Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:21-bk-10375

New Jersey Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Kathryn C Ferguson
Case #: 3:21-ap-01251
Nature of Suit41 Bankruptcy - Objection / revocation of discharge - §727(c),(d),(e)
62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:Apr 19, 2021
Terminated:Aug 27, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Deepak N. Lalwani
30 Renfield Drive
Princeton, NJ 08540
Represented By
Deepak N. Lalwani
contact info
Plaintiff
ReadyCap Lending, LLC
ReadyCap Lending, LLC 200 Connell Drive Suite 4000 200 Connell Drive, Suite 4000
Berkeley Heights, NJ 07922
Represented By
Craig L. Levinsohn
Aronsohn, Weiner & Salerno
contact info

GPO Aug 03 2021
LETTER OPINION (READ INTO THE RECORD ON 8/3/2021) (related document:5 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Defendant Deepak N. Lalwani, 12 Cross Motion re: Leave to Amend Complaint-Opposition to Motion to Dismiss) filed by Plaintiff ReadyCap Lending, LLC). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 8/3/2021. (ckk)

Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Friday, August 27, 2021
utility Close Adversary Case Fri 08/27 11:25 AM
Adversary Case (3:21-ap-1251) Closed. (ckk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 17, 2021
court Hearing Held Wed 08/18 4:11 PM
Minute of Hearing Held, OUTCOME: MOOT - ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT ENTERED 8/4/21 Related [+] (ckk)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Friday, August 06, 2021
23 23 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Sat 08/07 12:15 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 08/06/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
22 22 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Sat 08/07 12:15 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 08/06/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 04, 2021
21 21 order Cross Motion Wed 08/04 2:59 PM
ORDER DENYING CROSS-MOTION OR APPLICATION FOR THE ENTRY OF AN ORDER FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT Related [+]. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 8/4/2021. (ckk)
Related: [-] 12
20 20 2 pgs order Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Wed 08/04 2:57 PM
ORDER DISMISSING THE PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT Related [+]. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 8/4/2021. (ckk)
Related: [-] 5
Tuesday, August 03, 2021
19 19 6 pgs order Opinion Wed 08/04 12:54 PM
LETTER OPINION (READ INTO THE RECORD ON 8/3/2021) Related [+] filed by Plaintiff ReadyCap Lending, LLC). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 8/3/2021. (ckk)
Related: [-] 5 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Defendant Deepak N. Lalwani,12 Cross Motion re: Leave to Amend Complaint-Opposition to Motion to Dismiss
court Hearing Held Tue 08/03 12:15 PM
Minute of Hearing Held, OUTCOME: GRANTED Related [+] (ckk)
Related: [-] 5 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Deepak N. Lalwani
court Hearing Held Tue 08/03 12:17 PM
Minute of Hearing Held, OUTCOME: DENIED Related [+] (ckk)
Related: [-] 12 Cross Motion re: Leave to Amend Complaint-Opposition to Motion to Dismiss filed by ReadyCap Lending, LLC
Thursday, July 29, 2021
18 18 answer Opposition Thu 07/29 1:31 PM
Letter in Opposition to Plaintiff's request to file "sur-ply" Related [+] filed by Harry M. Gutfleish on behalf of Deepak N. Lalwani. (Gutfleish, Harry)
Related: [-] 17 Document re: Request for Leave to File Sur-Reply filed by Deanne J. Lowden on behalf of ReadyCap Lending, LLC. filed by Plaintiff ReadyCap Lending, LLC
17 17 misc Document Thu 07/29 12:41 PM
Document re: Request for Leave to File Sur-Reply filed by Deanne J. Lowden on behalf of ReadyCap Lending, LLC. (Lowden, Deanne)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 27, 2021
court Hearing Rescheduled (Document) Tue 07/27 11:40 AM
Hearing Rescheduled from 7/27/2021 Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 08/03/2021 at 10:00 AM at KCF - Courtroom 2, Trenton. (ckk) (RECORD CLOSED)
Related: [-] 5 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Deepak N. Lalwani
court Hearing Rescheduled (Document) Tue 07/27 11:41 AM
Hearing Rescheduled from 7/27/2021 Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 08/03/2021 at 10:00 AM at KCF - Courtroom 2, Trenton. (ckk) (RECORD CLOSED)
Related: [-] 12 Cross Motion filed by ReadyCap Lending, LLC
Thursday, July 22, 2021
16 16 misc Certificate of Service Thu 07/22 2:30 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Harry M. Gutfleish on behalf of Deepak N. Lalwani. (Gutfleish, Harry)
Related: [-] 15 Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's cross-motion for leave to file amended complaint (related document:12 Cross Motion re: Leave to Amend Complaint-Opposition to Motion to Dismiss (related document:5 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Defendant Deepak N. Lalwani) Filed by Craig L. Levinsohn, Paul J Maselli on behalf of ReadyCap Lending, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 7/27/2021 at 10:00 AM at KCF - Courtroom 2, Trenton. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Proposed Amended Complaint # 2 Brief # 3 Proposed Order) filed by Plaintiff ReadyCap Lending, LLC) filed by Harry M. Gutfleish on behalf of Deepak N. Lalwani. filed by Defendant Deepak N. Lalwani
15 15 answer Opposition Thu 07/22 2:21 PM
Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's cross-motion for leave to file amended complaint Related [+] filed by Harry M. Gutfleish on behalf of Deepak N. Lalwani. (Gutfleish, Harry)
Related: [-] 12 Cross Motion re: Leave to Amend Complaint-Opposition to Motion to Dismiss (related document:5 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Defendant Deepak N. Lalwani) Filed by Craig L. Levinsohn, Paul J Maselli on behalf of ReadyCap Lending, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 7/27/2021 at 10:00 AM at KCF - Courtroom 2, Trenton. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Proposed Amended Complaint # 2 Brief # 3 Proposed Order) filed by Plaintiff ReadyCap Lending, LLC
Wednesday, July 21, 2021
14 14 misc Certificate of Service Wed 07/21 2:22 PM
Amended Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Craig L. Levinsohn, Paul J Maselli on behalf of ReadyCap Lending, LLC. (Maselli, Paul)
Related: [-] 12 Cross Motion filed by Plaintiff ReadyCap Lending, LLC
court Notice of Docketing Error Wed 07/21 1:47 PM
Correction Notice in Electronic Filing Related [+]. Type of Error: DOCUMENT BEING SERVED IS NOT LISTED, filed by Paul J Maselli. Please correct and refile with the court. (mjb)
Related: [-] 13 Certificate of Service filed by Plaintiff ReadyCap Lending, LLC
Tuesday, July 20, 2021
13 13 misc Certificate of Service Tue 07/20 2:40 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Craig L. Levinsohn, Paul J Maselli on behalf of ReadyCap Lending, LLC. (Maselli, Paul)
Related: [-] 12 Cross Motion re: Leave to Amend Complaint-Opposition to Motion to Dismiss (related document:5 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Defendant Deepak N. Lalwani) Filed by Craig L. Levinsohn, Paul J Maselli on behalf of ReadyCap Lending, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 7/27/2021 at 10:00 AM at KCF - Courtroom 2, Trenton. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Proposed Amended Complaint # 2 Brief # 3 Proposed Order) filed by Plaintiff ReadyCap Lending, LLC
12 12 motion Cross Motion Tue 07/20 2:26 PM
Cross Motion re: Leave to Amend Complaint-Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Related [+] Filed by Craig L. Levinsohn, Paul J Maselli on behalf of ReadyCap Lending, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 7/27/2021 at 10:00 AM at KCF - Courtroom 2, Trenton. (Maselli, Paul)
Related: [-] 5 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Defendant Deepak N. Lalwani
Att: 1 Exhibit A Proposed Amended Complaint
Att: 2 Brief
Att: 3 Proposed Order
11 11 misc Notice of Appearance and Request Tue 07/20 2:20 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by Paul J Maselli on behalf of ReadyCap Lending, LLC. (Maselli, Paul)
Related: [-]
court Hearing Rescheduled (Document) Wed 07/21 1:53 PM
Hearing Rescheduled from 7/20/2021 Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 08/17/2021 at 2:15 PM at KCF - Courtroom 2, Trenton. (ghm)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Tuesday, July 13, 2021
court Hearing Rescheduled (Document) Tue 07/13 11:25 AM
Hearing Rescheduled from 7/13/2021 Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 07/27/2021 at 10:00 AM at KCF - Courtroom 2, Trenton. (ckk)
Related: [-] 5 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Deepak N. Lalwani
Tuesday, July 06, 2021
10 10 court Determination of Adjournment Request Tue 07/06 3:56 PM
Determination of Adjournment Request Granted. Hearing will be adjourned to 7/27/2021 at 10:00 a.m.. The hearing date is Not Peremptory. Related [+] (ckk)
Related: [-] 5 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Defendant Deepak N. Lalwani
9 9 court Determination of Adjournment Request Tue 07/06 3:55 PM
Determination of Adjournment Request Granted. Pre-Trial Hearing will be adjourned to 8/17/2021 at 2:15 p.m.. The hearing date is Not Peremptory. Related [+] (ckk)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Tuesday, June 22, 2021
court Hearing Rescheduled (Document) Tue 06/22 3:53 PM
Hearing Rescheduled from 6/22/2021 Related [+] Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 07/20/2021 at 02:15 PM at KCF - Courtroom 2, Trenton. (ckk)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Thursday, June 17, 2021
8 8 misc Certificate of Service Thu 06/17 3:42 PM
Amended Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Harry M. Gutfleish on behalf of Deepak N. Lalwani. (Gutfleish, Harry)
Related: [-] 5 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Deepak N. Lalwani.Hearing scheduled for 7/13/2021 at 10:00 AM at KCF - Courtroom 2, Trenton. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law # 2 Proposed Order) filed by Defendant Deepak N. Lalwani
6 6 misc Certificate of Service Thu 06/17 7:48 AM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Harry M. Gutfleish on behalf of Deepak N. Lalwani. (Gutfleish, Harry)
Related: [-] 5 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Deepak N. Lalwani.Hearing scheduled for 7/13/2021 at 10:00 AM at KCF - Courtroom 2, Trenton. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law # 2 Proposed Order) filed by Defendant Deepak N. Lalwani
5 5 motion Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Thu 06/17 7:28 AM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Deepak N. Lalwani.Hearing scheduled for 7/13/2021 at 10:00 AM at KCF - Courtroom 2, Trenton. (Gutfleish, Harry)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum of Law
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Wednesday, June 02, 2021
4 4 misc Notice of Appearance and Request Wed 06/02 9:57 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by Harry M. Gutfleish on behalf of Deepak N. Lalwani. (Gutfleish, Harry)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 25, 2021
utility Remark Tue 05/25 4:43 PM
Remark - On 5/24/2021, defendant emailed chambers requesting an extension of time (30 days) to answer the complaint. Defendant confirmed in the email that he obtained consent from counsel for Plaintiff. The request is granted. The deadline to file an answer to the complaint is JUNE 23, 2021. (ghm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 22, 2021
3 3 misc Certificate of Service Thu 04/22 10:43 AM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Craig L. Levinsohn on behalf of ReadyCap Lending, LLC. (Levinsohn, Craig)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 21-01251 Complaint by ReadyCap Lending, LLC against Deepak N. Lalwani. Fee Amount $ 350.. (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)) filed by Plaintiff ReadyCap Lending, LLC
Tuesday, April 20, 2021
2 2 court Summons Issued Tue 04/20 2:31 PM
Summons Issued to ReadyCap Lending, LLC for Service on Deepak N. Lalwani Answer due on 5/20/2021 Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 6/22/2021 at 02:15 PM at KCF - Courtroom 2, Trenton. (mjb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Pre Trial Instructions
Monday, April 19, 2021
1 1 68 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 04/19 4:52 PM
Adversary case 21-01251 Complaint by ReadyCap Lending, LLC against Deepak N. Lalwani. Fee Amount $ 350.. (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)) (Levinsohn, Craig)
Related: [-]