Missouri Western District Court
Judge:Brian C Wimes
Case #: 4:21-cv-00268
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause12:635 Breach of Insurance Contract
Case Filed:Apr 23, 2021
Terminated:Mar 31, 2022
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 20, 2021 3:53 AM CDT
Defendant
Arch Insurance Company
Represented By
James M. Humphrey
Berkowitz Oliver Llp-Kcmo
contact info
Laura E Besvinick
Stroock
contact info
Julie E Nevins
Strook
contact info
Christina Wahl
Berkowitz Oliver Llp-Kcmo
contact info
David F Oliver
Berkowitz Oliver Llp-Kcmo
contact info
Defendant
Tradblue, LLC
Plaintiff
Club Pilates Franchise LLC
Represented By
Michael O Fawaz
Howard & Howard Attorneys PLLC
contact info
Christopher R Mosley
Sherman & Howard Llc - Denver
contact info
Kristie Blunt Welder
Welder Blunt Welder & Associates, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Cyclebar Franchising LLC
Represented By
Michael O Fawaz
Howard & Howard Attorneys PLLC
contact info
Christopher R Mosley
Sherman & Howard Llc - Denver
contact info
Kristie Blunt Welder
Welder Blunt Welder & Associates, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
PB Franchising LLC
Represented By
Michael O Fawaz
Howard & Howard Attorneys PLLC
contact info
Christopher R Mosley
Sherman & Howard Llc - Denver
contact info
Kristie Blunt Welder
Welder Blunt Welder & Associates, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Row House Franchise LLC
Represented By
Michael O Fawaz
Howard & Howard Attorneys PLLC
contact info
Christopher R Mosley
Sherman & Howard Llc - Denver
contact info
Kristie Blunt Welder
Welder Blunt Welder & Associates, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Stretch Lab Franchise LLC
Represented By
Michael O Fawaz
Howard & Howard Attorneys PLLC
contact info
Christopher R Mosley
Sherman & Howard Llc - Denver
contact info
Kristie Blunt Welder
Welder Blunt Welder & Associates, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Stride Franchise LLC
Represented By
Michael O Fawaz
Howard & Howard Attorneys PLLC
contact info
Christopher R Mosley
Sherman & Howard Llc - Denver
contact info
Kristie Blunt Welder
Welder Blunt Welder & Associates, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
David Wolk
Represented By
Michael O Fawaz
Howard & Howard Attorneys PLLC
contact info
Christopher R Mosley
Sherman & Howard Llc - Denver
contact info
Kristie Blunt Welder
Welder Blunt Welder & Associates, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Yoga Six Franchise LLC
Represented By
Michael O Fawaz
Howard & Howard Attorneys PLLC
contact info
Christopher R Mosley
Sherman & Howard Llc - Denver
contact info
Kristie Blunt Welder
Welder Blunt Welder & Associates, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
6PK Fitness, LLC
Represented By
Michael O Fawaz
Howard & Howard Attorneys PLLC
contact info
Christopher R Mosley
Sherman & Howard Llc - Denver
contact info
Kristie Blunt Welder
Welder Blunt Welder & Associates, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Cat, Naps, and Tapbacks, LLC
Represented By
Michael O Fawaz
Howard & Howard Attorneys PLLC
contact info
Christopher R Mosley
Sherman & Howard Llc - Denver
contact info
Kristie Blunt Welder
Welder Blunt Welder & Associates, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
DMWCP2, LLC
Represented By
Michael O Fawaz
Howard & Howard Attorneys PLLC
contact info
Christopher R Mosley
Sherman & Howard Llc - Denver
contact info
Kristie Blunt Welder
Welder Blunt Welder & Associates, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Hitzemann Ventures Two, LLC
Represented By
Michael O Fawaz
Howard & Howard Attorneys PLLC
contact info
Christopher R Mosley
Sherman & Howard Llc - Denver
contact info
Kristie Blunt Welder
Welder Blunt Welder & Associates, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Hitzemann Ventures, LLC
Represented By
Michael O Fawaz
Howard & Howard Attorneys PLLC
contact info
Christopher R Mosley
Sherman & Howard Llc - Denver
contact info
Kristie Blunt Welder
Welder Blunt Welder & Associates, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
RH 209, LLC
Represented By
Michael O Fawaz
Howard & Howard Attorneys PLLC
contact info
Christopher R Mosley
Sherman & Howard Llc - Denver
contact info
Kristie Blunt Welder
Welder Blunt Welder & Associates, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Rose Ventures Corp
Represented By
Michael O Fawaz
Howard & Howard Attorneys PLLC
contact info
Christopher R Mosley
Sherman & Howard Llc - Denver
contact info
Kristie Blunt Welder
Welder Blunt Welder & Associates, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Thursday, March 31, 2022
53 53 order Clerk's Judgment Thu 03/31 3:30 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT (Diefenbach, Tracy)
Related: [-]
52 52 16 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Thu 03/31 3:29 PM
ORDERED that Defendant Arch Insurance Company's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. #21) is GRANTED. The amended complaint (Doc. #18) is DISMISSED. Signed on 3/31/22 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. (Diefenbach, Tracy)
Related: [-]