Missouri Eastern District Court
Judge:Matthew T Schelp
Case #: 4:21-cv-00438
Nature of Suit880 Civil Rights - Defend Trade Secrets Act of 2016 (DTSA)
Cause18:1836(a) Injunction against Misappropriation of Trade Secrets
Case Filed:Apr 15, 2021
Terminated:Dec 06, 2021
Last checked: Tuesday Oct 12, 2021 4:41 AM CDT
Defendant
Drew Carter
6241 McPherson Ave
St. Louis, MO 63130
Represented By
Brian M. Wacker
Smithamundsen Llc - St Louis
contact info
Justin A. Welply
Smith Amundsen Llc - St Louis
contact info
Richard Z. Wolf
Horwood And Marcus
contact info
Matthew R. Barrett
Horwood And Marcus
contact info
Defendant
Daniel Conwell
8601 Glenwood Dr.
St. Louis, MO 63126
Represented By
Brian M. Wacker
Smithamundsen Llc - St Louis
contact info
Justin A. Welply
Smith Amundsen Llc - St Louis
contact info
Richard Z. Wolf
Horwood And Marcus
contact info
Matthew R. Barrett
Horwood And Marcus
contact info
Defendant
Chris Dornfeld
6318 Waterman Ave
St. Louis, MO 63130
Represented By
Brian M. Wacker
Smithamundsen Llc - St Louis
contact info
Justin A. Welply
Smith Amundsen Llc - St Louis
contact info
Richard Z. Wolf
Horwood And Marcus
contact info
Matthew R. Barrett
Horwood And Marcus
contact info
Defendant
Andrew Hrdlicka
4803 Forder Oaks Ct
St. Louis, MO 63129
Represented By
Brian M. Wacker
Smithamundsen Llc - St Louis
contact info
Justin A. Welply
Smith Amundsen Llc - St Louis
contact info
Richard Z. Wolf
Horwood And Marcus
contact info
Matthew R. Barrett
Horwood And Marcus
contact info
Defendant
Laurel Newman
304 West Rose Hill Ave
St. Louis, MO 63122
Represented By
Brian M. Wacker
Smithamundsen Llc - St Louis
contact info
Justin A. Welply
Smith Amundsen Llc - St Louis
contact info
Richard Z. Wolf
Horwood And Marcus
contact info
Matthew R. Barrett
Horwood And Marcus
contact info
Defendant
Ben Valenti
3636 Oxford Ave
St. Louis, MO 63143
Represented By
Brian M. Wacker
Smithamundsen Llc - St Louis
contact info
Justin A. Welply
Smith Amundsen Llc - St Louis
contact info
Richard Z. Wolf
Horwood And Marcus
contact info
Matthew R. Barrett
Horwood And Marcus
contact info
Defendant
Jesse Wolfersberger
52 Forest Crest Drive
Chesterfield, MO 63017
Represented By
Brian M. Wacker
Smithamundsen Llc - St Louis
contact info
Justin A. Welply
Smith Amundsen Llc - St Louis
contact info
Richard Z. Wolf
Horwood And Marcus
contact info
Matthew R. Barrett
Horwood And Marcus
contact info
Defendant
We Whistle, LLC
Represented By
Brian M. Wacker
Smithamundsen Llc - St Louis
contact info
Justin A. Welply
Smith Amundsen Llc - St Louis
contact info
Richard Z. Wolf
Horwood And Marcus
contact info
Matthew R. Barrett
Horwood And Marcus
contact info
Defendant
Whistle Systems, Inc.
Represented By
Brian M. Wacker
Smithamundsen Llc - St Louis
contact info
Justin A. Welply
Smith Amundsen Llc - St Louis
contact info
Richard Z. Wolf
Horwood And Marcus
contact info
Matthew R. Barrett
Horwood And Marcus
contact info
Plaintiff
Maritz Holdings Inc.
1375 N. Highway Drive
Fenton, MO 63026
Represented By
Bradley W. Tharpe
Ogletree Deakins Pc - St Louis
contact info
Daniel P. O'Meara
Ogletree Deakins Pc - Philadelphia
contact info
Justin Allen
Ogletree Deakins Pc - Indianapolis
contact info
Gregg M. Lemley
Ogletree Deakins Pc - St Louis
contact info
Plaintiff
Maritz Motivation Inc.
1375 N. Highway Drive
Fenton, MO 63026
Represented By
Bradley W. Tharpe
Ogletree Deakins Pc - St Louis
contact info
Daniel P. O'Meara
Ogletree Deakins Pc - Philadelphia
contact info
Justin Allen
Ogletree Deakins Pc - Indianapolis
contact info
Gregg M. Lemley
Ogletree Deakins Pc - St Louis
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Thursday, March 10, 2022
132 132 1 pgs order Order (will rule a motion and set/satisfy a schedule) Fri 03/11 3:31 PM
ORDER : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant's Motion for Indefinite Sealing, Doc,130 , is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all documents previously sealed in this matter are to remain SEALED indefinitely. Signed by District Judge Matthew T. Schelp on 03/10/2022. (KCD)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 07, 2022
131 131 respm Sealed Memo in Support of Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Mon 03/07 1:58 PM
SEALED MEMORANDUM in Support of 130 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Indefinitely filed by Plaintiffs Maritz Holdings Inc., Maritz Motivation Inc.. Redacted Copy due by 3/10/2022. (Tharpe, Bradley)
Related: [-]
130 130 motion Leave to File Under Seal Mon 03/07 1:54 PM
Joint MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Indefinitely by Plaintiffs Maritz Holdings Inc., Maritz Motivation Inc.. (Tharpe, Bradley)
Related: [-]