Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:J P Boulee
Referred: Catherine M Salinas
Case #: 1:21-cv-01479
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000 Job Discrimination (Sex)
Case Filed:Apr 14, 2021
Terminated:Apr 04, 2022
Last checked: Monday Oct 11, 2021 7:23 AM EDT
Defendant
Sovereign Staffing Group, Inc.
Represented By
Lauren Felice Gordon
Jackson Lewis P.C. -Atl
contact info
Tracie Johnson Maurer
Jackson Lewis, P.C. -Atl
contact info
Defendant
Walmart Fulfillment Services, LLC
Represented By
Hee Won Choi
Mcfadden Davis, LLC
contact info
Chandra Cain Davis
The Employment Law Solution: Mcfadden Davis, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Stardae Mosley
Represented By
Victor Severin Roberts
Barrett & Farahany, LLP
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Wal-Mart Fulfillment Services, LLC
Terminated: 07/06/2021
Represented By
Hee Won Choi
Mcfadden Davis, LLC
contact info
Chandra Cain Davis
The Employment Law Solution: Mcfadden Davis, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Monday, April 04, 2022
misc Clerks Entry of Dismissal Mon 04/04 12:50 PM
Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING75 Stipulation of Dismissal pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(ii) (ane)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Mon 04/04 12:53 PM
Civil Case Terminated. Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas terminated from case. (ane)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 01, 2022
75 75 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 04/01 11:11 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Stardae Mosley. (Roberts, Victor)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 30, 2022
74 74 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Wed 03/30 2:14 PM
ORDER granting attorney Hee Won Choi's73 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Defendant Walmart Fulfillment Services, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas on 3/30/2022. (bgt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 29, 2022
73 73 motion Withdraw As Attorney Tue 03/29 4:20 PM
MOTION to Withdraw Hee Won Choi as Attorneyby Walmart Fulfillment Services, LLC.(Choi, Hee Won)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order