Virginia Eastern District Court
Case #: 2:21-cr-00027
Case Filed:Mar 19, 2021
Terminated:Sep 28, 2022
Last checked: Wednesday Jun 16, 2021 8:04 PM EDT
Defendant
Avery Angelo Palmer (1)
Represented By
Paul Todd Sartwell
Dickerson & Smith Law Group
contact info
Defendant
Carrington Drew Palmer (2)
Represented By
Lawrence Hunter Woodward, Jr.
Ruloff Swain Haddad Morecock Talbert & Woodward, PC
contact info
Defendant
Thomas Weldon Palmer (3)
Represented By
James Orlando Broccoletti
Zoby & Broccoletti
contact info
Defendant
Christopher Brandon Vasquez (4)
Represented By
Amanda Catherine Conner
Federal Public Defender'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Richard Vizcarrondo, Jr. (5)
Represented By
Catherine MacLean Six
East Coast Trial Lawyers PLC
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
William Buchanan Jackson
United States Attorney'S Office - Norfolk
contact info


Docket last updated: 02/27/2023 10:46 PM EST
Friday, March 19, 2021
1 1 2 pgs MOTION to Seal Indictment by USA as to all defendants (bpet, ) Modified Text on 4/6/2021 (afar, ).
Related: [-]
2 2 1 pgs ORDER granting1 Motion to Seal Indictment as to all defendants Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask on 3/19/21. (bpet, ) Modified text on 4/6/2021 (afar, ).
Related: [-]
3 3 14 pgs INDICTMENT RETURNED AND FILED IN OPEN COURT as to Avery Angelo Palmer, Carrington Drew Palmer, Thomas Weldon Palmer, Christopher Brandon Vasquez, Richard Vizcarrondo, Jr. On motion of the Government, the Court directed warrants to be issued. (bpet, ) (Main Document 3 replaced on 4/6/2021) (afar, ). Modified text on 4/6/2021 (afar, ). (Main Document 3 replaced on 4/13/2021) (bpet, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 5 pgs Criminal Cover Sheet
5 5 Arrest Warrant Issued and Delivered to USM in case as to Avery Angelo Palmer. (jhie, )
Related: [-]
7 7 Arrest Warrant Issued and Delivered to USM in case as to Carrington Drew Palmer. (jhie, )
Related: [-]
9 9 Arrest Warrant Issued and Delivered to USM in case as to Thomas Weldon Palmer. (jhie, )
Related: [-]
11 11 Arrest Warrant Issued and Delivered to USM in case as to Christopher Brandon Vasquez. (jhie, )
Related: [-]
13 13 Arrest Warrant Issued and Delivered to USM in case as to Richard Vizcarrondo, Jr. (jhie, )
Related: [-]