Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Steve C Jones
Case #: 1:21-cv-01640
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:2201 Declaratory Judgment (Insurance)
Case Filed:Apr 21, 2021
Terminated:Mar 17, 2023
Last checked: Monday Oct 18, 2021 5:06 AM EDT
Counter Claimant
Executive Auto Sales and Service, LLC
Represented By
John Colquitt Rogers
contact info
Counter Claimant
Cherie Parker
Represented By
John Colquitt Rogers
contact info
Counter Claimant
Jack Parker
Represented By
John Colquitt Rogers
contact info
Counter Defendant
Haulers Insurance Company, Inc.
Represented By
David Russell Smith
Bovis, Kyle, Burch & Medlin, LLC
contact info
Steven J. Kyle
Bovis, Kyle, Burch & Medlin, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Dingy Dents, LLC
Represented By
Christine S. Tenley
Mcglinchey Stafford, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Executive Auto Sales and Service, LLC
Represented By
John Colquitt Rogers
contact info
Defendant
Cherie Parker
Represented By
John Colquitt Rogers
contact info
Defendant
Jack Parker
Represented By
John Colquitt Rogers
contact info
Defendant
Wilburt Rivera
Represented By
Christine S. Tenley
Mcglinchey Stafford, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Haulers Insurance Company, Inc.
Represented By
David Russell Smith
Bovis, Kyle, Burch & Medlin, LLC
contact info
Steven J. Kyle
Bovis, Kyle, Burch & Medlin, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Friday, March 17, 2023
53 53 misc Judgment - Clerk Fri 03/17 4:29 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT entere in favor of Plaintiff and against Defendants. (ddm)
Related: [-]
52 52 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Judgment Fri 03/17 4:28 PM
ORDER granting51 Plaintiff's Motion for Final Entry Judgment. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 03/17/2023. (ddm)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Fri 03/17 4:30 PM
Civil Case Terminated. (ddm)
Related: [-]