Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:21-bk-10375

New Jersey Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Kathryn C Ferguson
Case #: 3:21-ap-01252
Nature of Suit67 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny
41 Bankruptcy - Objection / revocation of discharge - §727(c),(d),(e)
62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:Apr 19, 2021
Terminated:Aug 06, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Deepak N. Lalwani
30 Renfield Drive
Princeton, NJ 08540
Represented By
Deepak N. Lalwani
contact info
Plaintiff
Rakesh Bhatia, Plaintiff
77 Renfield Drive 77
Princeton, NJ 08540
Represented By
Edward C. Logan
Edward C. Logan, Llc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Sanjay Mandloi
17 Renfeld Dr
Princeton, NJ 08540
Represented By
Edward C. Logan
Edward C. Logan, Llc.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/22/2025 1:08 PM EDT
Friday, August 06, 2021
utility Close Adversary Case Fri 08/06 12:02 PM
Adversary Case (3:21-ap-1252) Closed. (ckk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 03, 2021
court Hearing Held Tue 08/03 1:44 PM
Minute of Hearing Held, OUTCOME: ORDER DISMISSING ADVERSARY PROCEEDING ENTERED ON 7/20/2021 Related [+] (ckk)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Saturday, July 24, 2021
15 15 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Sun 07/25 12:15 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 07/24/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 20, 2021
14 14 2 pgs order Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Thu 07/22 11:28 AM
Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Related [+]. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 7/20/2021. (ghm)
Related: [-] 12
court Hearing Held Tue 07/20 11:54 AM
Minute of Hearing Held, OUTCOME: GRANTED Related [+] (ckk)
Related: [-] 12 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Deepak N. Lalwani
Wednesday, June 23, 2021
13 13 misc Certificate of Service Wed 06/23 7:34 AM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Harry M. Gutfleish on behalf of Deepak N. Lalwani. (Gutfleish, Harry)
Related: [-] 12 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Deepak N. Lalwani.Hearing scheduled for 7/20/2021 at 10:00 AM at KCF - Courtroom 2, Trenton. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law # 2 Proposed Order) filed by Defendant Deepak N. Lalwani
12 12 motion Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Wed 06/23 7:27 AM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Deepak N. Lalwani.Hearing scheduled for 7/20/2021 at 10:00 AM at KCF - Courtroom 2, Trenton. (Gutfleish, Harry)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum of Law
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Tuesday, June 22, 2021
court Hearing Rescheduled (Document) Tue 06/22 3:54 PM
Hearing Rescheduled from 6/22/2021 Related [+] Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 08/03/2021 at 02:15 PM at KCF - Courtroom 2, Trenton. (ckk)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Wednesday, June 16, 2021
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Thu 06/17 12:12 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 06/16/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 14, 2021
10 10 order Consent Order Mon 06/14 8:59 AM
CONSENT ORDER VACATING DEFAULT Related [+]. Filed by Harry M. Gutfleish and Edward C. Logan. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 6/14/2021. (ghm)
Related: [-] 9 Application re: for entry of Consent Order Vacating Default filed by Defendant Deepak N. Lalwani
Friday, June 04, 2021
9 9 motion Application (Generic) - Only use if no other event is applicable Fri 06/04 9:08 AM
Application re: for entry of Consent Order Vacating Default Filed by Deepak N. Lalwani.Objection deadline is 6/11/2021. (Gutfleish, Harry)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification of Consent Regarding Consent Order
Wednesday, June 02, 2021
8 8 misc Notice of Appearance and Request Wed 06/02 10:01 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by Harry M. Gutfleish on behalf of Deepak N. Lalwani. (Gutfleish, Harry)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 28, 2021
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Sat 05/29 12:22 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 05/28/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 26, 2021
6 6 court Entry of Default Wed 05/26 10:09 AM
Entry of Default against DEEPAK N LALWANI Related [+] The following parties were served: Plaintiff, Plaintiff's Attorney, Defendant. (ghm)
Related: [-] 4 Request to Enter Default filed by Plaintiff Rakesh Bhatia
Tuesday, May 25, 2021
5 5 misc Request to Enter Default Tue 05/25 5:41 PM
Request to Enter Default Against Deepak Lalwani filed by Edward C. Logan on behalf of Sanjay Mandloi. (Logan, Edward)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Request to Enter Default Tue 05/25 5:40 PM
Request to Enter Default Against Deepak Lalwani filed by Edward C. Logan on behalf of Rakesh Bhatia. (Logan, Edward)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Certificate of Service Tue 05/25 4:57 PM
First Certificate of Service. filed by Edward C. Logan on behalf of Rakesh Bhatia. (Logan, Edward)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 20, 2021
2 2 court Summons Issued Tue 04/20 2:39 PM
Summons Issued to Rakesh Bhatia and Sanjay Mandloi for Service on Deepak N. Lalwani Answer due on 5/20/2021 Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 6/22/2021 at 02:15 PM at KCF - Courtroom 2, Trenton. (mjb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Pre Trial Instructions
Monday, April 19, 2021
1 1 7 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 04/19 6:14 PM
Adversary case 21-01252 Complaint by Rakesh Bhatia, Sanjay Mandloi against Deepak N. Lalwani. Fee Amount $ 350.. (41 (Objection / revocation of discharge - 727(c),(d),(e))) (Logan, Edward)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons