Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:21-cv-00612
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Apr 13, 2021
Case in other court:Minnesota, 0:21-cv-00815
Last checked: Sunday Oct 10, 2021 5:30 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
Defendant
AEARO LLC
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Plaintiff
AMANDA ABNEY
Represented By
JARED M REAMS
Eckland & Blando Llp - Minneapolis Mn
contact info
JEFF H ECKLAND
Eckland & Blando Llp - Minneapolis Mn
contact info
VINCE C REUTER
Eckland & Blando - Minneapolis Mn
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, April 30, 2021
11 11 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 04/30 12:56 PM
SHORT FORM AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by AMANDA ABNEY. (ECKLAND, JEFF)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 04/30 12:54 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by VINCE C REUTER on behalf of AMANDA ABNEY (REUTER, VINCE)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 04/30 12:53 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by JARED M REAMS on behalf of AMANDA ABNEY (REAMS, JARED)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 04/30 12:49 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by JEFF H ECKLAND on behalf of AMANDA ABNEY (ECKLAND, JEFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 13, 2021
7 7 4 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Tue 04/13 4:24 PM
PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 17 ORDER GOVERNING ADOPTION OF MASTER COMPLAINT AND SHORT FORM COMPLAINT FOR FILED CASES. Any Plaintiff whose case becomes part of this MDL after the date of this Order, either by a direct filing and assignment to this Court (if permitted by subsequent order of the Court) or by transfer from another district or from another judge in this district, must file a Short Form Complaint within 20 days from the date of transfer or, if originally filed in this district, assignment to this Court. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/16/2019. (Amended (Short Form) Complaint due by 5/3/2021 .) (djb)
Related: [-]
6 6 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer (COURT USE ONLY) Tue 04/13 3:26 PM
Case transferred in from District of Minnesota; Case Number 0:21-cv-00815. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
5 5 3 pgs order Order Tue 04/13 10:01 AM
CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-104) transferring case to the Northern District of Florida per the MDL Panel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to the Honorable M. Casey Rodgers.(MMP) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/13/2021.]
Related: [-]
Friday, March 26, 2021
4 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge John R. Tunheim per MDL list, referred to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Please use case number 21-cv-815 JRT/KMM. (kt) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/13/2021.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 25, 2021
3 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by 3M Company re1 Notice of Removal,2 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/13/2021.]
Related: [-]
2 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant 3M Company. (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/13/2021.]
Related: [-]
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-8633843) filed by 3M Company. No summons requested. (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/13/2021.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons and Complaint,
Att: 2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet