Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Leigh Martin May
Referred: Walter E Johnson
Case #: 1:21-cv-01426
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000 Job Discrimination (Sex)
Case Filed:Apr 09, 2021
Terminated:Aug 16, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 06, 2021 5:41 AM EDT
Counter Claimant
Eagles Landing Family Practice, LLC
Represented By
Henry M. Perlowski
Arnall Golden Gregory Llp-Atl
contact info
Megan P. Mitchell
Arnall Golden Gregory Llp-Atl
contact info
Counter Claimant
Nicholas Williams
Represented By
Henry M. Perlowski
Arnall Golden Gregory Llp-Atl
contact info
Megan P. Mitchell
Arnall Golden Gregory Llp-Atl
contact info
Counter Defendant
Towanda Smith
Represented By
Patrick J Fitzgerald
Wargo & French LLP
contact info
Vernon M. Strickland
Wargo & French LLP
contact info
Defendant
Eagles Landing Family Practice, LLC
Represented By
Lindsey E. Hughes
Arnall Golden Gregory, LLP
contact info
Henry M. Perlowski
Arnall Golden Gregory Llp-Atl
contact info
Megan P. Mitchell
Arnall Golden Gregory Llp-Atl
contact info
Defendant
Nicholas Williams
Represented By
Lindsey E. Hughes
Arnall Golden Gregory, LLP
contact info
Henry M. Perlowski
Arnall Golden Gregory Llp-Atl
contact info
Megan P. Mitchell
Arnall Golden Gregory Llp-Atl
contact info
Plaintiff
Towanda Smith
Represented By
Patrick J Fitzgerald
Wargo & French LLP
contact info
Vernon M. Strickland
Wargo & French LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Wednesday, December 13, 2023
252 252 misc Judgment - Clerk Wed 12/13 9:09 AM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of Defendants for $22,548.83 in litigation costs. (tht)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 12, 2023
251 251 14 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Wed 12/13 8:47 AM
ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion to Disallow Costs, Dkt.248 , is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part: the Court awards costs to Defendants but reduces the amount. The Clerk is DIRECTED to enter judgment in favor of Defendants for $22,548.83 in litigation costs. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 12/12/2023. c:Financial Office(tht)
Related: [-]