Ramirez v. The City of New York et al
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Frederic Block |
Referred: | Marilyn D Go |
Case #: | 1:14-cv-04187 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Jul 08, 2014 |
Terminated: | Feb 09, 2015 |
Last checked: Sunday May 10, 2015 4:32 PM EDT |
Defendant
Sergeant Aiman Ahmed
|
|
Defendant
Police Officers John/Jane Doe(s) #s 1-10
|
|
Defendant
Detective Winston McDonald
|
|
Defendant
Detective Oghenevighd Okrokoto
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Police Officer Cecilia Pena
|
|
Defendant
Detective Denise Rinaldi
|
|
Defendant
The City of New York
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dennis Ramirez
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, February 09, 2015 | ||
18 | 18
![]() Letter Submitted In Accordance With The Court's Order Dated December 9, 2014, Advising The Court That The Parties Have Reached A Settlement Agreement, by Oghenevighd Okrokoto, The City of New York (Speight, Melanie) |
|
17 | 17
![]() STIPULATION and Order of Dismissal, Executed by the Parties and Submitted for the Court's Endorsement, by Oghenevighd Okrokoto, The City of New York (Speight, Melanie) |
|
order
Order Dismissing Case
Mon 02/09 3:41 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER DISMISSING CASE: See entry17 . The Court declines to retain jurisdiction over this case should any party breach the terms of the settlement agreement. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 2/9/2015. (Innelli, Michael) |
||
Tuesday, December 09, 2014 | ||
order
Status Report Order
Tue 12/09 9:26 AM
STATUS REPORT ORDER: The parties must file a report on the status of settlement discussions by 2/9/2015. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Marilyn D. Go on 12/9/2014. (Hugh, Lewis) |
||
Monday, December 08, 2014 | ||
16 | 16
![]() Letter re: Court's Request for Status Conference by Dennis Ramirez (Zelman, David) |
|
Thursday, November 13, 2014 | ||
15 | 15
![]() |
|
Wednesday, November 12, 2014 | ||
14 | 14
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Wednesday, October 22, 2014 | ||
Minute Entry for Initial Conference held on 10/22/2014 before Magistrate Judge Marilyn D. Go: Appearances by D. Zelman for plaintiff; M. Speight for defendants. Schedule established pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) as follows: (1) automatic disclosures must be served by 10/22/14 and promptly supplemented after receipt of files from the District Attorney's Office; (2) plaintiff is given leave, on consent, to file an amended complaint by 11/15/14 naming the "John Doe" officers involved in the decision to arrest plaintiff and/or in the actual arrest; (3) discovery must be completed by 4/22/15 . The parties advise they do not intend to have experts; (4) the parties must file a status report by 12/8/14 regarding progress in settlement and are encouraged to call the Court before this date to schedule a telephone settlement conference. Counsel for defendants shall assist providing a copy of the waiver of service to Officer Pena and facilitating appearance on her behalf. FTR/C: 2:35-2:45 (Hugh, Lewis) | ||
Wednesday, October 08, 2014 | ||
ORDER granting13 Motion to Adjourn Conference: The conference on 10/09/2014 is adjourned to 10/22/2014 at 2:00 p.m. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Marilyn D. Go on 10/8/2014. (Hugh, Lewis) | ||
Tuesday, October 07, 2014 | ||
13 | 13
![]() |
|
Tuesday, September 09, 2014 | ||
12 | 12
![]() |
|
11 | 11
![]() |
|
Tuesday, September 02, 2014 | ||
10 | 10
![]() |
|
9 | 9
![]() |
|
Wednesday, August 20, 2014 | ||
8 | 8
![]() |
|
7 | 7
![]() |
|
Wednesday, July 23, 2014 | ||
6 | 6
![]() |
|
Wednesday, July 09, 2014 | ||
5 | 5
![]() |
|
4 | 4
![]() |
|
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. The following corrections were made: Cause of Action, titles and shield numbers added to defendant's. (Bowens, Priscilla) | ||
ELECTRONIC ORDER: Granting Plaintiff's motion3 for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk is directed to forward to the United States Marshal's Office for the Eastern District of New York copies of plaintiff's summons and complaint. The Marshal is directed serve the summons and complaint upon the defendants without prepayment of fees. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 7/9/2014. (Innelli, Michael) | ||
Tuesday, July 08, 2014 | ||
3 | 3
![]() |
|
2 | 2
![]() |
|
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Case assigned to Judge Frederic Block and Magistrate Judge Marilyn D. Go. (Bowens, Priscilla) |