Louisiana Western District Court
Case #: 1:21-cr-00058
Case Filed:Mar 24, 2021
Last checked: Friday Apr 23, 2021 2:39 AM CDT
Defendant
Hayden Philip Breaux (1)
Defendant
D'Quincy Marquis Jones (2)
Represented By
Thomas C Damico
Damico & Stockstill
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Seth D Reeg
U S Attorneys Office (shv)
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/23/2021 4:21 AM CDT
Wednesday, March 24, 2021
1 1 INDICTMENT as to Hayden Philip Breaux (1) count(s) 1, 2-6, D'Quincy Marquis Jones (2) count(s) 1, 2-6. (crt,Adams, K)
Related: [-]
2 2 INDICTMENT WITH SIGNATURE filed under seal as to Hayden Philip Breaux (1), D'Quincy Marquis Jones (2) (crt,Adams, K)
Related: [-]
3 3 DEFENDANT INFORMATION SHEET filed under seal as to Hayden Philip Breaux (1) (crt,Adams, K)
Related: [-]
4 4 DEFENDANT INFORMATION SHEET filed under seal as to D'Quincy Marquis Jones (2) (crt,Adams, K)
Related: [-]
5 5 MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby: GRAND JURY REPORT as to Hayden Philip Breaux (1), D'Quincy Marquis Jones (2); Open Indictment. Summons to issue. (Court Reporter: LCR, Shreveport-Crtrm 3) (crt,Adams, K)
Related: [-]
6 6 SUMMONS Issued and filed under seal in case as to Hayden Philip Breaux (1) Initial Appearance and Arraignment set for 5/11/2021 02:30 PM by video conference before Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Adams, K)
Related: [-]
7 7 SUMMONS Issued and filed under seal in case as to D'Quincy Marquis Jones (2) Initial Appearance and Arraignment set for 5/11/2021 02:30 PM by video conference before Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Adams, K)
Related: [-]