Ross v. Ceballos et al
Louisiana Western District Court | |
Judge: | S Maurice Hicks |
Referred: | Mark L Hornsby |
Case #: | 5:14-cv-02279 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment) |
Case Filed: | Jul 08, 2014 |
Terminated: | Jul 02, 2015 |
Last checked: Monday May 11, 2015 5:35 AM CDT |
Defendant
Elisabeth Ceballos
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Motel 6 Operating L P
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Amanda Nacole Ross
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Thursday, July 02, 2015 | ||
16 | 16
order
Judgment
Thu 07/02 10:45 AM
JUDGMENT: IT IS ORDERED that7 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED. All of the Plaintiff Amanda Ross' Title VII and state law claims are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge S Maurice Hicks on 7/2/2015. (crt,Keifer, K) |
|
15 | 15
6
pgs
order
Memorandum Ruling
Thu 07/02 10:42 AM
MEMORANDUM RULING re7 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Elisabeth Ceballos, Motel 6 Operating L P. A judgment shall issue herewith. Signed by Judge S Maurice Hicks on 7/2/2015. (crt,Keifer, K) |
|
Monday, November 10, 2014 | ||
14 | 14 REPLY to Response to Motion re7 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Elisabeth Ceballos, Motel 6 Operating L P. (crt,Putch, A) | |
13 | 13 ORDER granting12 Motion for Leave to File Reply. Signed by Judge S Maurice Hicks on 11/10/2014. (crt,Putch, A) | |
Thursday, November 06, 2014 | ||
12 | 12 MOTION for Leave to File Reply by Elisabeth Ceballos, Motel 6 Operating L P.(aty,LeClercq, Frederic) Modified on 11/7/2014 to correct docket and motion text (Whidden, C). | |
Att: 1 Proposed order, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed pleading | ||
Thursday, October 30, 2014 | ||
11 | 11 3 pgs MEMORANDUM in Opposition re7 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Amanda Nacole Ross. (crt,Keifer, K) | |
Wednesday, October 29, 2014 | ||
10 | 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Elisabeth Ceballos, Motel 6 Operating L P. (aty,LeClercq, Frederic) | |
Friday, October 17, 2014 | ||
9 | 9 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re:7 Motion to Dismiss sent to Frederic T LeClercq on behalf of Motel 6 Operating L P. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 10/31/2014. (crt,Whidden, C) | |
8 | 8 NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding7 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. Motions referred to Judge S Maurice Hicks. (crt,Whidden, C) | |
7 | 7 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Elisabeth Ceballos, Motel 6 Operating L P.(Attorney Frederic T LeClercq added to party Elisabeth Ceballos(pty:dft), Attorney Frederic T LeClercq added to party Motel 6 Operating L P(pty:dft))(aty,LeClercq, Frederic) | |
Att: 1 Memorandum / Brief, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed order | ||
Tuesday, July 22, 2014 | ||
6 | 6 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Elisabeth Ceballos, Motel 6 Operating L P (crt,Putch, A) | |
Monday, July 21, 2014 | ||
5 | 5 ORDER granting2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 7/21/2014. (crt,Putch, A) | |
Thursday, July 17, 2014 | ||
4 | 4 PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT re2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Amanda Nacole Ross. (crt,Putch, A) | |
3 | 3 MINUTE ENTRY: The above-captioned matter is hereby TRANSFERRED to the docket of Judge S Maurice Hicks for further proceedings. IT IS SO ORDERED. Judge Elizabeth E Foote no longer assigned to case. Issued by Judge Elizabeth E Foote on 7/17/2014. (crt,Putch, A) | |
Tuesday, July 08, 2014 | ||
2 | 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Amanda Nacole Ross. (crt,Walker, B) | |
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against Elisabeth Ceballos, Motel 6 Operating L P with Jury Demand filed by Amanda Nacole Ross.(crt,Walker, B) | |
Att: 1 Civil cover sheet | ||
CASE Assigned to Judge Elizabeth E Foote and Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Thigpen, M) |