PATEL v. BIDEN et al
District Of Columbia District Court | |
Judge: | Tanya S Chutkan |
Case #: | 1:21-cv-01076 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1391 Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Apr 14, 2021 |
Terminated: | Jul 04, 2021 |
Last checked: Monday Oct 11, 2021 7:25 AM EDT |
Defendant
JOE BIDEN
|
|
Defendant
EMORY UNIVERSITY
|
|
Defendant
FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
|
|
Defendant
VERONICA SYRETIA ROOT MARTINEZ
|
|
Defendant
STATE OF INDIANA
|
|
Defendant
DONALD J. TRUMP
|
|
Defendant
UNITED STATES MILITARY
|
|
Defendant
UNIVERSITY OF NOTRE DAME DU LAC
|
|
Defendant
UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
|
|
Plaintiff
RAJ K. PATEL
1239 Spring Lake Drive
Brownsburg, IN 46112 |
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Tuesday, October 26, 2021 | ||
16 | 16
appeal
USCA Mandate
Thu 11/04 10:10 AM
MANDATE of USCA as to8 Notice of Appeal, filed by RAJ K. PATEL ; USCA Case Number 21-5155 (znmw) |
|
Att: 1 USCA Order filed 9/1/2021 | ||
Friday, July 23, 2021 | ||
15 | 15
appeal
Supplemental ROA Sent to USCA
Fri 07/23 3:59 PM
Supplemental Record on Appeal transmitted to US Court of Appeals re USCA Appeal Fees ;USCA Case Number 21-5155 (ztd) |
|
appeal
USCA Appeal Fees
Fri 07/23 3:56 PM
USCA Appeal Fees received $ 505 receipt number 200253 re8 Notice of Appeal, filed by RAJ K. PATEL (ztd) |
||
Wednesday, July 14, 2021 | ||
13 | 13
appeal
Supplemental ROA Sent to USCA
Wed 07/14 11:31 AM
Supplemental Record on Appeal transmitted to US Court of Appeals re12 Supplemental Memorandum ; (ztd) |
|
Tuesday, July 13, 2021 | ||
11 | 11
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis
Tue 07/13 12:44 PM
ORDER denying9 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis. The Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of this Order to Plaintiff at his address of record. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 7/13/21. (DJS) |
|
Wednesday, July 07, 2021 | ||
14 | 14
appeal
USCA Order
Wed 07/14 1:53 PM
ORDER of USCA (certified copy) as to8 Notice of Appeal, filed by RAJ K. PATEL ; USCA Case Number 21-5155 (ztd) |
|
Tuesday, July 06, 2021 | ||
12 | 12
respm
Supplemental Memorandum
Wed 07/14 11:24 AM
SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re8 Notice of Appeal, filed by RAJ K. PATEL. (ztd) |
|
10 | 10
appeal
Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA
Tue 07/06 3:20 PM
Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed (Memorandum Opinion), and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. Motion to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis has been filed. Another transmission will be forwarded when the motion has been decided re8 Notice of Appeal,. (ztd) |
|
Friday, July 02, 2021 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Appeal In Forma Pauperis
Tue 07/06 3:17 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by RAJ K. PATEL. (ztd) |
|
8 | 8
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Tue 07/06 3:16 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to7 Order on Motion for CM/ECF Password,, Order on Motion for Order,, Order on Motion to Amend/Correct,6 Memorandum & Opinion by RAJ K. PATEL. Fee Status: No Fee Paid; IFP Motion Pending. Parties have been notified.(ztd) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
7 | 7
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for CM/ECF Password Order on Motion for Order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
Fri 07/02 11:41 AM
ORDER: Dismissing this action; Denying2 Motion for CM/ECF Password; Denying3 Motion for Order; Denying5 Motion to Amend/Correct. The Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of this Order and the accompanying Memorandum Opinion6 to: RAJ K. PATEL, 1239 Spring Lake Drive, Brownsburg, IN 46112. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 7/2/21. (DJS) |
|
6 | 6
2
pgs
order
Memorandum & Opinion
Fri 07/02 11:35 AM
MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 7/2/21. (DJS) |
|
Tuesday, May 18, 2021 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Amend/Correct
Wed 05/19 6:10 PM
MOTION to Amend/Correct1 Complaint, by RAJ K. PATEL. (ztd) |
|
4 | 4
service
Certificate of Service
Wed 05/19 6:03 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by RAJ K. PATEL re1 Complaint,3 MOTION for Order,2 MOTION for CM/ECF Password. (ztd) |
|
Tuesday, April 20, 2021 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Motion For Order
Thu 04/22 3:15 PM
MOTION for Order by RAJ K. PATEL.(ztd) |
|
Att: 1 Biden, | ||
Att: 2 Emory, | ||
Att: 3 Trump, | ||
Att: 4 SOI, | ||
Att: 5 Trump, | ||
Att: 6 Trump, | ||
Att: 7 UND, | ||
Att: 8 US Attorney General, | ||
Att: 9 US Attorney, | ||
Att: 10 Martinez | ||
2 | 2
motion
CM/ECF Password
Thu 04/22 3:09 PM
MOTION for CM/ECF Password by RAJ K. PATEL. (ztd) |
|
Wednesday, April 14, 2021 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 04/22 3:08 PM
COMPLAINT against JOE BIDEN, EMORY UNIVERSITY, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, VERONICA SYRETIA ROOT MARTINEZ, STATE OF INDIANA, DONALD J. TRUMP, UNITED STATES, UNITED STATES MILITARY, UNIVERSITY OF NOTRE DAME DU LAC filed by RAJ K. PATEL.(ztd) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
service
Summons Not Issued
Thu 04/22 3:16 PM
SUMMONS Not Issued as to JOE BIDEN, EMORY UNIVERSITY, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, VERONICA SYRETIA ROOT MARTINEZ, STATE OF INDIANA, DONALD J. TRUMP, UNITED STATES, UNITED STATES MILITARY, UNIVERSITY OF NOTRE DAME DU LAC (ztd) |
||
misc
Filing Fee Received
Thu 04/22 3:21 PM
Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number: 4616105443. (ztd) |