Tennessee Western District Court
Judge:Mark S Norris
Referred: Annie T Christoff
Case #: 2:21-cv-02252
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Apr 21, 2021
Terminated:Nov 08, 2021
Last checked: Monday Oct 18, 2021 5:40 AM CDT
Defendant
Healthquest, P.C.
58 Timber Creek Dr.
Cordova, TN 38018
Represented By
Darrell J. O'Neal
Law Office Of Darrell J. O'Neal
contact info
Mediator
Clarence Halmon
Archibald & Halmon PC Falls Bldg Suite 790 22 North Front Street
Memphis, TN 38103
Miscellaneous
Temiika Gipson
Circuit Court, 30th Judicial District Shelby County Courthouse 140 Adams Ave, Rm 224
Memphis, TN 38103
Plaintiff
Victoria L. Carroll
Represented By
Genevieve Sabotnik Land
Jg Law Firm
contact info
Edward M. Bearman
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Reggie Glenn
Terminated: 06/21/2021
58 Timber Creek
Cordova, TN 38018
Represented By
Darrell J. O'Neal
Law Office Of Darrell J. O'Neal
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Monday, November 08, 2021
20 20 order Judgment Mon 11/08 9:33 AM
JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Mark S. Norris on 11/8/2021. (Norris, Mark)
Related: [-]
Saturday, November 06, 2021
19 19 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Sat 11/06 4:36 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Healthquest, P.C.. (O'Neal, Darrell)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 23, 2021
18 18 notice Notice of Mediation Status Thu 09/23 2:53 PM
NOTICE OF MEDIATION STATUS by Clarence Halmon Report of Mediation by Rule 31 Neutral (Halmon, Clarence)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 13, 2021
17 17 order Scheduling Order Fri 08/13 11:15 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Mark S. Norris on 8/13/2021. (Norris, Mark)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice Setting Letter Fri 08/13 9:41 AM
SETTING LETTER: Non-Jury Trial set for Monday, 07/25/2022 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 4 - Memphis before Judge Mark S. Norris. Pretrial Conference set for Friday, 07/15/2022 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 4 - Memphis before Judge Mark S. Norris. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 07/08/2022. (zsf)
Related: [-]
15 15 minutes Scheduling Conference Fri 08/13 9:39 AM
MINUTES: Scheduling Conference held via Microsoft Teams Video on 08/13/2021 before Judge Mark S. Norris. Attys Edward M. Bearman & Genevieve Sabotnik Land appeared for the plaintiff; Atty Darrell J. ONeal appeared for the defendant; proposed scheduling order adopted. The following deadlines/schedules were established: Non-Jury Trial set Monday, 07/25/2022 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 4 - Memphis before Judge Mark S. Norris (estimated 3 days); Pretrial Conference set Friday, 07/15/2022 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 4 - Memphis before Judge Mark S. Norris; Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due 07/08/2022. Scheduling Order to enter. (Court Reporter: Lisa Mayo) (zsf)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 10, 2021
14 14 notice Setting Letter - Teams Tue 08/10 10:53 AM
SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for Friday, 08/13/2021 at 09:30 AM before Judge Mark S. Norris. The proceeding will be held via Microsoft Teams video conference. The Court will email the parties an invitation for the video conference prior to the proceeding. Counsel should submit any exhibits to be offered to the Judge's ECF mailbox prior to the proceeding. The public may also access the video proceeding. If the public and/or media wish to attend in the video proceeding, please click on the following link to request access information: [LINK:https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/videohearings] The access information will be delivered via email to the email address from which the request originated. Parties should consult the instructions for [LINK:Joining a Meeting in Teams] or [LINK:Joining a Meeting Without a Teams Account] . (zsf)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 20, 2021
13 13 order Order on Motion to Continue Tue 07/20 9:50 AM
[**TEXT ORDER ONLY - NO IMAGE ATTACHED**] ORDER GRANTING12 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. Plaintiff's motion is hereby GRANTED. The Scheduling Conference in this matter is hereby reset to August 13, 2021 at 9:30 a.m. Signed by Judge Mark S. Norris on 7/20/2021. (Norris, Mark)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 16, 2021
12 12 motion Continue Fri 07/16 11:26 AM
MOTION to Continue Proposed Order Submitted by Victoria L. Carroll.(Bearman, Edward)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Consultation
Tuesday, July 06, 2021
11 11 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Tue 07/06 4:18 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Bearman, Edward)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 21, 2021
10 10 order Judgment Mon 06/21 11:46 AM
JUDGMENT WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT REGGIE GLENN. Signed by Judge Mark S. Norris on 6/21/21. (Norris, Mark)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 06/21 10:52 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Victoria L. Carroll (Bearman, Edward)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 01, 2021
8 8 notice Setting Letter Tue 06/01 10:02 AM
SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for Friday, 07/30/2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4 - Memphis before Judge Mark S. Norris. (zsf)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 25, 2021
7 7 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Tue 05/25 8:21 PM
First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Reggie Glenn by Reggie Glenn.(O'Neal, Darrell)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum Memorandum in Support of Dismissal
Friday, May 21, 2021
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 05/21 9:37 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by All Defendants.(O'Neal, Darrell)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 21, 2021
5 5 notice Notice LR 72.1 - Right to Consent to Jurisdiction by Magistrate Judge Wed 04/21 3:03 PM
NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (btg)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice ADR Compliance Wed 04/21 3:03 PM
NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (btg)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice LR 16.2 Wed 04/21 3:03 PM
NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (btg)
Related: [-]
2 2 utility Add and Terminate Judges Wed 04/21 3:02 PM
Judge Mark S. Norris and Magistrate Judge Annie T. Christoff added. (btg)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Wed 04/21 2:29 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Shelby County Circuit, case number CT-1489-21 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNWDC-3592673), filed by All Defendants.(O'Neal, Darrell)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex. A, State Court Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex. B, Notice of Removal,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover