California Central District Court
Case #: 2:21-cr-00122
Case Filed:Mar 16, 2021
Last checked: Thursday Apr 15, 2021 12:31 AM PDT
Defendant
Caleb Saunders (1)
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Jaymie L. Roybal
Sausa - Office Of Us Attorney
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/15/2021 1:13 AM PDT
Wednesday, December 02, 2020
1 1 COMPLAINT filed as to Defendant Caleb Saunders in violation of 18:111(a)(1),(b). Approved by Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon as to Caleb Saunders (1). (ja) [2:20-mj-05879-DUTY]
Related: [-]
3 3 NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR DETENTION filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant Caleb Saunders (ja) [2:20-mj-05879-DUTY]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 16, 2021
4 4 INDICTMENT Filed as to Caleb Saunders (1) count(s) 1. Offense occurred in LA. (mhe)
Related: [-]
5 5 CASE SUMMARY filed by AUSA Jaymie L Roybal as to Defendant Caleb Saunders; defendants Year of Birth: 1990 (mhe)
Related: [-]
6 6 NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR DETENTION filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant Caleb Saunders (mhe)
Related: [-]