Oklahoma Western District Court
Judge:Scott L Palk
Case #: 5:21-cv-00374
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Case Filed:Apr 21, 2021
Last checked: Monday Oct 18, 2021 4:42 AM CDT
Defendant
Edmonds First Mortgage LLC
Defendant
First Mortgage Company LLC
Represented By
Justin G Bates
contact info
Fred A Leibrock
contact info
Defendant
First Permanent LLC
Represented By
James M Chaney
Kirk & Chaney
contact info
Defendant
KBKB LLC
Represented By
James M Chaney
Kirk & Chaney
contact info
Defendant
KBMAC LLC
Represented By
James M Chaney
Kirk & Chaney
contact info
Defendant
Kyle McCord
Represented By
James M Chaney
Kirk & Chaney
contact info
Defendant
Ron McCord
Represented By
Justin G Bates
contact info
Fred A Leibrock
contact info
Defendant
McCord Family LLC
Represented By
Justin G Bates
contact info
Fred A Leibrock
contact info
Defendant
RJAC LLC
Defendant
RonnyMac LLC
Represented By
James M Chaney
Kirk & Chaney
contact info
Defendant
Shelter Fund The
Plaintiff
Caploc LLC
Represented By
Aaron Z Tobin
Condon Tobin Sladek Thornton PLLC
contact info
Jared T S Pace
Condon Tobin Sladek Thornton PLLC
contact info
Cheryl P Hunter
Hunter & Co Law PLLC
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
First Liberty Holdings LLC
Terminated: 07/09/2021
Represented By
Michael A Duncan
Mcafee & Taft-Okc
contact info
Justin G Bates
contact info
Fred A Leibrock
contact info
Spencer F Smith
Mcafee & Taft-Okc
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Tuesday, January 02, 2024
82 82 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 01/02 1:51 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF ALL CLAIMS AGAINST RON MCCORD, FIRST MORTGAGE COMPANY, LLC AND THE MCCORD FAMILY, LLC by Caploc LLC. (Pace, Jared)
Related: [-]
81 81 notice ~Notice (other) Tue 01/02 1:50 PM
NOTICE (other) by Caploc LLC OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF ALL CLAIMS AGAINST RJAC, LLC, EDMONDS FIRST MORTGAGE, LLC AND THE SHELTER FUND (Pace, Jared)
Related: [-]