Consolidated
Lead case: 1:20-cv-06131

New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Nicholas G Garaufis
Referred: Sanket J Bulsara
Case #: 1:21-cv-02175
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Apr 20, 2021
Terminated:May 28, 2021
Last checked: Sunday Oct 17, 2021 5:50 AM EDT
Defendant
Curtis, Mallet-Prevost, Colt
Defendant
Cytopath Biopsy Lab Inc
Defendant
Cyrus Knits
Defendant
Cyrus Innovation LLC
Defendant
Cyruli Shanks Hart & Zizmor
Defendant
Cypress Health Care Mgmt
Defendant
Cypress Garden
Defendant
Cyber Axioma
Defendant
Cwa Spatial Discipline
Defendant
Cutting Room Films
Defendant
Cut & Run
Defendant
Custom Exterior Systems, Inc.
Defendant
Cushman & Wakefield
Defendant
Curtis Vasile Law Offices Pc
Defendant
Children's Law Ctr,
Defendant
Chilmark Builders Inc
Defendant
Chimera Securities, LLC
Defendant
Chimpanzee Productions Inc
Defendant
China Construction America
Defendant
China Laws & Technology Inc
Defendant
China Press
Defendant
Chinatown Cardiology
Defendant
Chinses American Planning
Defendant
Chips Technology Group LLC
Defendant
Chldrn's And Women's Physicians Of West
Defendant
Choice Personnel Inc
Defendant
Choice Products
Defendant
Chosen People Ministries
Defendant
Christ Church United Methodist Nyc
Defendant
Christian Cultural Center
Defendant
Christian Faith Fellowship
Defendant
Christie's Inc.
Defendant
Christophe & Assoc.
Defendant
Christopher Chang Law Offices
Defendant
Christopher Rosekrans Law
Defendant
Christopher V Papa Architect
Defendant
Chromalloy
Defendant
Chs Services
Defendant
Chubb
Defendant
Church
Defendant
Church Of Christ International
Defendant
Church Pension Group
Defendant
Church Street Boxing Gym
Defendant
Cibc
Defendant
Cid Construction
Defendant
Cindy E Levitz Lic Acpnctrst
Defendant
Cintalta Cons. Corp
Defendant
Cintra Software & Svc Inc
Defendant
Circa Brewing Co
Defendant
Circuit Breaker Sales Ne Inc
Defendant
Cis
Defendant
Cision
Defendant
Citadel Construction Corp
Defendant
Citadines Connect Fifth Avenue
Defendant
Citi Wide Harm Reduction
Defendant
Citibank, National Association
Defendant
Citigroup Incorporated
Defendant
Citimed PLLC
Defendant
Citixsys Technologies
Defendant
Citizen General Construction Inc
Defendant
Citizen M Hotel New York
Defendant
Citnalta Construction Corp
Defendant
Citrin Cooperman And Company, Llp
Defendant
Citroen Wolf Communications
Defendant
City Choice
Defendant
City Harvest, Inc.
Defendant
City Journal
Defendant
City M D
Defendant
City Of Middletown
Defendant
City Of NY Conflicts Of Intererest
Defendant
City Of NY Department Of Parks & Recreation Capitalprojects
Defendant
City Of New York
Defendant
City Of New York Department Of Parks & Recreation
Defendant
City Of Yonkers
Defendant
City Prints LLC
Defendant
City School District Of New Rochelle
Defendant
City Sounds Of NY
Defendant
City Suites LLC
Defendant
City Translation Ctr
Defendant
City Univ Of NY Dept Of Design & Mgmt Procurement
Defendant
City University Of New York
Defendant
City View Masonry Corp
Defendant
City Wide Administrative Services
Defendant
Citybuzz
Defendant
Cityline Restoration Inc
Defendant
Cityscape Engineering
Defendant
Cityscape Obgyn PLLC
Defendant
Citysights NY
Defendant
Citywide Data Inc
Defendant
Citywide Environmental Services LLC
Defendant
Citywide Maintenance Svc
Defendant
Citywide Mobile Response Corp.
Defendant
Citywide Sewer & Drain Co
Defendant
Civcon LLC
Defendant
Civetta Cousins
Defendant
Civic Builders Inc
Defendant
Civic Entertainment Group LLC
Defendant
Civil Contracting Corp
Defendant
Cjs Industries Inc
Defendant
Ckc Maintenance Corp
Defendant
Cksk
Defendant
Cl An Druaidh/The Druid Press
Defendant
Clara Barton High School
Defendant
Clare Medical
Defendant
Claridge's Hotel Ltd
Defendant
Clarient Group
Defendant
Clarion Partners, LLC
Defendant
Clark Construction Group
Defendant
Clark Gagliardi Miller
Defendant
Clark Investigations & Scrty
Defendant
Classic Harbor Line
Defendant
Classic Heights Realty LLC
Defendant
Classic Home Care Inc
Defendant
Classic Sports Floors
Defendant
Classic Stage Co
Defendant
Classpass
Defendant
Clay LLC
Defendant
Clayman & Rosenberg
Defendant
Clayton Dubilier Rice LLC
Defendant
Clean Air Quality Svc Inc
Defendant
Clean Earth Dredging Technologies
Defendant
Clean Machine Car Wash-Detail
Defendant
Cleaning Guru
Defendant
Cleantech
Defendant
Clear It Out Contr LLC
Defendant
Clear It Out Contracting LLC
Defendant
Clevertech
Defendant
Click Model Management Inc
Defendant
Clickdaily Inc
Defendant
Clifford Chance
Defendant
Clifton Budd & Demaria Llp
Defendant
Clifton Ornamental Metal & Glass
Defendant
Cline Davis And Mann LLC
Defendant
Clinical Pain Advisor
Defendant
Clinical Resources Network LLC
Defendant
Clinical Systems Inc
Defendant
Clinton Management
Defendant
Clio Awards
Defendant
Clotho Corp
Defendant
Cloud 9 Technologies LLC
Defendant
Cloud Dx
Defendant
Clove Lakes Health Care And Rehab
Defendant
Clove Lakes Health Care-Rehab
Defendant
Clover Wire Forming Co Inc
Defendant
Club Demonstration Svc
Defendant
Club Fit
Defendant
Club Julians Inc
Defendant
Club Quarters Grand Central
Defendant
Cluen Corp
Defendant
Cluster Inc
Defendant
Cm & Assoc Constr Mgmt LLC
Defendant
Cm & E Con Inc
Defendant
Cm Almy Inc
Defendant
Cmc Rebar
Defendant
Cmd
Defendant
Cmem
Defendant
Cmg Group LLC
Defendant
Cmgrp, Inc.
Defendant
Cmp Builders Corp Inc.
Defendant
Cmp Healthcare Media
Defendant
Cmp Publications
Defendant
Cncl On Accreditation For Chldrn And Fml
Defendant
Cng
Defendant
Cny
Defendant
Cny Builders LLC
Defendant
Co 3
Defendant
Co'motion Group LLC
Defendant
Co-Collective LLC
Defendant
Coachman Family Ctr
Defendant
Coastal Contracting Corp
Defendant
Coastal Pipeline Products Corp
Defendant
Coatue Management
Defendant
Cobble Hill Health Ctr
Defendant
Cobite
Defendant
Coca Cola
Defendant
Cocentrix Corp
Defendant
Cocooning Electronics Ltd
Defendant
Code And Theory LLC
Defendant
Coffee Distribution Corp
Defendant
Cognito Americas LLC
Defendant
Cognito Inc
Defendant
Cohen & Frankel Llp
Defendant
Cohen & Slamowitz
Defendant
Cohen Childrens Medical Center
Defendant
Cohen Clair Lans Greifer
Defendant
Cohen Hochman & Allen
Defendant
Cohen Hurkin Ehrenfeld
Defendant
Cohen Kuhn & Assoc
Defendant
Cohen Weiss And Simon Llp
Defendant
Cohen Weiss Simon
Defendant
Cohens Tauber Spivac Wagner
Defendant
Cohnreznick Llp
Defendant
Cold Spring Construction Company
Defendant
Cold Spring Hls Ctr For Nursing
Defendant
Coldlion Technologies LLC
Defendant
Cole Mechanical Corp
Defendant
Cole Partners Inc
Defendant
Coleman Brandworx
Defendant
Coleman Country Day Camp
Defendant
Coler Goldwater Specialty Hosp
Defendant
Colgate-Palmolive Company
Defendant
Colina Bay, Inc
Defendant
Collaborative Construction
Defendant
Collazo Carling & Mish
Defendant
Collective 545 Broadway, LLC
Defendant
Collectivei
Defendant
Colleran O'hara & Mills
Defendant
Collibra Inc
Defendant
Collier Halpern Newberg
Defendant
Collins Aerospace
Defendant
Collis Roofing Inc
Defendant
Colon & Rectal Surgical
Defendant
Colonial Construction Co Inc
Defendant
Colonial Consulting LLC
Defendant
Colonial Electric
Defendant
Colonial Tag & Label Co
Defendant
Colony Electric Inc
Defendant
Colour Matters
Defendant
Columbia Artist
Defendant
Columbia Artists Managmnt Inc
Defendant
Columbia Cascade Co
Defendant
Columbia Cascade Company
Defendant
Columbia Softball Field
Defendant
Columbia University
Defendant
Columbiadoctors Medical Group
Defendant
Columbiadoctors Nurse
Defendant
Columbus Avenue Consulting LLC
Defendant
Columbus Medical Inst Of NY
Defendant
Comcast Spotlight, Inc.
Defendant
Comfort Bedding Inc.
Defendant
Comixology
Defendant
Comlab Systems
Defendant
Command Financial Press
Defendant
Command Security Corporation
Defendant
Commentary Magazine
Defendant
Commerce Electrical Contracting Corp
Defendant
Commercial Building Mntnc
Defendant
Commercial Fence & Railing
Defendant
Commercial Tenant Svc Inc
Defendant
Committee Of Interns And Residen
Defendant
Commodore Maintenance
Defendant
Common Ground Community Hdfc
Defendant
Communications Plus Digital
Defendant
Communicator Inc
Defendant
Community Access
Defendant
Community Action For Human Services
Defendant
Community Cardiology Pc
Defendant
Community Consultation Ctr
Defendant
Community Electric Inc
Defendant
Community Health Ctr-Richmond
Defendant
Community Healthproject
Defendant
Community Hospital At Dobbs
Defendant
Community Life Center Inc.
Defendant
Community Mainstreaming
Defendant
Community Medical And Dental Care Inc.
Defendant
Community Partners
Defendant
Community Psych
Defendant
Community Resource Ctr
Defendant
Community Resource Exchange
Defendant
Community Resources
Defendant
Community Service Society Of NY
Defendant
Comp World Usa
Defendant
Compinfo
Defendant
Complete Construction Contract
Defendant
Complete Discovery Source Inc.
Defendant
Complete Mailing Svc
Defendant
Complete Womens Imaging Pc
Defendant
Complexcare Solutions, Inc.
Defendant
Comprehensive Care Mgmt Corp
Defendant
Comprehensive Hr Advisory Services Ent.
Defendant
Comprehensive Pain Management
Defendant
Comprehensive Pediatrics
Defendant
Comprehensive Professional
Defendant
Compstak
Defendant
Computer Generated Solutions, Inc.
Defendant
Computer Managers Inc.
Defendant
Computer Services Group Inc.
Defendant
Computer Solutions Intl Inc.
Defendant
Computercool Ac Inc.
Defendant
Comunilife
Defendant
Con Edison
Defendant
Con Edison Of NY
Defendant
Con Rac Construction Group
Defendant
Concentric Group LLC
Defendant
Concentric Health Experience
Defendant
Concept Air Conditioning
Defendant
Concept Construction Svc Inc
Defendant
Concepts In Staffing Inc.
Defendant
Concern Worldwide Us
Defendant
Concord Electronics Inc.
Defendant
Concord Nursing Home
Defendant
Concord Setting Inc
Defendant
Concorde Hotel New York
Defendant
Concorde Medical Group
Defendant
Concordia International
Defendant
Concur Inc
Defendant
Condal Distributors Inc
Defendant
Conde Construction
Defendant
Condeco Software Inc
Defendant
Condon Omeara Mcginty Donnelly
Defendant
Conedison
Defendant
Conelle Construction Corp
Defendant
Coney Island Preparatory Public School
Defendant
Conference Board Inc
Defendant
Confirmit Inc
Defendant
Congdon Flaherty O'callaghan
Defendant
Congregation Beth Elohim
Defendant
Connections Personnel Of NY
Defendant
Conrac Construction Group LLC
Defendant
Consolidated Edison
Defendant
Consolidated Networks Corp.
Defendant
Consolidated Technologies
Defendant
Constantin Associates
Defendant
Constantine Cannon Llp
Defendant
Constar Inc.
Defendant
Construction 1st Class
Defendant
Construction Associates Inc
Defendant
Construction Force Services
Defendant
Construction Management
Defendant
Construction Services 365 LLC
Defendant
Constructions
Defendant
Constructomics LLC
Defendant
Consulate Film Editing Co
Defendant
Consulate General Of Denmark
Defendant
Consulting Testing Svc
Defendant
Consumer Financial Network
Defendant
Consumer Reports
Defendant
Consumers Union-United States
Defendant
Contemporary Dental Implants
Defendant
Contemporary Guidance Svc Inc
Defendant
Conti Enterprises, Inc.
Defendant
Continuum Health Partners, Inc.
Defendant
Contol Group Inc.
Defendant
Contract Magazine
Defendant
Contracterp
Defendant
Contractors Line & Grade South
Defendant
Contractors Register, Inc.
Defendant
Contractors Sheet Metal Work
Defendant
Contrix Inc
Defendant
Control Solutions Group
Defendant
Control Systems Services, Inc.
Defendant
Converge Direct
Defendant
Converge One
Defendant
Conversion Partners LLC
Defendant
Conversocial
Defendant
Cook & Fox Architects
Defendant
Cook Krupa LLC
Defendant
Cookfox Architects
Defendant
Cookie Factory
Defendant
Cooley Monato Studio
Defendant
Cooling Guard Mech. Corp.
Defendant
Cooney/Waters Group
Defendant
Cooper Carry & Associates
Defendant
Cooper Dunham Lp
Defendant
Cooper Robertson & Partners
Defendant
Cooper Tank & Welding Corp
Defendant
Cooper Tank And Welding Corp.
Defendant
Cooper Works Inc.
Defendant
Cooperative Home Care Assoc
Defendant
Cooperman Lester Miller LLP
Defendant
Coordinated Behavioral Care
Defendant
Copper Development Association
Defendant
Coppola Paving & Landscaping Corp
Defendant
Coptis Inc
Defendant
Cora Inc
Defendant
Coral Cast
Defendant
Coral House
Defendant
Coral Realty LLC
Defendant
Coranet
Defendant
Corbex Inc
Defendant
Corcoran Group Inc.
Defendant
Core And Main, Lp
Defendant
Core Construction Group Corp
Defendant
Core Contracting
Defendant
Core Cs LLC
Defendant
Core Group Marketing
Defendant
Core Staffing Svc Inc
Defendant
Core Tech Assoc
Defendant
Corgan Associates Architects
Defendant
Corgan Associates Inc
Defendant
Corinthian Cast Stone
Defendant
Corinthian Media
Defendant
Corkery Group
Defendant
Cornell Internal Mdcn Assoc
Defendant
Cornell Ivf Program
Defendant
Cornell University
Defendant
Cornerstone Research
Defendant
Cornick Garber & Sander Llp
Defendant
Corona Equipment Co
Defendant
Coronet Parts Mfg Co
Defendant
Corporate Power Inc
Defendant
Corporate Suites
Defendant
Corporate Synergies
Defendant
Corporation For Supportive Housing
Defendant
Correctional Medical Svc
Defendant
Corsi Tire
Defendant
Cort Club Inc
Defendant
Cortlandt Tank Svc
Defendant
Cos 880
Defendant
Cosentini Associates
Defendant
Cosimo Inc
Defendant
Cosmetic Executive Women Inc.
Defendant
Cosmo Street
Defendant
Cosmopolitan Magazine
Defendant
Cosmopolitan Management LLC
Defendant
Cosmos Communications
Defendant
Cott Management Partners
Defendant
Cotton Incorporated
Defendant
Cougar Capital LLC
Defendant
Council Of School Supervisors And Admins
Defendant
Council On Accreditation
Defendant
Council On Foreign Relations
Defendant
Counseling In Schools, Inc.
Defendant
Country Bank
Defendant
Country House
Defendant
County Ceiling Co.
Defendant
County Chair Party Rentals
Defendant
County Of Nassau
Defendant
County Of Westchester
Defendant
Courtalert Com Inc
Defendant
Covenant Foundation
Defendant
Covenant House
Defendant
Cover Girl Strips
Defendant
Coverwallet
Defendant
Covington Fabric & Design LLC
Defendant
Cowan Debaets Abrahams
Defendant
Cowan Liebowitz & Latman Pc
Defendant
Cowbay Contracting
Defendant
Cowen Group, Inc.
Defendant
Cowtan & Tout
Defendant
Cox & Co Inc
Defendant
Cozen Oconnor
Defendant
Cp Perma Paving Construction
Defendant
Cphl
Defendant
Cpjfk
Defendant
Crafted Interiors
Defendant
Craig Management Assoc Inc
Defendant
Cravath Swaine & Moore Llp
Defendant
Crc Associates, Inc.
Defendant
Creation Baumann Usa Inc
Defendant
Creations By Carelle Ltd
Defendant
Creative Data Resources
Defendant
Creative Environment Solutions
Defendant
Creative Finishes Ltd
Defendant
Creative Lifestyles, Inc.
Defendant
Creative Renovations, LLC
Defendant
Creative Snow By Cow Bay Inc.
Defendant
Creative Touch Construction Corp.
Defendant
Creativeworx
Defendant
Crecco Group Remodeling Inc.
Defendant
Credit International
Defendant
Credit Suisse Holdings (Usa), Inc.
Defendant
Creditriskmonitor Com Inc.
Defendant
Creditsights Inc.
Defendant
Credsimple
Defendant
Creek Country Club
Defendant
Crenulated Co Ltd
Defendant
Creo Dental
Defendant
Crescent Computers & Software
Defendant
Crescent St Construction Corp
Defendant
Cresent Contracting
Defendant
Crest Hollow Country Club
Defendant
Crew Cuts
Defendant
Crf - House East, LLC
Defendant
Crifasi Real Estate Inc
Defendant
Crisdel Construction Group Inc.
Defendant
Criterion Group LLC
Defendant
Cronin & Cronin
Defendant
Cross County Savings Bank
Defendant
Cross Management Corp
Defendant
Cross NY
Defendant
Crossasset Software LLC
Defendant
Crossfield Digital
Defendant
Crossfire Group
Defendant
Crossland Mechanical Inc.
Defendant
Crossmedia Inc
Defendant
Crow Construction Co
Defendant
Crown Awards & Trophies
Defendant
Crown Delta Corp
Defendant
Crown Die Casting Corp
Defendant
Crown Janitorial Products LLC
Defendant
Crs Contractors Inc.
Defendant
Crs_Group
Defendant
Crsg
Defendant
Crunch Gym
Defendant
Crystal Blue Cing Svc Inc
Defendant
Crystal Run Healthcare
Defendant
Csbm
Defendant
Csi Electrical & Mechcl Systs
Defendant
Csi Rentals
Defendant
Css Stainless Steel Work Inc
Defendant
Cta Architects
Defendant
Ctl Usa Inc
Defendant
Ctr For Nursing And Rehab, Inc.
Defendant
Ctrny
Defendant
Ctsi
Defendant
Cube Cons. Services LLC
Defendant
Cuddy & Eder Llp
Defendant
Cullen And Dykman Llp
Defendant
Cullen Schafer Capital Mgmt
Defendant
Cultural Affairs
Defendant
Cum Laude Group Inc
Defendant
Cumberland Diagnostic
Defendant
Cumberland Packing Corp
Defendant
Cummins
Defendant
Cung Queens College
Defendant
Cuny
Defendant
Curam Contracting LLC
Defendant
Cureatr
Defendant
Curtis Brown Ltd
Defendant
Curtis Instruments, Inc.
Defendant
Curtis Mallet-Prevost Colt And Mosle
Plaintiff
Albert E. Percy
Represented By
James M. Kernan
Kernan Professional Group, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Percy Jobs and Careers Corporation
Represented By
James M. Kernan
Kernan Professional Group, LLP
contact info
Respondent
James M. Kernan
Represented By
Michael S. Ross
One Grand Central Place
contact info
Eugene Alexander Gormakh
Law Offices Of Michael S. Ross
contact info

GPO May 27 2021
MEMORANDUM & ORDER, For the reasons stated below, each of the Removed Actions is REMANDED to New York Supreme Court, Oneida County and each of the Federal Actions is DISMISSED with prejudice. Requests made by counsel in the Removed Actions for attorneys fees and costs are GRANTED. Attorney James M. Kernan, counsel for the Class Representatives, is ORDERED to show cause within two weeks of the date of this Order, in writing, as to why he should not be referred to the Disciplinary Committee for this District in connection with his conduct in these lawsuits. So Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 5/27/2021. (Certified copy of Order mailed to New York Supreme Court, Oneida County, County Clerk, 200 Elizabeth St #4, Utica, NY 13501, Docket No. EFCA 2020-1276) (Lee, Tiffeny)

Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, August 10, 2021
order ~Util - Create Case Association Tue 08/10 9:17 AM
Cases associated. (Lee, Tiffeny)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 25, 2021
29 29 28 pgs appeal Notice of Appeal Fri 06/25 1:06 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to23 Memorandum & Opinion,,, by Albert E. Percy, Percy Jobs and Careers Corporation. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number ANYEDC-14600466. (Kernan, James)
Related: [-]
appeal Electronic Index to Record on Appeal Fri 06/25 1:10 PM
Electronic Index to Record on Appeal sent to US Court of Appeals.29 Notice of Appeal Documents are available via Pacer. For docket entries without a hyperlink or for documents under seal, contact the court and we'll arrange for the document(s) to be made available to you. (Jones, Vasean)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 21, 2021
28 28 18 pgs misc Declaration Mon 06/21 2:40 PM
DECLARATION re23 Memorandum & Opinion,,, by James M. Kernan (Kernan, James)
Related: [-]
27 27 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 06/21 2:03 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Eugene Alexander Gormakh on behalf of James M. Kernan (aty to be noticed) (Gormakh, Eugene)
Related: [-]
26 26 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 06/21 1:47 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael S. Ross on behalf of James M. Kernan (aty to be noticed) (Ross, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 11, 2021
order Order(Other) Fri 06/11 2:11 PM
ORDER: Attorney Kernan's request to extend the deadline to show cause by thirty days is DENIED. A limited extension to June 21 is GRANTED. Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 6/11/2021. (Baron, Laura)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 09, 2021
25 25 1 pgs misc Letter Wed 06/09 3:03 PM
Letter by Albert E. Percy, Percy Jobs and Careers Corporation (Kernan, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment
Friday, May 28, 2021
24 24 order Judgment - Clerk Fri 05/28 3:18 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT that the removed actions are remanded to New York Supreme Court, Oneida County; the federal actions are dismissed with prejudice; requests for attorneys' fees and costs by the Defendants in the removed actions are granted, and Judgment is entered in favor of Defendants. Signed Douglas C. Palmer, Clerk of Court by Brenna B. Mahoney, Chief Deputy Clerk on May 28, 2021. (Lee, Tiffeny)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 27, 2021
23 23 27 pgs order Memorandum & Opinion Thu 05/27 7:23 PM
MEMORANDUM & ORDER, For the reasons stated below, each of the Removed Actions is REMANDED to New York Supreme Court, Oneida County and each of the Federal Actions is DISMISSED with prejudice. Requests made by counsel in the Removed Actions for attorneys fees and costs are GRANTED. Attorney James M. Kernan, counsel for the Class Representatives, is ORDERED to show cause within two weeks of the date of this Order, in writing, as to why he should not be referred to the Disciplinary Committee for this District in connection with his conduct in these lawsuits. So Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 5/27/2021. (Certified copy of Order mailed to New York Supreme Court, Oneida County, County Clerk, 200 Elizabeth St #4, Utica, NY 13501, Docket No. EFCA 2020-1276) (Lee, Tiffeny)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 20, 2021
order Order Reassigning Case Thu 05/20 9:17 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis and Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara for all further proceedings. Judge Diane Gujarati, Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Ordered by Chief Judge Margo K. Brodie on 5/20/2021. (Bowens, Priscilla)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 18, 2021
22 22 service Summons Issued Tue 05/18 9:32 AM
Summons Issued as to Children's Law Ctr,, Chilmark Builders Inc, Chimera Securities, LLC, Chimpanzee Productions Inc, China Construction America, China Laws & Technology Inc, China Press, Chinatown Cardiology, Chinses American Planning, Chips Technology Group LLC, Chldrn's And Women's Physicians Of West, Choice Personnel Inc, Choice Products, Chosen People Ministries, Christ Church United Methodist Nyc, Christian Cultural Center, Christian Faith Fellowship, Christie's Inc., Christophe & Assoc., Christopher Chang Law Offices, Christopher Rosekrans Law, Christopher V Papa Architect, Chromalloy, Chs Services, Chubb, Church, Church Of Christ International, Church Pension Group, Church Street Boxing Gym, Cibc, Cid Construction, Cindy E Levitz Lic Acpnctrst, Cintalta Cons. Corp, Cintra Software & Svc Inc, Circa Brewing Co, Circuit Breaker Sales Ne Inc, Cis, Cision, Citadel Construction Corp, Citadines Connect Fifth Avenue, Citi Wide Harm Reduction, Citibank, National Association, Citigroup Incorporated, Citimed PLLC, Citixsys Technologies, Citizen General Construction Inc, Citizen M Hotel New York, Citnalta Construction Corp, Citrin Cooperman And Company, Llp, Citroen Wolf Communications, City Choice, City Harvest, Inc., City Journal, City M D, City Of Middletown, City Of NY Conflicts Of Intererest, City Of NY Department Of Parks & Recreation Capitalprojects, City Of New York, City Of New York Department Of Parks & Recreation, City Of Yonkers, City Prints LLC, City School District Of New Rochelle, City Sounds Of NY, City Suites LLC, City Translation Ctr, City Univ Of NY Dept Of Design & Mgmt Procurement, City University Of New York, City View Masonry Corp, City Wide Administrative Services, Citybuzz, Cityline Restoration Inc, Cityscape Engineering, Cityscape Obgyn PLLC, Citysights NY, Citywide Data Inc, Citywide Environmental Services LLC, Citywide Maintenance Svc, Citywide Mobile Response Corp., Citywide Sewer & Drain Co, Civcon LLC, Civetta Cousins, Civic Builders Inc, Civic Entertainment Group LLC, Civil Contracting Corp, Cjs Industries Inc, Ckc Maintenance Corp, Cksk, Cl An Druaidh/The Druid Press, Clara Barton High School, Clare Medical, Claridge's Hotel Ltd, Clarient Group, Clarion Partners, LLC, Clark Construction Group, Clark Gagliardi Miller, Clark Investigations & Scrty, Classic Harbor Line, Classic Heights Realty LLC, Classic Home Care Inc, Classic Sports Floors, Classic Stage Co, Classpass, Clay LLC, Clayman & Rosenberg, Clayton Dubilier Rice LLC, Clean Air Quality Svc Inc, Clean Earth Dredging Technologies, Clean Machine Car Wash-Detail, Cleaning Guru, Cleantech, Clear It Out Contr LLC, Clear It Out Contracting LLC, Clevertech, Click Model Management Inc, Clickdaily Inc, Clifford Chance, Clifton Budd & Demaria Llp, Clifton Ornamental Metal & Glass, Cline Davis And Mann LLC, Clinical Pain Advisor, Clinical Resources Network LLC, Clinical Systems Inc, Clinton Management, Clio Awards, Clotho Corp, Cloud 9 Technologies LLC, Cloud Dx, Clove Lakes Health Care And Rehab, Clove Lakes Health Care-Rehab, Clover Wire Forming Co Inc, Club Demonstration Svc, Club Fit, Club Julians Inc, Club Quarters Grand Central, Cluen Corp, Cluster Inc, Cm & Assoc Constr Mgmt LLC, Cm & E Con Inc, Cm Almy Inc, Cmc Rebar, Cmd, Cmem, Cmg Group LLC, Cmgrp, Inc., Cmp Builders Corp Inc., Cmp Healthcare Media, Cmp Publications, Cncl On Accreditation For Chldrn And Fml, Cng, Cny, Cny Builders LLC, Co 3, Co'motion Group LLC, Co-Collective LLC, Coachman Family Ctr, Coastal Contracting Corp, Coastal Pipeline Products Corp, Coatue Management, Cobble Hill Health Ctr, Cobite, Coca Cola, Cocentrix Corp, Cocooning Electronics Ltd, Code And Theory LLC, Coffee Distribution Corp, Cognito Americas LLC, Cognito Inc, Cohen & Frankel Llp, Cohen & Slamowitz, Cohen Childrens Medical Center, Cohen Clair Lans Greifer, Cohen Hochman & Allen, Cohen Hurkin Ehrenfeld, Cohen Kuhn & Assoc, Cohen Weiss And Simon Llp, Cohen Weiss Simon, Cohens Tauber Spivac Wagner, Cohnreznick Llp, Cold Spring Construction Company, Cold Spring Hls Ctr For Nursing, Coldlion Technologies LLC, Cole Mechanical Corp, Cole Partners Inc, Coleman Brandworx, Coleman Country Day Camp, Coler Goldwater Specialty Hosp, Colgate-Palmolive Company, Colina Bay, Inc, Collaborative Construction, Collazo Carling & Mish, Collective 545 Broadway, LLC, Collectivei, Colleran O'hara & Mills, Collibra Inc, Collier Halpern Newberg, Collins Aerospace, Collis Roofing Inc, Colon & Rectal Surgical, Colonial Construction Co Inc, Colonial Consulting LLC, Colonial Electric, Colonial Tag & Label Co, Colony Electric Inc, Colour Matters, Columbia Artist, Columbia Artists Managmnt Inc, Columbia Cascade Co, Columbia Cascade Company, Columbia Softball Field, Columbia University, Columbiadoctors Medical Group, Columbiadoctors Nurse, Columbus Avenue Consulting LLC, Columbus Medical Inst Of NY, Comcast Spotlight, Inc., Comfort Bedding Inc., Comixology, Comlab Systems, Command Financial Press, Command Security Corporation, Commentary Magazine, Commerce Electrical Contracting Corp, Commercial Building Mntnc, Commercial Fence & Railing, Commercial Tenant Svc Inc, Committee Of Interns And Residen, Commodore Maintenance, Common Ground Community Hdfc, Communications Plus Digital, Communicator Inc, Community Access, Community Action For Human Services, Community Cardiology Pc, Community Consultation Ctr, Community Electric Inc, Community Health Ctr-Richmond, Community Healthproject, Community Hospital At Dobbs, Community Life Center Inc., Community Mainstreaming, Community Medical And Dental Care Inc., Community Partners, Community Psych, Community Resource Ctr, Community Resource Exchange, Community Resources, Community Service Society Of NY, Comp World Usa, Compinfo, Complete Construction Contract, Complete Discovery Source Inc., Complete Mailing Svc, Complete Womens Imaging Pc, Complexcare Solutions, Inc., Comprehensive Care Mgmt Corp, Comprehensive Hr Advisory Services Ent., Comprehensive Pain Management, Comprehensive Pediatrics, Comprehensive Professional, Compstak, Computer Generated Solutions, Inc., Computer Managers Inc., Computer Services Group Inc., Computer Solutions Intl Inc., Computercool Ac Inc., Comunilife, Con Edison, Con Edison Of NY, Con Rac Construction Group, Concentric Group LLC, Concentric Health Experience, Concept Air Conditioning, Concept Construction Svc Inc, Concepts In Staffing Inc., Concern Worldwide Us, Concord Electronics Inc., Concord Nursing Home, Concord Setting Inc, Concorde Hotel New York, Concorde Medical Group, Concordia International, Concur Inc, Condal Distributors Inc, Conde Construction, Condeco Software Inc, Condon Omeara Mcginty Donnelly, Conedison, Conelle Construction Corp, Coney Island Preparatory Public School, Conference Board Inc, Confirmit Inc, Congdon Flaherty O'callaghan, Congregation Beth Elohim, Connections Personnel Of NY, Conrac Construction Group LLC, Consolidated Edison, Consolidated Networks Corp., Consolidated Technologies, Constantin Associates, Constantine Cannon Llp, Constar Inc., Construction 1st Class, Construction Associates Inc, Construction Force Services, Construction Management, Construction Services 365 LLC, Constructions, Constructomics LLC, Consulate Film Editing Co, Consulate General Of Denmark, Consulting Testing Svc, Consumer Financial Network, Consumer Reports, Consumers Union-United States, Contemporary Dental Implants, Contemporary Guidance Svc Inc, Conti Enterprises, Inc., Continuum Health Partners, Inc., Contol Group Inc., Contract Magazine, Contracterp, Contractors Line & Grade South, Contractors Register, Inc., Contractors Sheet Metal Work, Contrix Inc, Control Solutions Group, Control Systems Services, Inc., Converge Direct, Converge One, Conversion Partners LLC, Conversocial, Cook & Fox Architects, Cook Krupa LLC, Cookfox Architects, Cookie Factory, Cooley Monato Studio, Cooling Guard Mech. Corp., Cooney/Waters Group, Cooper Carry & Associates, Cooper Dunham Lp, Cooper Robertson & Partners, Cooper Tank & Welding Corp, Cooper Tank And Welding Corp., Cooper Works Inc., Cooperative Home Care Assoc, Cooperman Lester Miller LLP, Coordinated Behavioral Care, Copper Development Association, Coppola Paving & Landscaping Corp, Coptis Inc, Cora Inc, Coral Cast, Coral House, Coral Realty LLC, Coranet, Corbex Inc, Corcoran Group Inc., Core And Main, Lp, Core Construction Group Corp, Core Contracting, Core Cs LLC, Core Group Marketing, Core Staffing Svc Inc, Core Tech Assoc, Corgan Associates Architects, Corgan Associates Inc, Corinthian Cast Stone, Corinthian Media, Corkery Group, Cornell Internal Mdcn Assoc, Cornell Ivf Program, Cornell University, Cornerstone Research, Cornick Garber & Sander Llp, Corona Equipment Co, Coronet Parts Mfg Co, Corporate Power Inc, Corporate Suites, Corporate Synergies, Corporation For Supportive Housing, Correctional Medical Svc, Corsi Tire, Cort Club Inc, Cortlandt Tank Svc, Cos 880, Cosentini Associates, Cosimo Inc, Cosmetic Executive Women Inc., Cosmo Street, Cosmopolitan Magazine, Cosmopolitan Management LLC, Cosmos Communications, Cott Management Partners, Cotton Incorporated, Cougar Capital LLC, Council Of School Supervisors And Admins, Council On Accreditation, Council On Foreign Relations, Counseling In Schools, Inc., Country Bank, Country House, County Ceiling Co., County Chair Party Rentals, County Of Nassau, County Of Westchester, Courtalert Com Inc, Covenant Foundation, Covenant House, Cover Girl Strips, Coverwallet, Covington Fabric & Design LLC, Cowan Debaets Abrahams, Cowan Liebowitz & Latman Pc, Cowbay Contracting, Cowen Group, Inc., Cowtan & Tout, Cox & Co Inc, Cozen Oconnor, Cp Perma Paving Construction, Cphl, Cpjfk, Crafted Interiors, Craig Management Assoc Inc, Cravath Swaine & Moore Llp, Crc Associates, Inc., Creation Baumann Usa Inc, Creations By Carelle Ltd, Creative Data Resources, Creative Environment Solutions, Creative Finishes Ltd, Creative Lifestyles, Inc., Creative Renovations, LLC, Creative Snow By Cow Bay Inc., Creative Touch Construction Corp., Creativeworx, Crecco Group Remodeling Inc., Credit International, Credit Suisse Holdings (Usa), Inc., Creditriskmonitor Com Inc., Creditsights Inc., Credsimple, Creek Country Club, Crenulated Co Ltd, Creo Dental, Crescent Computers & Software, Crescent St Construction Corp, Cresent Contracting, Crest Hollow Country Club, Crew Cuts, Crf - House East, LLC, Crifasi Real Estate Inc, Crisdel Construction Group Inc., Criterion Group LLC, Cronin & Cronin, Cross County Savings Bank, Cross Management Corp, Cross NY, Crossasset Software LLC, Crossfield Digital, Crossfire Group, Crossland Mechanical Inc., Crossmedia Inc, Crow Construction Co, Crown Awards & Trophies, Crown Delta Corp, Crown Die Casting Corp, Crown Janitorial Products LLC, Crs Contractors Inc., Crs_Group, Crsg, Crunch Gym, Crystal Blue Cing Svc Inc, Crystal Run Healthcare, Csbm, Csi Electrical & Mechcl Systs, Csi Rentals, Css Stainless Steel Work Inc, Cta Architects, Ctl Usa Inc, Ctr For Nursing And Rehab, Inc., Ctrny, Ctsi, Cube Cons. Services LLC, Cuddy & Eder Llp, Cullen And Dykman Llp, Cullen Schafer Capital Mgmt, Cultural Affairs, Cum Laude Group Inc, Cumberland Diagnostic, Cumberland Packing Corp, Cummins, Cung Queens College, Cuny, Curam Contracting LLC, Cureatr, Curtis Brown Ltd, Curtis Instruments, Inc., Curtis Mallet-Prevost Colt And Mosle, Curtis Vasile Law Offices Pc, Curtis, Mallet-Prevost, Colt, Cushman & Wakefield, Custom Exterior Systems, Inc., Cut & Run, Cutting Room Films, Cwa Spatial Discipline, Cyber Axioma, Cypress Garden, Cypress Health Care Mgmt, Cyruli Shanks Hart & Zizmor, Cyrus Innovation LLC, Cyrus Knits, Cytopath Biopsy Lab Inc. (Herrera, Isaiah)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 13, 2021
21 21 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Thu 05/13 8:34 AM
Proposed Summons. by Albert E. Percy and Percy Jobs and Careers Corporation an IRC 501(c)(3) non-profit, as Class Representatives (Kernan, James)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 30, 2021
20 20 misc ~Util - Add Parties Fri 04/30 10:06 AM
Cooperman Lester Miller LLP added. (Kernan, James)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 21, 2021
19 19 misc ~Util - Add Parties Wed 04/21 12:47 PM
Curtis Vasile Law Offices Pc, Curtis, Mallet-Prevost, Colt, Cushman & Wakefield, Custom Exterior Systems, Inc., Cut & Run, Cutting Room Films, Cwa zmor, Cyrus Innovation LLC, Cyrus Knits and Cytopath Biopsy Lab Inc added. (Kernan, James)
Related: [-]
18 18 misc ~Util - Add Parties Wed 04/21 12:41 PM
Css Stainless Steel Work Inc, Cta Architects, Ctl Usa Inc, Ctr For Nursing And Rehab, Inc., Ctrny, Ctsi, Cube Cons. Services LLC, Cuddy & Eder Llp, Cullen And Dykman Llp, Cullen Schafer Capital Mgmt, Cultural Affairs, Cum Laude Group Inc, Cumberland Diagnostic, Cumberland Packing Corp, Cummins, Cung Queens College, Cuny, Curam Contracting LLC, Cureatr, Curtis Brown Ltd, Curtis Instruments, Inc. and Curtis Mallet-Prevost Colt And Mosle added. (Kernan, James)
Related: [-]
17 17 misc ~Util - Add Parties Wed 04/21 12:32 PM
Cresent Contracting, Crest Hollow Country Club, Crew Cuts, Crf - House East, LLC, Crifasi Real Estate Inc, Crisdel Construction Group Inc., Criterion Group LLC, Cronin & Cronin, Cross County Savings Bank, Cross Management Corp, Cross NY, Crossasset Software LLC, Crossfield Digital, Crossfire Group, Crossland Mechanical Inc., Crossmedia Inc, Crow Construction Co, Crown Awards & Trophies, Crown Delta Corp, Crown Die Casting Corp, Crown Janitorial Products LLC, Crs Contractors Inc., Crs_Group, Crsg, Crunch Gym, Crystal Blue Cing Svc Inc, Crystal Run Healthcare, Csbm, Csi Electrical & Mechcl Systs and Csi Rentals added. (Kernan, James)
Related: [-]
16 16 misc ~Util - Add Parties Wed 04/21 12:18 PM
Cox & Co Inc, Cozen Oconnor, Cp Perma Paving Construction, Cphl, Cpjfk, Crafted Interiors, Craig Management Assoc Inc, Cravath Swaine & Moore Llp, Crc Associates, Inc., Creation Baumann Usa Inc, Creations By Carelle Ltd, Creative Data Resources, Creative Environment Solutions, Creative Finishes Ltd, Creative Lifestyles, Inc., Creative Renovations, LLC, Creative Snow By Cow Bay Inc., Creative Touch Construction Corp., Creativeworx, Crecco Group Remodeling Inc., Credit International, Credit Suisse Holdings (Usa), Inc., Creditriskmonitor Com Inc., Creditsights Inc., Credsimple, Creek Country Club, Crenulated Co Ltd, Creo Dental, Crescent Computers & Software and Crescent St Construction Corp added. (Kernan, James)
Related: [-]
15 15 misc ~Util - Add Parties Wed 04/21 11:09 AM
Cosimo Inc, Cosmetic Executive Women Inc., Cosmo Street, Cosmopolitan Magazine, Cosmopolitan Management LLC, Cosmos Communications, Cott Management Partners, Cotton Incorporated, Cougar Capital LLC, Council Of School Supervisors And Admins, Council On Accreditation, Council On Foreign Relations, Counseling In Schools, Inc., Country Bank, Country House, County Ceiling Co., County Chair Party Rentals, County Of Nassau, County Of Westchester, Courtalert Com Inc, Covenant Foundation, Covenant House, Cover Girl Strips, Coverwallet, Covington Fabric & Design LLC, Cowan Debaets Abrahams, Cowan Liebowitz & Latman Pc, Cowbay Contracting, Cowen Group, Inc. and Cowtan & Tout added. (Kernan, James)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc ~Util - Add Parties Wed 04/21 10:58 AM
Corcoran Group Inc., Core And Main, Lp, Core Construction Group Corp, Core Contracting, Core Cs LLC, Core Group Marketing, Core Staffing Svc Inc, Core Tech Assoc, Corgan Associates Architects, Corgan Associates Inc, Corinthian Cast Stone, Corinthian Media, Corkery Group, Cornell Internal Mdcn Assoc, Cornell Ivf Program, Cornell University, Cornerstone Research, Cornick Garber & Sander Llp, Corona Equipment Co, Coronet Parts Mfg Co, Corporate Power Inc, Corporate Suites, Corporate Synergies, Corporation For Supportive Housing, Correctional Medical Svc, Corsi Tire, Cort Club Inc, Cortlandt Tank Svc, Cos 880 and Cosentini Associates added. (Kernan, James)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc ~Util - Add Parties Wed 04/21 10:47 AM
Control Systems Services, Inc., Converge Direct, Converge One, Conversion Partners LLC, Conversocial, Cook & Fox Architects, Cook Krupa LLC, Cookfox Architects, Cookie Factory, Cooley Monato Studio, Cooling Guard Mech. Corp., Cooney/Waters Group, Cooper Carry & Associates, Cooper Dunham Lp, Cooper Robertson & Partners, Cooper Tank & Welding Corp, Cooper Tank And Welding Corp., Cooper Works Inc., Cooperative Home Care Assoc, Cooperative Home Care Assoc, Coordinated Behavioral Care, Copper Development Association, Coppola Paving & Landscaping Corp, Coptis Inc, Cora Inc, Coral Cast, Coral House, Coral Realty LLC, Coranet and Corbex Inc added. (Kernan, James)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc ~Util - Add Parties Wed 04/21 10:32 AM
Consolidated Networks Corp., Consolidated Technologies, Constantin Associates, Constantine Cannon Llp, Constar Inc., Construction 1st Class, Construction Associates Inc, Construction Force Services, Construction Management, Construction Services 365 LLC, Constructions, Constructomics LLC, Consulate Film Editing Co, Consulate General Of Denmark, Consulting Testing Svc, Consumer Financial Network, Consumer Reports, Consumers Union-United States, Contemporary Dental Implants, Contemporary Guidance Svc Inc, Conti Enterprises, Inc., Continuum Health Partners, Inc., Contol Group Inc., Contract Magazine, Contracterp, Contractors Line & Grade South, Contractors Register, Inc., Contractors Sheet Metal Work, Contrix Inc and Control Solutions Group added. (Kernan, James)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc ~Util - Add Parties Wed 04/21 10:20 AM
Con Edison, Con Edison Of NY, Con Rac Construction Group, Concentric Group LLC, Concentric Health Experience, Concept Air Conditioning, Concept Construction Svc Inc, Concepts In Staffing Inc., Concern Worldwide Us, Concord Electronics Inc., Concord Nursing Home, Concord Setting Inc, Concorde Hotel New York, Concorde Medical Group, Concordia International, Concur Inc, Condal Distributors Inc, Conde Construction, Condeco Software Inc, Condon Omeara Mcginty Donnelly, Conedison, Conelle Construction Corp, Coney Island Preparatory Public School, Conference Board Inc, Confirmit Inc, Congdon Flaherty O'callaghan, Congregation Beth Elohim, Connections Personnel Of NY, Conrac Construction Group LLC and Consolidated Edison added. (Kernan, James)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc ~Util - Add Parties Wed 04/21 9:59 AM
Community Healthproject, Community Hospital At Dobbs, Community Life Center Inc., Community Mainstreaming, Community Medical And Dental Care Inc., Community Partners, Community Psych, Community Resource Ctr, Community Resource Exchange, Community Resources, Community Service Society Of NY, Co'motion Group LLC, Comp World Usa, Compinfo, Complete Construction Contract, Complete Discovery Source Inc., Complete Mailing Svc, Complete Womens Imaging Pc, Complexcare Solutions, Inc., Comprehensive Care Mgmt Corp, Comprehensive Hr Advisory Services Ent., Comprehensive Pain Management, Comprehensive Pediatrics, Comprehensive Professional, Compstak, Computer Generated Solutions, Inc., Computer Managers Inc., Computer Services Group Inc., Computer Solutions Intl Inc., Computercool Ac Inc. and Comunilife added. (Kernan, James)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Wed 04/21 9:48 AM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Clerks Notice of Rule 73 Wed 04/21 9:46 AM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc ~Util - Add Parties Wed 04/21 9:44 AM
Columbia Softball Field, Columbia University, Columbiadoctors Medical Group, Columbiadoctors Nurse, Columbus Avenue Consulting LLC, Columbus Medical Inst Of NY, Comcast Spotlight, Inc., Comfort Bedding Inc., Comixology, Comlab Systems, Command Financial Press, Command Security Corporation, Commentary Magazine, Commerce Electrical Contracting Corp, Commercial Building Mntnc, Commercial Fence & Railing, Commercial Tenant Svc Inc, Committee Of Interns And Residen, Commodore Maintenance, Common Ground Community Hdfc, Communications Plus Digital, Communicator Inc, Community Access, Community Action For Human Services, Community Cardiology Pc, Community Consultation Ctr, Community Electric Inc and Community Health Ctr-Richmond added. (Kernan, James)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc ~Util - Add Parties Wed 04/21 8:56 AM
Cold Spring Construction Company, Cold Spring Hls Ctr For Nursing, Coldlion Technologies LLC, Cole Mechanical Corp, Cole Partners Inc, Coleman Brandworx, Coleman Country Day Camp, Coler Goldwater Specialty Hosp, Colgate-Palmolive Company, Colina Bay, Inc, Collaborative Construction, Collazo Carling & Mish, Collective 545 Broadway, LLC, Collectivei, Colleran O'hara & Mills, Collibra Inc, Collier Halpern Newberg, Collins Aerospace, Collis Roofing Inc, Colon & Rectal Surgical, Colonial Construction Co Inc, Colonial Consulting LLC, Colonial Electric, Colonial Tag & Label Co, Colony Electric Inc, Colour Matters, Columbia Artist, Columbia Artists Managmnt Inc, Columbia Cascade Co and Columbia Cascade Company added. (Kernan, James)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc ~Util - Add Parties Wed 04/21 8:42 AM
Cncl On Accreditation For Chldrn And Fml, Cng, Cny, Cny Builders LLC, Co 3, Coachman Family Ctr, Coastal Contracting Corp, Coastal Pipeline Products Corp, Coatue Management, Cobble Hill Health Ctr, Cobite, Coca Cola, Cocentrix Corp, Co-Collective LLC, Cocooning Electronics Ltd, Code And Theory LLC, Coffee Distribution Corp, Cognito Americas LLC, Cognito Inc, Cohen & Frankel Llp, Cohen & Slamowitz, Cohen Childrens Medical Center, Cohen Clair Lans Greifer, Cohen Hochman & Allen, Cohen Hurkin Ehrenfeld, Cohen Kuhn & Assoc, Cohen Weiss And Simon Llp, Cohen Weiss Simon, Cohens Tauber Spivac Wagner and Cohnreznick Llp added. (Kernan, James)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc ~Util - Add Parties Wed 04/21 8:27 AM
Cl An Druaidh/The Druid Press, Clara Barton High School, Clare Medical, Claridge's Hotel Ltd, Clarient Group, Clarion Partners, LLC, Clark Construction Group, Clark Gagliardi Miller, Clark Investigations & Scrty, Classic Harbor Line, Classic Heights Realty LLC, Classic Home Care Inc, Classic Sports Floors, Classic Stage Co, Classpass, Clay LLC, Clayman & Rosenberg, Clayton Dubilier Rice LLC, Clean Air Quality Svc Inc, Clean Earth Dredging Technologies, Clean Machine Car Wash-Detail, Cleaning Guru, Cleantech, Clear It Out Contr LLC, Clear It Out Contracting LLC, Clevertech, Click Model Management Inc, Clickdaily Inc, Clifford Chance, Clifton Budd & Demaria Llp, Clifton Ornamental Metal & Glass, Cline Davis And Mann LLC, Clinical Pain Advisor, Clinical Resources Network LLC, Clinical Systems Inc, Clinton Management, Clio Awards, Clotho Corp, Cloud 9 Technologies LLC, Cloud Dx, Clove Lakes Health Care And Rehab, Clove Lakes Health Care-Rehab, Clover Wire Forming Co Inc, Club Demonstration Svc, Club Fit, Club Julians Inc, Club Quarters Grand Central, Cluen Corp, Cluster Inc, Cm & Assoc Constr Mgmt LLC, Cm & E Con Inc, Cm Almy Inc, Cmc Rebar, Cmd, Cmem, Cmg Group LLC, Cmgrp, Inc., Cmp Builders Corp Inc., Cmp Healthcare Media and Cmp Publications added. (Kernan, James)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc ~Util - Add Parties Wed 04/21 8:03 AM
Christophe & Assoc., Christopher Chang Law Offices, Christopher Rosekrans Law, Christopher V Papa Architect, Chromalloy, Chs Services, Chubb, Church, Church Of Christ International, Church Pension Group, Church Street Boxing Gym, Cibc, Cid Construction, Cindy E Levitz Lic Acpnctrst, Cintalta Cons. Corp, Cintra Software & Svc Inc, Circa Brewing Co, Circuit Breaker Sales Ne Inc, Cis, Cision, Citadel Construction Corp, Citadines Connect Fifth Avenue, Citi Wide Harm Reduction, Citibank, National Association, Citigroup Incorporated, Citimed PLLC, Citixsys Technologies, Citizen General Construction Inc, Citizen M Hotel New York, Citnalta Construction Corp, Citrin Cooperman And Company, Llp, Citroen Wolf Communications, City Choice, City Harvest, Inc., City Journal, City M D, City Of Middletown, City Of New York, City Of New York Department Of Parks & Recreation, City Of NY Conflicts Of Intererest, City Of NY Department Of Parks & Recreation Capitalprojects, City Of Yonkers, City Prints LLC, City School District Of New Rochelle, City Sounds Of NY, City Suites LLC, City Translation Ctr, City Univ Of NY Dept Of Design & Mgmt Procurement, City University Of New York, City View Masonry Corp, City Wide Administrative Services, Citybuzz, Cityline Restoration Inc, Cityscape Engineering, Cityscape Obgyn PLLC, Citysights NY, Citywide Data Inc, Citywide Environmental Services LLC, Citywide Maintenance Svc, Citywide Mobile Response Corp., Citywide Sewer & Drain Co, Civcon LLC, Civetta Cousins, Civic Builders Inc, Civic Entertainment Group LLC, Civil Contracting Corp, Cjs Industries Inc, Ckc Maintenance Corp and Cksk added. (Kernan, James)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Related Case Assignment/Designation Wed 04/21 9:46 AM
Notice of Related Case: The Civil Cover Sheet filed in this civil action indicates a related case. (Bowens, Priscilla)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 20, 2021
2 2 misc ~Util - Add Parties Tue 04/20 3:02 PM
Chinses American Planning, Choice Products, Chosen People Ministries, Christ Church United Methodist Nyc, Christian Cultural Center, Christian Faith Fellowship and Christie's Inc. added. (Kernan, James)
Related: [-]
1 1 13 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 04/20 2:55 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14392728 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Albert E. Percy and Percy Jobs and Careers Corporation an IRC 501(c)(3) non-profit, as Class Representatives. (Kernan, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Attachment 1,
Att: 3 Declaration
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 04/21 9:45 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Diane Gujarati and Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
Related: [-]