THOMPSON v 3M COMPANY et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885
Florida Northern District Court | |
Judge: | M Casey Rodgers |
Referred: | Gary R Jones |
Case #: | 3:21-cv-00660 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Apr 14, 2021 |
Case in other court: | Minnesota, 0:21-cv-00896 |
Last checked: Monday Oct 11, 2021 6:52 AM EDT |
Defendant
3M COMPANY
|
|
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
|
|
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
|
|
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
|
|
Defendant
AEARO LLC
|
|
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
JUSTIN THOMPSON
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Tuesday, May 04, 2021 | ||
11 | 11
![]() SHORT FORM AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by JUSTIN THOMPSON. (ECKLAND, JEFF) |
|
10 | 10
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by VINCE C REUTER on behalf of JUSTIN THOMPSON (REUTER, VINCE) |
|
9 | 9
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by JARED M REAMS on behalf of JUSTIN THOMPSON (REAMS, JARED) |
|
8 | 8
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by JEFF H ECKLAND on behalf of JUSTIN THOMPSON (ECKLAND, JEFF) |
|
Wednesday, April 14, 2021 | ||
7 | 7
![]() PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 17 ORDER GOVERNING ADOPTION OF MASTER COMPLAINT AND SHORT FORM COMPLAINT FOR FILED CASES. Any Plaintiff whose case becomes part of this MDL after the date of this Order, either by a direct filing and assignment to this Court (if permitted by subsequent order of the Court) or by transfer from another district or from another judge in this district, must file a Short Form Complaint within 20 days from the date of transfer or, if originally filed in this district, assignment to this Court. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/16/2019. (Amended (Short Form) Complaint due by 5/4/2021 .) (djb) |
|
6 | 6
![]() Case transferred in from District of Minnesota; Case Number 0:21-cv-00896. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Tuesday, April 13, 2021 | ||
5 | 5
![]() |
|
Wednesday, March 31, 2021 | ||
4 | 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge John R. Tunheim per MDL Direct list, referred to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Please use case number 21-cv-896 (JRT/KMM). (KNK) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/14/2021.] | |
3 | 3
![]() |
|
2 | 2
![]() |
|
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |