Illinois Northern District Court
Judge:Elaine E Bucklo
Case #: 1:21-cv-01996
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Apr 14, 2021
Terminated:Jan 05, 2024
Last checked: Monday Oct 11, 2021 4:58 AM CDT
Defendant
Bystronic, Inc.
Represented By
Tara Cristin O'Mahoney
Cremer, Spina, Shaughnessy, Jansen & Siegert, LLC
contact info
Edmund James Siegert
Cremer, Spina Shaughnessy Jansen & Siegert LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Motobilt, Inc.
Represented By
Mark Richard Miller
Wexler Wallace LLP
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
On Point Solutions, Inc.
Terminated: 07/12/2021
Represented By
Joseph Selbka
Pluymert, Macdonald, Hargrove & Lee, Ltd.
contact info
Thomas Wirt Hargrove
Pluymert, Macdonald Hargrove, & Lee, Ltd.
contact info

GPO Jan 05 2024
MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order signed by the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 1/5/2024. Mailed notice. (mgh, )

Docket last updated: 06/17/2024 10:06 AM CDT
Wednesday, April 14, 2021
CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable M. David Weisman. Case assignment: Random assignment. (as, )
Related: [-]
SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Bystronic, Inc., On Point Solutions, Inc. (crl, )
Related: [-]
1 1 19 pgs COMPLAINT Receipt #0752-18124705 filed by Motobilt, Inc.; Jury Demand.(Miller, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
2 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Motobilt, Inc. by Mark Richard Miller (Miller, Mark)
Related: [-]