Illinois Southern District Court
Case #: 3:21-cr-30048
Case Filed:Apr 21, 2021
Last checked: Friday Apr 23, 2021 2:40 AM CDT
Defendant
Delon Echols (1)
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Karelia S. Rajagopal
U.S. Attorney'S Office - Fairview Heights
contact info

GPO Jun 06 2023
ORDER: 97 MOTION for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Stephen P. McGlynn on 6/6/2023. (bceb)

Docket last updated: 03/21/2023 8:00 PM CDT
Wednesday, April 21, 2021
NOTICE: At the direction of the Judicial Conference of the United States, all plea agreements and sentencing memoranda contain a sealed supplement which is either a statement that there is cooperation, or a statement that there is no cooperation, and, as a result, it is not possible to determine from examination of docket entries whether a defendant did or did not cooperate with the government. (ack)
Related: [-]
1 1 1 pgs INDICTMENT as to Delon Echols (1) count(s) 1. (ack)
Related: [-]
4 4 1 pgs Arrest Warrant Issued as to Delon Echols (ack)
Related: [-]