Texas Eastern District Court
Judge:Amos L Mazzant, III
Referred: Christine A Nowak
Case #: 4:21-cv-00317
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Case Filed:Apr 20, 2021
Terminated:Oct 08, 2021
Case in other court:Justice Court, Precinct 6, Denton County, Texas, D21-404J6
Last checked: Sunday Oct 17, 2021 4:19 AM CDT
Defendant
Silsa Shaunfield
4136 Catawba Ave.
Carrollton, TX 75010
Plaintiff
LVNV Funding, LLC
Represented By
Steve Ali Javandoost
Scott & Associates, PC
contact info
Matthew D Cooper
Gibbs & Bruns LLP
contact info

GPO Oct 08 2021
MEMORANDUM ORDER ADOPTING IN PART REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE for 15 Report and Recommendation. ORDERED that Plaintiff LVNV Funding, LLC's Motion to Remand (Dkt. #14) is GRANTED, and that the above-referenced cause is REMANDED to the Justice Court, Precinct 6 of Denton County, Texas, for further proceedings. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 10/7/2021. (kls, )

Docket last updated: 05/06/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Wednesday, November 03, 2021
19 19 utility Remark Wed 11/03 4:18 PM
Case received by Justice Court Precinct 6 on 10/29/2021 and assigned Case Number D21-404J6. (baf, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 27, 2021
utility Remark Wed 10/27 9:21 AM
REMAND letter, certified copy of MEMORANDUM ADOPTING IN PART REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE18 and certified copy of docket sheet mailed to the Justice Court, Precinct 6 of Denton County, Texas. (baf, )
Related: [-]
Friday, October 08, 2021
18 18 2 pgs order Memorandum & Opinion Order Adopting Report and Recommendations Fri 10/08 4:25 PM
MEMORANDUM ORDER ADOPTING IN PART REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE for15 Report and Recommendation. ORDERED that Plaintiff LVNV Funding, LLC's Motion to Remand (Dkt. #14) is GRANTED, and that the above-referenced cause is REMANDED to the Justice Court, Precinct 6 of Denton County, Texas, for further proceedings. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 10/7/2021. (kls, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 22, 2021
17 17 service Acknowledgment of Receipt Wed 09/22 4:46 PM
ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Silsa Shaunfield as to15 Report and Recommendations. (baf, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 02, 2021
16 16 misc Report and Recommendations Thu 09/02 6:02 PM
***DUPLICATE ENTRY. DOCKETED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.*** REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. The Court recommends that Plaintiff's Motion to Remand [Dkt.14 ] be GRANTED, and this case be remanded back to the Justice Court, Precinct 6 of Denton County, Texas, and the Motion to Dismiss be DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 09/02/2021. (las) Modified on 9/2/2021 (las, )
Related: [-]
15 15 misc Report and Recommendations Thu 09/02 6:01 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE re14 First MOTION to Remand to State Court Denton County Justice Court Precinct 6 filed by LVNV Funding, LLC,3 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Silsa Shaunfield. The Court recommends that Plaintiff's Motion to Remand [Dkt. 14] be GRANTED, and this case be remanded back to the Justice Court, Precinct 6 of Denton County, Texas, and the Motion to Dismiss be DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 9/2/2021. (baf, )
Related: [-]
Monday, August 16, 2021
14 14 motion Remand to State Court Mon 08/16 11:05 AM
First MOTION to Remand to State Court Denton County Justice Court Precinct 6 by LVNV Funding, LLC.(Javandoost, Steve)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Plaintiff's Proposed Order
Friday, August 13, 2021
13 13 motion Remand to State Court Fri 08/13 10:58 AM
***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT - PLEASE DISREGARD*** First MOTION to Remand to State Court Denton Justice Court Precinct 6 by LVNV Funding, LLC. (Javandoost, Steve) Modified on 8/13/2021 (baf, )
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Deficiency Fri 08/13 12:45 PM
NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the MOTION TO REMAND submitted DOCUMENT13 - NO CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE AND NO PROPOSED ORDER FILED AS AN ATTACHMENT. Correction should be made by ONE BUSINESS DAY (baf, )
Related: [-]
Monday, August 09, 2021
12 12 service Acknowledgment of Receipt Mon 08/09 3:34 PM
ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Matthew W. Cooper attorney for LVNV Funding, LLC as to Staff Notes: Court documents 1,3,4,5,7,8,9 sent to Plaintiff's Counsel, Matthew W. Cooper at Scott & Associates PC, P.O. Box 115220, Carrollton, TX 75011-5220 via Certified Mail. RRR 7020 2450 0001 8814 6130. (baf, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 05, 2021
minutes Telephone Conference Thu 08/05 2:39 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak: Telephonic Status Conference held on 8/5/2021. Case called at 2:14 p.m. Steve Javandoost appeared on behalf of Plaintiff. Defendant Silsa Shaunfield failed to appear. Plaintiff advises Court of intent to file motion to remand based on alleged lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Court advises the Rule 16 Management Conference will be rescheduled if necessary following review of any motion to remand/response thereto. Court adjourned at 2:18 p.m.(Court Reporter Digital.) (klee, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 04, 2021
11 11 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Wed 08/04 3:06 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steve Ali Javandoost on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Javandoost, Steve)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 28, 2021
10 10 service Acknowledgment of Receipt Mon 06/28 5:26 PM
ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Silsa Shaunfield as to9 Order,7 Order,8 Order, Set Hearings, Set Scheduling Order Deadlines. (baf, )
Related: [-]
Monday, June 21, 2021
9 9 1 pgs order Order Mon 06/21 5:29 PM
ORDER DIRECTING RESPONSE. Pending before the Court is Defendant Silsa Shaunfield's ("Defendant") Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint ("Motion to Dismiss") [Dkt. 3]. Plaintiff LVNV Funding, LLC ("Plaintiff") shall file a response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss [Dkt. 3], no later than Monday, July 26, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 6/21/2021. (baf, )
Related: [-]
8 8 10 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings ~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines Mon 06/21 5:26 PM
ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS. The case is SET for a Rue 16 management conference on Thursday, 8/5/2021, at 2:00 PM in Ctrm A01 (Sherman - Annex) before Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak. Rule 26 Meeting Joint Report due by 7/26/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 6/21/2021. (baf, )
Related: [-]
7 7 2 pgs order Order Mon 06/21 5:22 PM
ORDER AND ADVISORY re1 Notice of Removal filed by Silsa Shaunfield. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 6/21/2021. (baf, )
Related: [-]
Monday, June 14, 2021
6 6 service Acknowledgment of Receipt Tue 06/15 11:55 AM
ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Silsa Shaunfield as to4 Order. (baf, )
Related: [-]
Friday, June 11, 2021
5 5 respoth Response to Non-Motion Fri 06/11 11:30 AM
RESPONSE to4 Order, filed by Silsa Shaunfield .(rpc, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment 1,
Att: 2 Attachment 2,
Att: 3 Attachment 3
Monday, June 07, 2021
4 4 2 pgs order Order Mon 06/07 4:22 PM
ORDER. It is therefore ORDERED that on or before Wednesday, June 16, 2020, Defendant Silsa Shaunfield shall fully comply with Local Rule 81, including by ensuring that a copy of all pleadings that assert causes of action from the state court are filed with the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 6/7/2021. (baf, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 27, 2021
3 3 motion Dismiss Tue 04/27 10:32 AM
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Silsa Shaunfield. (baf, )
Related: [-]
Friday, April 23, 2021
misc Filing Fee Received Fri 04/23 3:36 PM
Filing fee paid: $ 402.00, receipt number 6-56498 (gsg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 20, 2021
2 2 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 04/20 12:01 PM
Case ASSIGNED to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III and REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak. (baf, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Magistrate Referral
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Tue 04/20 11:56 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Silsa Shaunfield from Justice Court, Precinct 6, Denton County, Texas, case number D21-404J6. (Filing fee $ 402), filed by Silsa Shaunfield.(baf, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet
notice Notice of Magistrate Availability Tue 04/20 12:02 PM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (baf, )
Related: [-]