Texas Western District Court
Case #: 2:21-cr-00545
Case Filed:Apr 14, 2021
Last checked: Friday Apr 16, 2021 2:43 AM CDT
Defendant
Alondra Lopez (1)
Represented By
Dalila Padilla Paxton
Office Of The Federal Public Defender
contact info
Priscilla Puente-Chacon
Law Office Of Puente-Chacon, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Stephen Tian Li Kam
Us Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/16/2021 3:25 AM CDT
Sunday, March 21, 2021
Arrest of Alondra Lopez (ccl) [2:21-mj-00485-CW]
Related: [-]
Monday, March 22, 2021
ARREST Warrant Returned Executed on 3/21/2021 as to Alondra Lopez. (ccl) [2:21-mj-00485-CW]
Related: [-]
ORAL MOTION to Continue, ORAL MOTION to Detain Defendant without Bond by USA as to Alondra Lopez. (clda) [2:21-mj-00485-CW]
Related: [-]
ORAL ORDER GRANTING ORAL Motion to Continue as to Alondra Lopez (1); GRANTING ORAL Motion to Detain Defendant without Bond as to Alondra Lopez (1).By Judge Collis White. (clda) [2:21-mj-00485-CW]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT Signed by Judge Collis White as to Alondra Lopez. (ccl) [2:21-mj-00485-CW]
Related: [-]
2 2 Arrest Warrant Issued by Judge Collis White as to Alondra Lopez. (ccl) [2:21-mj-00485-CW]
Related: [-]
3 3 Proceedings held before Judge Collis White:Video Initial Appearance as to Alondra Lopez held on 3/22/2021 Detention Hearing AND Preliminary Hearing set for 3/25/2021 11:00AM before Judge Collis White, Spanish Language Interpreter NOT required as to Alondra Lopez (Court Reporter FTR GOLD - JMendoza.) (clda) [2:21-mj-00485-CW]
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 25, 2021
4 4 VIDEO Proceedings held before Judge Collis White:Attorney Status Hearing as to Alondra Lopez held on 3/25/2021; Detention Hearing AND Preliminary Hearing RESET for 3/30/2021 09:00 AM before Judge Victor R. Garcia (Court Reporter FTR Gold J Mendoza.) (ccl) [2:21-mj-00485-CW]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 30, 2021
5 5 VIDEO Proceedings held before Judge Victor R. Garcia:Attorney Status Hearing as to Alondra Lopez held on 3/30/2021; Detention Hearing AND Preliminary Hearing RESET for 4/9/2021 09:00 AM before Judge Victor R. Garcia; Court appoints Federal Public Defender. (Court Reporter FTR Gold C. Levrie.) (ccl) [2:21-mj-00485-CW]
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to Alondra Lopez. Signed by Judge Victor R. Garcia. (sjda) [2:21-mj-00485-CW]
Related: [-]
Monday, April 05, 2021
Attorney Dalila Padilla Paxton terminated as to Alondra Lopez. (ccl) [2:21-mj-00485-CW]
Related: [-]
8 8 Sealed Order. Signed by Judge Victor R. Garcia. (ccl) [2:21-mj-00485-CW]
Related: [-]
9 9 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL as to Alondra Lopez Priscilla Puente-Chacon for Alondra Lopez appointed.. Signed by Judge Victor R. Garcia. (ccl) [2:21-mj-00485-CW]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 06, 2021
10 10 Unopposed MOTION to Continue by Alondra Lopez. (Puente-Chacon, Priscilla) [2:21-mj-00485-CW]
Related: [-]
11 11 ORDER GRANTING10 Motion to Continue as to Alondra Lopez (1) Detention Hearing AND Preliminary Hearing RESET for 4/15/2021 09:00 AM before Judge Victor R. Garcia,. Signed by Judge Victor R. Garcia. (ccl) [2:21-mj-00485-CW]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 14, 2021
12 12 INDICTMEN Related [+] filed. Unredacted document sealed pursuant to E-Government Act of 2002 as to Alondra Lopez (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4, 5. (ccr)
Related: [-] dacted Version