Garzilli v. Seabound Group, LLC. et al
Rhode Island District Court | |
Judge: | John J Mcconnell, Jr |
Referred: | Patricia A Sullivan |
Case #: | 1:14-cv-00310 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Jul 09, 2014 |
Terminated: | May 23, 2016 |
Last checked: Saturday May 09, 2015 10:44 AM EDT |
Cross Claimant
Seabound Group, LLC.
|
Represented By
|
Cross Claimant
United Elevator Company, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
Seabound Group, LLC.
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
United Elevator Company, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Seabound Group, LLC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
United Elevator Company, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lucy E. Garzilli
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, May 23, 2016 | ||
order
Order
Mon 05/23 3:12 PM
TEXT ORDER entering20 Stipulation of Dismissal - So Ordered by Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 5/23/2016. (Barletta, Barbara) |
||
Thursday, May 19, 2016 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Stipulation
Thu 05/19 3:22 PM
STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL by Lucy E. Garzilli. (White, Todd) |
|
Tuesday, September 22, 2015 | ||
order
Order
Tue 09/22 11:58 AM
TEXT ORDER entering19 Stipulation of Dismissal as to United Elevator Company, Inc. - So Ordered by Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 9/22/2015. (Barletta, Barbara) |
||
minutes
Settlement Conference
Tue 09/22 4:23 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan: Settlement Conference held on 9/22/2015. (Chambers at 2:00.) (Saucier, Martha) |
||
Monday, September 21, 2015 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Stipulation
Mon 09/21 10:15 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Defendant United Elevator Company, Inc., only by United Elevator Company, Inc.. (Cloherty, John) |
|
Friday, September 04, 2015 | ||
minutes
Telephone Conference
Fri 09/04 9:47 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan: Telephone Conference held on 9/4/2015. (Chambers at 9:30.) (Saucier, Martha) |
||
Tuesday, July 28, 2015 | ||
18 | 18
notice
Notice of Hearing
Tue 07/28 10:19 AM
NOTICE of SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE and SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER: Settlement Conference set for 9/15/2015 02:00 PM in Magistrate Judge Sullivan Chambers - Room P-285 before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. Telephone Conference set for 9/1/2015 04:30 PM with counsel of record in Magistrate Judge Sullivan Chambers - Room P-285 before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. Court to initiate the call(Saucier, Martha) |
|
order
Order
Tue 07/28 10:24 AM
TEXT ORDER vacating re18 NOTICE of SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE and SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER: Please refer to17 Notice of Settlement Conference and Settlement Conference Order for dates of Settlement Conference and Telephone Conference. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan on 7/28/2015. (Saucier, Martha) |
||
Thursday, July 23, 2015 | ||
17 | 17
order
Order ~Util - Set Hearings
Thu 07/23 4:19 PM
SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER AND NOTICE OF Settlement Conference set for 9/22/2015 02:00 PM in Magistrate Judge Sullivan Chambers - Room P-285 before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. Telephone Conference set for 9/4/2015 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. The court will initiate the call. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan on 7/23/2015. (Noel, Jeannine) |
|
utility
Remark
Thu 07/23 11:48 AM
This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan for a settlement conference (Barletta, Barbara) |
||
Tuesday, June 23, 2015 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Tue 06/23 8:45 AM
TEXT ORDER granting as unopposed16 Motion to suppress certain portions of the deposition of Kevin Caughey- So Ordered by Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 6/23/15. (Barletta, Barbara) |
||
Thursday, June 04, 2015 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Thu 06/04 1:19 PM
MOTION to Suppress filed by Lucy E. Garzilli. Responses due by 6/22/2015(White, Todd) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 | ||
Thursday, March 05, 2015 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Affidavit
Thu 03/05 11:13 AM
AFFIDAVIT by Lucy E. Garzilli. (McGuire, Vickie) |
|
Friday, October 31, 2014 | ||
14 | 14
order
Scheduling Order
Fri 10/31 2:19 PM
PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Factual Discovery to close on 7/31/2015; Plaintiff's expert disclosures due by 8/31/15; Defendants' expert disclosures due by 9/30/15; Expert Discovery to close on 10/31/2015; Dispositive Motions due by 12/1/2015 and pretrial memoranda due by 12/31/15- So Ordered by Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 10/31/14(Barletta, Barbara) |
|
minutes
Rule 16 Conference
Fri 10/31 11:28 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John J. McConnell, Jr: Rule 16 Conference held on 10/31/2014; counsel of record present (Barletta, Barbara) |
||
Friday, October 24, 2014 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Rule 16 Statement
Fri 10/24 4:40 PM
RULE 16 STATEMENT by Seabound Group, LLC.. |
|
12 | 12
misc
Rule 16 Statement
Fri 10/24 2:18 PM
RULE 16 STATEMENT by United Elevator Company, Inc.. (Cloherty, John) |
|
11 | 11
misc
Rule 16 Statement
Fri 10/24 1:33 PM
RULE 16 STATEMENT by Lucy E. Garzilli. (White, Todd) |
|
Wednesday, October 08, 2014 | ||
notice
Notice of Hearing
Wed 10/08 11:29 AM
REVISED NOTICE of Hearing: Rule 16 Conference is RESET to Friday, 10/31/2014 at 09:30 AM in Judge McConnell Chambers - Room 211 (Barletta, Barbara) |
||
Tuesday, September 23, 2014 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Hearing
Tue 09/23 3:17 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: Rule 16 Conference set for Wednesday, 10/22/2014 at 09:00 AM in Judge McConnell Chambers - Room 211 (Barletta, Barbara) |
|
Monday, September 08, 2014 | ||
9 | 9
respoth
Answer to Crossclaim
Mon 09/08 4:34 PM
ANSWER to Crossclaim by Seabound Group, LLC.. |
|
Thursday, August 28, 2014 | ||
8 | 8
answer
Answer to Crossclaim
Thu 08/28 4:22 PM
ANSWER to4 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim of Co-Defendant Seabound Group, LLC by United Elevator Company, Inc..(Cloherty, John) |
|
7 | 7
answer
Answer to Complaint Crossclaim
Thu 08/28 1:06 PM
Defendant United Elevator Co., Inc.'s ANSWER to1 Complaint ,Affirmative Defenses, Jury Demand, and , CROSSCLAIM against Seabound Group, LLC. by United Elevator Company, Inc..(Cloherty, John) |
|
Monday, August 04, 2014 | ||
TEXT ORDER granting6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Reset Deadlines: United Elevator Company, Inc. answer due 8/28/2014.- So Ordered by Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 8/4/14. (Barletta, Barbara) | ||
Friday, August 01, 2014 | ||
6 | 6 Assented MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint filed by United Elevator Company, Inc.. Responses due by 8/18/2014 (Cloherty, John) | |
5 | 5 NOTICE of Appearance by John J. Cloherty, III on behalf of United Elevator Company, Inc. (Cloherty, John) | |
Wednesday, July 23, 2014 | ||
4 | 4 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against United Elevator Company, Inc. by Seabound Group, LLC. | |
Monday, July 21, 2014 | ||
3 | 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lucy E. Garzilli. United Elevator Company, Inc. served on 7/11/2014, answer due 8/1/2014. (White, Todd) | |
Friday, July 18, 2014 | ||
2 | 2 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lucy E. Garzilli. Seabound Group, LLC. served on 7/17/2014, answer due 8/7/2014. (White, Todd) | |
Thursday, July 10, 2014 | ||
Summons Issued as to Seabound Group, LLC., United Elevator Company. (Barletta, Barbara) | ||
Wednesday, July 09, 2014 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00 receipt number 14670013777 ) filed by Lucy E. Garzilli.(Barletta, Barbara) | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |