ByteDance Ltd.. (Skale, Andrew) (anh) |
|
7 | 7
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Mon 05/10 2:11 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Stitch Editing Ltd., as to TikTok Ltd.. (Skale, Andrew) (anh) |
|
6 | 6
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Mon 05/10 2:10 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Stitch Editing Ltd., as to TikTok LLC. (Skale, Andrew) (anh) |
|
5 | 5
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Mon 05/10 2:09 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Stitch Editing Ltd., as to TikTok, Inc.. (Skale, Andrew) (anh) |
|
Monday, April 12, 2021 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Mon 04/12 2:34 PM
Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (rmc) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Party With Financial Interest
Mon 04/12 2:32 PM
NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Stitch Editing Ltd. No Parties With Financial Interest. (rmc) |
|
2 | 2
utility
Report Regarding Patent & Trademark FORM
Mon 04/12 2:29 PM
REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent and/or trademark number(s) *4,742,447* cc:USPTO (rmc) |
|
1 | 1
19
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Mon 04/12 2:27 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against ByteDance Ltd.; TikTok LLC; TikTok Ltd.; TikTok, Inc. ( Filing fee $402 receipt number ACASDC-15609802), filed by Stitch Editing Ltd. The new case number is 3:21-cv-626-CAB-BGS. Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo and Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal are assigned to the case. (Skale, Andrew)(rmc) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A to Complaint, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B to Complaint |