Montana District Court
Judge:Brian Morris
Case #: 2:21-cv-00035
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause29:185 Employee Pension Plan
Case Filed:Apr 20, 2021
Terminated:Mar 11, 2022
Last checked: Sunday Oct 17, 2021 2:53 AM MDT
Defendant
Gallatin County, Montana
Plaintiff
Jacob Wagner
Represented By
Jane Mersen
Kasthing Kauffman & Mersen
contact info
Lilia Norma Tyrrell
Kasting Kauffman & Mersen
contact info

GPO Mar 11 2022
ORDER DISMISSING CASE: BEFORE the Court is Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion to Dismiss Complaint and Request for Jury Trial Without Prejudice (the Motion). Based upon the Motion and representations that the Motion is unopposed, the above captioned case is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 3/11/2022. (SLR)

Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Friday, March 11, 2022
7 7 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Fri 03/11 9:58 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE: BEFORE the Court is Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion to Dismiss Complaint and Request for Jury Trial Without Prejudice (the Motion). Based upon the Motion and representations that the Motion is unopposed, the above captioned case is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 3/11/2022. (SLR)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 10, 2022
6 6 3 pgs motion Dismiss - SDM Thu 03/10 5:50 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Lilia Norma Tyrrell appearing for Plaintiff Jacob Wagner (Tyrrell, Lilia)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, March 07, 2022
order Order Setting - MT Mon 03/07 10:28 AM
TEXT Order Setting: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a Status Report is due to the Court on or before 3/14/2022. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 3/7/2022. (SLL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 19, 2021
4 4 1 pgs misc Errata - MT Tue 10/19 8:40 AM
ERRATA1 Complaint Exhibit A . (Tyrrell, Lilia)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Errata add Exhibit A to Complaint
3 3 service Affidavit of Service Tue 10/19 3:01 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Zach Brown on 10/15/2021, filed by Jacob Wagner. (Tyrrell, Lilia)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM Tue 10/19 8:21 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Gallatin County, Montana answer due 11/5/2021. (SLR)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 20, 2021
2 2 2 pgs service Summons Issued Tue 04/20 3:21 PM
Summons Issued as to Gallatin County, Montana. Counsel is directed to download and print issued Summons for service (MMS)
Related: [-]
1 1 13 pgs cmp Complaint - SDM Tue 04/20 3:17 PM
COMPLAINT against Gallatin County, Montana, filed by Jacob Wagner. (MMS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Blank Summons
misc Filing Fee Received Tue 04/20 3:20 PM
Filing fee: $ 402.00, receipt number 0977-2652881 (MMS)
Related: [-]