Case Filed:Apr 21, 2021
Last checked: Friday Apr 23, 2021 3:57 AM EDT
Defendant
Charles Thomas Hilburn (1)
Represented By
Nicole Lybrand
Federal Public Defender'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Kimlani Murray Ford
U.S. Attorneys Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 09/12/2021 12:11 PM EDT
Monday, March 22, 2021
1 1 MOTION to Seal Case by USA as to Charles Thomas Hilburn. (brl) [3:21-mj-00072-DSC]
Related: [-]
2 2 ORDER granting 1 Motion to Seal Case as to Charles Thomas Hilburn (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 3/22/2021. (brl) [3:21-mj-00072-DSC]
Related: [-]
3 3 SEALED COMPLAINT as to Charles Thomas Hilburn (1). (brl) [3:21-mj-00072-DSC]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
4 4 Arrest Warrant Issued (Sealed - Case Participants) by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer in case as to Charles Thomas Hilburn.(brl) [3:21-mj-00072-DSC]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Warrant Page Identifier
Thursday, March 25, 2021
Arrest of Charles Thomas Hilburn in Eastern District of North Carolina. (rth) [3:21-mj-00072-DSC]
Related: [-]
Monday, March 29, 2021
5 5 Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received as to Charles Thomas Hilburn(rth) [3:21-mj-00072-DSC]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Waiver,
Att: 2 FPD Order,
Att: 3 Docket Sheet
6 6 CJA 23 (Ex Parte) Financial Affidavit by Charles Thomas Hilburn (transferred from Eastern District of North Carolina) (rth) [3:21-mj-00072-DSC]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 31, 2021
7 7 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 03/25/2021 in case as to Charles Thomas Hilburn. (js) [3:21-mj-00072-DSC]
Related: [-]
Monday, April 05, 2021
Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings as to Charles Thomas Hilburn: Initial Appearance set for 4/6/2021 10:05 AM in Courtroom 1-1, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before Magistrate Judge David Keesler. (mga) [3:21-mj-00072-DSC]
Related: [-]
8 8 PRETRIAL REPORT (SEALED - Attorney) as to Charles Thomas Hilburn (available to USA, Charles Thomas Hilburn) (Amanda Martin - sb) [3:21-mj-00072-DSC]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 06, 2021
ORAL MOTION to Unseal Case by USA as to Charles Thomas Hilburn. (mga) [3:21-mj-00072-DSC]
Related: [-]
ORAL ORDER granting Oral Motion to Unseal Case as to Charles Thomas Hilburn (1). Entered by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 4/6/21. (mga) [3:21-mj-00072-DSC]
Related: [-]
Minute Entry: INITIAL APPEARANCE as to Charles Thomas Hilburn held before Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Defendant advised of rights & charges. Defendant moved for appointment of counsel. Defendant filed a financial affidavit. Court approved appointment of counsel. Government moved for detention. Defendant detained pending detention hearing. Detention Hearing set for 4/9/2021 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1-1, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Preliminary Hearing set for 4/9/2021 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1-1, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before Magistrate Judge David Keesler.Government attorney: William Bozin. Defendant attorney: Nicole Lybrand. Court Reporter: DCR. (mga) [3:21-mj-00072-DSC]
Related: [-]
ORAL ORDER as to Charles Thomas Hilburn granting Oral Motion to Appoint Counsel. Entered by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 4/6/21. (mga) [3:21-mj-00072-DSC]
Related: [-]
NOTICE OF HEARING as to Charles Thomas Hilburn: Note to counsel: The Waiver must be filed no later than NOON the last business day prior to the hearing. Detention Hearing set for 4/9/2021 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1-1, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Preliminary Hearing set for 4/9/2021 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1-1, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before Magistrate Judge David Keesler. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (mga) [3:21-mj-00072-DSC]
Related: [-]
9 9 CJA 23 (Ex Parte) Financial Affidavit by Charles Thomas Hilburn (mga) (mga). [3:21-mj-00072-DSC]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 07, 2021
Attorney update in case as to Charles Thomas Hilburn. Attorney Nicole Lybrand for Charles Thomas Hilburn added. (mek) [3:21-mj-00072-DSC]
Related: [-]
Friday, April 09, 2021
Minute Entry: PRELIMINARY HEARING and DETENTION HEARING as to Charles Thomas Hilburn held before Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Probable cause found. Government moved for detention. Defendant detained. Government attorney: Kimlani Ford. Defendant attorney: Nicole Lybrand. Court Reporter: DCR. (mga) [3:21-mj-00072-DSC]
Related: [-]
11 11 3 pgs ORDER OF DETENTION as to Charles Thomas Hilburn. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 4/9/21. (mga) [3:21-mj-00072-DSC]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 21, 2021
13 13 3 pgs INDICTMENT as to Charles Thomas Hilburn (1) count(s) 1-7, 8. (mga)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Unredacted Signature Page,
Att: 2 1 pgs Cover Sheet