Washington Western District Court
Judge:Richard A Jones
Case #: 2:21-cv-00546
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause05:551 Administrative Procedure Act
Case Filed:Apr 23, 2021
Terminated:Jun 14, 2021
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 20, 2021 2:10 AM PDT
Defendant
Alejandro Mayorkas
Represented By
Michelle R. Lambert
Us Attorney'S Office (tacoma)
contact info
James C. Strong
Us Attorney'S Office (sea)
contact info
Plaintiff
Khushboo Agarwal
Represented By
Kripa Upadhyay
Orbit Law PLLC
contact info
Jonathan D. Wasden
Wasden Banias LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Roli Agarwal
Represented By
Kripa Upadhyay
Orbit Law PLLC
contact info
Jonathan D. Wasden
Wasden Banias LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Jhansi Asam
Represented By
Kripa Upadhyay
Orbit Law PLLC
contact info
Jonathan D. Wasden
Wasden Banias LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Chinmayee Bhalchandra Atre
Represented By
Kripa Upadhyay
Orbit Law PLLC
contact info
Jonathan D. Wasden
Wasden Banias LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Chandan Baluja
Represented By
Kripa Upadhyay
Orbit Law PLLC
contact info
Jonathan D. Wasden
Wasden Banias LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Aarti Bhadouria
Represented By
Kripa Upadhyay
Orbit Law PLLC
contact info
Jonathan D. Wasden
Wasden Banias LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Sahana Ramesh Bhagavan
Represented By
Kripa Upadhyay
Orbit Law PLLC
contact info
Jonathan D. Wasden
Wasden Banias LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Jodie Semp Blaskey
Represented By
Kripa Upadhyay
Orbit Law PLLC
contact info
Jonathan D. Wasden
Wasden Banias LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Satya Harika Challa
Represented By
Kripa Upadhyay
Orbit Law PLLC
contact info
Jonathan D. Wasden
Wasden Banias LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Priyanka Chava
Represented By
Kripa Upadhyay
Orbit Law PLLC
contact info
Jonathan D. Wasden
Wasden Banias LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Swati Dua
Represented By
Kripa Upadhyay
Orbit Law PLLC
contact info
Jonathan D. Wasden
Wasden Banias LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Ravinder Reddy Gajulapally
Represented By
Kripa Upadhyay
Orbit Law PLLC
contact info
Jonathan D. Wasden
Wasden Banias LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Sneha Gangal
Represented By
Kripa Upadhyay
Orbit Law PLLC
contact info
Jonathan D. Wasden
Wasden Banias LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Rekha Gopal
Represented By
Kripa Upadhyay
Orbit Law PLLC
contact info
Jonathan D. Wasden
Wasden Banias LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Kavya Gupta
Represented By
Kripa Upadhyay
Orbit Law PLLC
contact info
Jonathan D. Wasden
Wasden Banias LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Ritika Gupta
Represented By
Kripa Upadhyay
Orbit Law PLLC
contact info
Jonathan D. Wasden
Wasden Banias LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Sai Smruthi Bhyrava Joshyula
Represented By
Kripa Upadhyay
Orbit Law PLLC
contact info
Jonathan D. Wasden
Wasden Banias LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Abhay Kapoor
Represented By
Kripa Upadhyay
Orbit Law PLLC
contact info
Jonathan D. Wasden
Wasden Banias LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Akash Kishor Khakole
Represented By
Kripa Upadhyay
Orbit Law PLLC
contact info
Jonathan D. Wasden
Wasden Banias LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Aditi Khemka
Represented By
Kripa Upadhyay
Orbit Law PLLC
contact info
Jonathan D. Wasden
Wasden Banias LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Snehalatha Koppisetti
Represented By
Kripa Upadhyay
Orbit Law PLLC
contact info
Jonathan D. Wasden
Wasden Banias LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Aditi Kumar
Represented By
Kripa Upadhyay
Orbit Law PLLC
contact info
Jonathan D. Wasden
Wasden Banias LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Geeta Mandavilli
Represented By
Kripa Upadhyay
Orbit Law PLLC
contact info
Jonathan D. Wasden
Wasden Banias LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Vamshi Krishna Maringanti
Represented By
Kripa Upadhyay
Orbit Law PLLC
contact info
Jonathan D. Wasden
Wasden Banias LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Monisha Mitra
Represented By
Kripa Upadhyay
Orbit Law PLLC
contact info
Jonathan D. Wasden
Wasden Banias LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Nishita Movva
Represented By
Kripa Upadhyay
Orbit Law PLLC
contact info
Jonathan D. Wasden
Wasden Banias LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Sruthy Preman Mulloth
Represented By
Kripa Upadhyay
Orbit Law PLLC
contact info
Jonathan D. Wasden
Wasden Banias LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Pranathi Pachika
Represented By
Kripa Upadhyay
Orbit Law PLLC
contact info
Jonathan D. Wasden
Wasden Banias LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Bhargavi Palla
Represented By
Kripa Upadhyay
Orbit Law PLLC
contact info
Jonathan D. Wasden
Wasden Banias LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Andappa Pancham
Represented By
Kripa Upadhyay
Orbit Law PLLC
contact info
Jonathan D. Wasden
Wasden Banias LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Amruta Phatak
Represented By
Kripa Upadhyay
Orbit Law PLLC
contact info
Jonathan D. Wasden
Wasden Banias LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Roshni Prabhakaran
Represented By
Kripa Upadhyay
Orbit Law PLLC
contact info
Jonathan D. Wasden
Wasden Banias LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Mrudula Puppala
Represented By
Kripa Upadhyay
Orbit Law PLLC
contact info
Jonathan D. Wasden
Wasden Banias LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Venkatalakshmipravallika Ramachandruni
Represented By
Kripa Upadhyay
Orbit Law PLLC
contact info
Jonathan D. Wasden
Wasden Banias LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Divya Rathi
Represented By
Kripa Upadhyay
Orbit Law PLLC
contact info
Jonathan D. Wasden
Wasden Banias LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Lavanya Samineni
Represented By
Kripa Upadhyay
Orbit Law PLLC
contact info
Jonathan D. Wasden
Wasden Banias LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Sonali Sen
Represented By
Kripa Upadhyay
Orbit Law PLLC
contact info
Jonathan D. Wasden
Wasden Banias LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Rashmi Sethuram
Represented By
Kripa Upadhyay
Orbit Law PLLC
contact info
Jonathan D. Wasden
Wasden Banias LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Ami Shah
Represented By
Kripa Upadhyay
Orbit Law PLLC
contact info
Jonathan D. Wasden
Wasden Banias LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Niall Shannon
Represented By
Kripa Upadhyay
Orbit Law PLLC
contact info
Jonathan D. Wasden
Wasden Banias LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Keerthana Rajagopal Shanthi
Represented By
Kripa Upadhyay
Orbit Law PLLC
contact info
Jonathan D. Wasden
Wasden Banias LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Shilpi Sharma
Represented By
Kripa Upadhyay
Orbit Law PLLC
contact info
Jonathan D. Wasden
Wasden Banias LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Surabhi Singh
Represented By
Kripa Upadhyay
Orbit Law PLLC
contact info
Jonathan D. Wasden
Wasden Banias LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Anthony Singleton
Represented By
Kripa Upadhyay
Orbit Law PLLC
contact info
Jonathan D. Wasden
Wasden Banias LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Uthra Sridhar
Represented By
Kripa Upadhyay
Orbit Law PLLC
contact info
Jonathan D. Wasden
Wasden Banias LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Naveen Kumar Sujatha
Represented By
Kripa Upadhyay
Orbit Law PLLC
contact info
Jonathan D. Wasden
Wasden Banias LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Anuradha Raja Surya
Represented By
Kripa Upadhyay
Orbit Law PLLC
contact info
Jonathan D. Wasden
Wasden Banias LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Ranadheer Thadasina
Represented By
Kripa Upadhyay
Orbit Law PLLC
contact info
Jonathan D. Wasden
Wasden Banias LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Srilatha Veeramaneni
Represented By
Kripa Upadhyay
Orbit Law PLLC
contact info
Jonathan D. Wasden
Wasden Banias LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Stalinitha Malini Vemavarapu
Represented By
Kripa Upadhyay
Orbit Law PLLC
contact info
Jonathan D. Wasden
Wasden Banias LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Swathi Ventrapragada
Represented By
Kripa Upadhyay
Orbit Law PLLC
contact info
Jonathan D. Wasden
Wasden Banias LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Julie Chantal Catherine Champigneulle
Represented By
Kripa Upadhyay
Orbit Law PLLC
contact info
Jonathan D. Wasden
Wasden Banias LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Fnu Vrinda
Represented By
Kripa Upadhyay
Orbit Law PLLC
contact info
Jonathan D. Wasden
Wasden Banias LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Debarati Aich
Represented By
Jonathan D. Wasden
Wasden Banias LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Neha Allangh
Represented By
Jonathan D. Wasden
Wasden Banias LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Rukmini Perinkulan Ananthanarayanan
Represented By
Jonathan D. Wasden
Wasden Banias LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Phani Ande
Represented By
Jonathan D. Wasden
Wasden Banias LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Renuka Andey
Represented By
Jonathan D. Wasden
Wasden Banias LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Neelima Annabathula
Represented By
Jonathan D. Wasden
Wasden Banias LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Nikhitha Bobbili
Represented By
Jonathan D. Wasden
Wasden Banias LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Sri Pavithra Boyapati
Represented By
Jonathan D. Wasden
Wasden Banias LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Harsha Chembolu
Represented By
Jonathan D. Wasden
Wasden Banias LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Neha Chhabra
Represented By
Jonathan D. Wasden
Wasden Banias LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Rajamani Chidambaram
Represented By
Jonathan D. Wasden
Wasden Banias LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Mradula Choubey
Represented By
Jonathan D. Wasden
Wasden Banias LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Kasturi Shrikant Dalvi
Represented By
Jonathan D. Wasden
Wasden Banias LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Vinita Doshi
Represented By
Jonathan D. Wasden
Wasden Banias LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Anju Ettitara
Represented By
Jonathan D. Wasden
Wasden Banias LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Indraja Gaddam
Represented By
Jonathan D. Wasden
Wasden Banias LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Tanuja Hegde
Represented By
Jonathan D. Wasden
Wasden Banias LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Nikita Suhaskumar Jagdale
Represented By
Jonathan D. Wasden
Wasden Banias LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Kiran Mayee Jannuru
Represented By
Jonathan D. Wasden
Wasden Banias LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Goodly Jena
Represented By
Jonathan D. Wasden
Wasden Banias LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Neetha John
Represented By
Jonathan D. Wasden
Wasden Banias LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Satya Chandana Durga Karanam
Represented By
Jonathan D. Wasden
Wasden Banias LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Sai Moulika Reddy Kareti
Represented By
Jonathan D. Wasden
Wasden Banias LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Aarti Karnik
Represented By
Jonathan D. Wasden
Wasden Banias LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Isha Malhotra
Represented By
Jonathan D. Wasden
Wasden Banias LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Uma Sai Vaishnavi Modepalli
Represented By
Jonathan D. Wasden
Wasden Banias LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Lopamudra Muduli
Represented By
Jonathan D. Wasden
Wasden Banias LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Anulekha Nagarajan
Represented By
Jonathan D. Wasden
Wasden Banias LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Himaben Anujkumar Naik
Represented By
Jonathan D. Wasden
Wasden Banias LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Maheswari Subbiah Natarajan
Represented By
Jonathan D. Wasden
Wasden Banias LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Chandrika Saras Nekkanti
Represented By
Jonathan D. Wasden
Wasden Banias LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Purva Patwardhan
Represented By
Jonathan D. Wasden
Wasden Banias LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Zahabiya Petiwala
Represented By
Jonathan D. Wasden
Wasden Banias LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Shreyas Binnamangala Prabhu
Represented By
Jonathan D. Wasden
Wasden Banias LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Shilpa Puranik
Represented By
Jonathan D. Wasden
Wasden Banias LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Swetha Pyreddy
Represented By
Jonathan D. Wasden
Wasden Banias LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Jai Rajenimbalkar
Represented By
Jonathan D. Wasden
Wasden Banias LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Anusuya Rangithkumar
Represented By
Jonathan D. Wasden
Wasden Banias LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Sruthi Reddy
Represented By
Jonathan D. Wasden
Wasden Banias LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Nikita Mundada Sarda
Represented By
Jonathan D. Wasden
Wasden Banias LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
FNU Satinder Kaur
Represented By
Jonathan D. Wasden
Wasden Banias LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Dhanashree Savant
Represented By
Jonathan D. Wasden
Wasden Banias LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Gintare Schacht
Represented By
Jonathan D. Wasden
Wasden Banias LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Santhi Priya Selvam
Represented By
Jonathan D. Wasden
Wasden Banias LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Prerana Shikhare
Represented By
Jonathan D. Wasden
Wasden Banias LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Akshay Kumar Singh
Represented By
Jonathan D. Wasden
Wasden Banias LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Nancy Singh
Represented By
Jonathan D. Wasden
Wasden Banias LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Purnima Singh
Represented By
Jonathan D. Wasden
Wasden Banias LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Rachana Ashok Soitkar
Represented By
Jonathan D. Wasden
Wasden Banias LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Kanika Tandon
Represented By
Jonathan D. Wasden
Wasden Banias LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Madhuri Teelair
Represented By
Jonathan D. Wasden
Wasden Banias LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Sushma Vadyala
Represented By
Jonathan D. Wasden
Wasden Banias LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Srirami Reddy Vemireddy
Represented By
Jonathan D. Wasden
Wasden Banias LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Sreeranjini Venkatakrishnan
Represented By
Jonathan D. Wasden
Wasden Banias LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Gagandeep Virdi
Represented By
Jonathan D. Wasden
Wasden Banias LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Shital Vora
Represented By
Jonathan D. Wasden
Wasden Banias LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Shu Hui Geraldine Yeow
Represented By
Jonathan D. Wasden
Wasden Banias LLC
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Plaintiff
Fabian Janowski
Terminated: 06/07/2021
Represented By
Kripa Upadhyay
Orbit Law PLLC
contact info
Jonathan D. Wasden
Wasden Banias LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Anamika Kumari
Terminated: 06/07/2021
Represented By
Kripa Upadhyay
Orbit Law PLLC
contact info
Jonathan D. Wasden
Wasden Banias LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Nandini Sharma
Terminated: 06/07/2021
Represented By
Kripa Upadhyay
Orbit Law PLLC
contact info
Jonathan D. Wasden
Wasden Banias LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Madhavi Shinde
Terminated: 06/07/2021
Represented By
Kripa Upadhyay
Orbit Law PLLC
contact info
Jonathan D. Wasden
Wasden Banias LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, June 14, 2021
17 17 notice Notice of Supplemental Authority Mon 06/14 3:25 PM
NOTICE of Supplemental Authority by Plaintiffs Khushboo Agarwal, Roli Agarwal, Debarati Aich, Neha Allangh, Rukmini Perinkulan Ananthanarayanan, Phani Ande, Renuka Andey, Neelima Annabathula, Jhansi Asam, Chinmayee Bhalchandra Atre, Chandan Baluja, Aarti Bhadouria, Sahana Ramesh Bhagavan, Jodie Semp Blaskey, Nikhitha Bobbili, Sri Pavithra Boyapati, Satya Harika Challa, Julie Chantal Catherine Champigneulle, Priyanka Chava, Harsha Chembolu, Neha Chhabra, Rajamani Chidambaram, Mradula Choubey, Kasturi Shrikant Dalvi, Vinita Doshi, Swati Dua, Anju Ettitara, Indraja Gaddam(Wasden, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 U Visa Policy Change,
Att: 2 H-4 L-2 Premium Processing Regulation
16 16 order Consolidation Order - for Member cases only Mon 06/14 2:56 PM
ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE CASES AND SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Having reviewed the parties' stipulated motion, the Court finds good cause shown to consolidate this case with the matter of Sharma v. Mayorkas, 2:21-cv-546-RAJ. The consolidated case will bear Case No. 2:21-cv-00393-RAJ as the lead case number. Signed by Judge Richard A. Jones. (MW)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 10, 2021
15 15 notice Notice-Other Thu 06/10 12:10 PM
NOTICE of Stipulated Motion to Consolidate Cases ; filed by Defendant Alejandro Mayorkas. (Lambert, Michelle)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 07, 2021
14 14 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time-Other ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Mon 06/07 3:15 PM
MINUTE ORDER (text only) authorized by Judge Richard A. Jones. Defendant's unopposed12 MOTION for Extension of Time and Relief from Order Setting Initial Scheduling Deadlines is GRANTED. The deadline to conduct the FRCP 26(f) Conference is reset to 7/15/2021, the initial disclosure deadline is 7/22/2021, and a Joint Status Report is due by 7/29/2021. (VE)
Related: [-]
13 13 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 06/07 1:49 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Alejandro Mayorkas Attorney Jonathan D. Wasden added to party Vinita Doshi(pty:pla), Attorney Jonathan D. Wasden added to party Sri Pavithra Boyapati(pty:pla), Attorney Jonathan D. Wasden added to party Kiran Mayee Jannuru(pty:pla), Attorney Jonathan D. Wasden added to party Rachana Ashok Soitkar(pty:pla), Attorney Jonathan D. Wasden added to party Harsha Chembolu(pty:pla), Attorney Jonathan D. Wasden added to party Mradula Choubey(pty:pla), Attorney Jonathan D. Wasden added to party Shreyas Binnamangala Prabhu(pty:pla), Attorney Jonathan D. Wasden added to party Chandrika Saras Nekkanti(pty:pla), Attorney Jonathan D. Wasden added to party Himaben Anujkumar Naik(pty:pla), Attorney Jonathan D. Wasden added to party Neha Allangh(pty:pla), Attorney Jonathan D. Wasden added to party Madhuri Teelair(pty:pla), Attorney Jonathan D. Wasden added to party Jai Rajenimbalkar(pty:pla), Attorney Jonathan D. Wasden added to party Shital Vora(pty:pla), Attorney Jonathan D. Wasden added to party Aarti Karnik(pty:pla), Attorney Jonathan D. Wasden added to party Sushma Vadyala(pty:pla), Attorney Jonathan D. Wasden added to party Neetha John(pty:pla), Attorney Jonathan D. Wasden added to party Kasturi Shrikant Dalvi(pty:pla), Attorney Jonathan D. Wasden added to party Shu Hui Geraldine Yeow(pty:pla), Attorney Jonathan D. Wasden added to party Akshay Kumar Singh(pty:pla), Attorney Jonathan D. Wasden added to party Tanuja Hegde(pty:pla), Attorney Jonathan D. Wasden added to party Swetha Pyreddy(pty:pla), Attorney Jonathan D. Wasden added to party Kanika Tandon(pty:pla), Attorney Jonathan D. Wasden added to party Purnima Singh(pty:pla), Attorney Jonathan D. Wasden added to party Rajamani Chidambaram(pty:pla), Attorney Jonathan D. Wasden added to party Renuka Andey(pty:pla), Attorney Jonathan D. Wasden added to party Uma Sai Vaishnavi Modepalli(pty:pla), Attorney Jonathan D. Wasden added to party Rukmini Perinkulan Ananthanarayanan(pty:pla), Attorney Jonathan D. Wasden added to party FNU Satinder Kaur(pty:pla), Attorney Jonathan D. Wasden added to party Anulekha Nagarajan(pty:pla), Attorney Jonathan D. Wasden added to party Indraja Gaddam(pty:pla), Attorney Jonathan D. Wasden added to party Srirami Reddy Vemireddy(pty:pla), Attorney Jonathan D. Wasden added to party Sreeranjini Venkatakrishnan(pty:pla), Attorney Jonathan D. Wasden added to party Sruthi Reddy(pty:pla), Attorney Jonathan D. Wasden added to party Anju Ettitara(pty:pla), Attorney Jonathan D. Wasden added to party Phani Ande(pty:pla), Attorney Jonathan D. Wasden added to party Neha Chhabra(pty:pla), Attorney Jonathan D. Wasden added to party Shilpa Puranik(pty:pla), Attorney Jonathan D. Wasden added to party Santhi Priya Selvam(pty:pla), Attorney Jonathan D. Wasden added to party Zahabiya Petiwala(pty:pla), Attorney Jonathan D. Wasden added to party Sai Moulika Reddy Kareti(pty:pla), Attorney Jonathan D. Wasden added to party Nikita Mundada Sarda(pty:pla), Attorney Jonathan D. Wasden added to party Anusuya Rangithkumar(pty:pla), Attorney Jonathan D. Wasden added to party Gintare Schacht(pty:pla), Attorney Jonathan D. Wasden added to party Purva Patwardhan(pty:pla), Attorney Jonathan D. Wasden added to party Gagandeep Virdi(pty:pla), Attorney Jonathan D. Wasden added to party Neelima Annabathula(pty:pla), Attorney Jonathan D. Wasden added to party Nikita Suhaskumar Jagdale(pty:pla), Attorney Jonathan D. Wasden added to party Maheswari Subbiah Natarajan(pty:pla), Attorney Jonathan D. Wasden added to party Debarati Aich(pty:pla), Attorney Jonathan D. Wasden added to party Lopamudra Muduli(pty:pla), Attorney Jonathan D. Wasden added to party Satya Chandana Durga Prasad Karanam(pty:pla), Attorney Jonathan D. Wasden added to party Nikhitha Bobbili(pty:pla), Attorney Jonathan D. Wasden added to party Prerana Shikhare(pty:pla), Attorney Jonathan D. Wasden added to party Goodly Jena(pty:pla), Attorney Jonathan D. Wasden added to party Dhanashree Savant(pty:pla), Attorney Jonathan D. Wasden added to party Isha Malhotra(pty:pla), Attorney Jonathan D. Wasden added to party Nancy Singh(pty:pla), filed by Ami Shah, Aditi Kumar, Fnu Vrinda, Sai Smruthi Bhyrava Joshyula, Shilpi Sharma, Srilatha Veeramaneni, Roli Agarwal, Keerthana Rajagopal Shanthi, Rekha Gopal, Naveen Kumar Sujatha, Aditi Khemka, Akash Kishor Khakole, Ravinder Reddy Gajulapally, Bhargavi Palla, Snehalatha Koppisetti, Priyanka Chava, Rashmi Sethuram, Pranathi Pachika, Niall Shannon, Andappa Pancham, Chinmayee Bhalchandra Atre, Nishita Movva, Vamshi Krishna Maringanti, Sonali Sen, Monisha Mitra, Anthony Singleton, Sneha Gangal, Swati Dua, Kavya Gupta, Venkatalakshmipravallika Ramachandruni, Geeta Mandavilli, Uthra Sridhar, Lavanya Samineni, Divya Rathi, Abhay Kapoor, Jodie Semp Blaskey, Ranadheer Thadasina, Julie Chantal Catherine Champigneulle, Surabhi Singh, Anuradha Raja Surya, Roshni Prabhakaran, Aarti Bhadouria, Stalinitha Malini Vemavarapu, Khushboo Agarwal, Swathi Ventrapragada, Amruta Phatak, Chandan Baluja, Mrudula Puppala, Jhansi Asam, Sruthy Preman Mulloth, Sahana Ramesh Bhagavan, Satya Harika Challa, Ritika Gupta, Rukmini Perinkulan Ananthanarayanan, Rachana Ashok Soitkar, Indraja Gaddam, Himaben Anujkumar Naik, Neelima Annabathula, Uma Sai Vaishnavi Modepalli, Harsha Chembolu, Renuka Andey, Lopamudra Muduli, Srirami Reddy Vemireddy, Purnima Singh, Vinita Doshi, Satya Chandana Durga Prasad Karanam, Anusuya Rangithkumar, Kanika Tandon, Sri Pavithra Boyapati, Anulekha Nagarajan, Sai Moulika Reddy Kareti, Prerana Shikhare, Gagandeep Virdi, Nikhitha Bobbili, Isha Malhotra, Akshay Kumar Singh, Jai Rajenimbalkar, Madhuri Teelair, Neha Chhabra, Neha Allangh, Swetha Pyreddy, Shital Vora, Nikita Suhaskumar Jagdale, Nancy Singh, Shreyas Binnamangala Prabhu, Kasturi Shrikant Dalvi, Purva Patwardhan, Sreeranjini Venkatakrishnan, Aarti Karnik, Rajamani Chidambaram, Nikita Mundada Sarda, Santhi Priya Selvam, Shu Hui Geraldine Yeow, Gintare Schacht, Shilpa Puranik, FNU Satinder Kaur, Zahabiya Petiwala, Maheswari Subbiah Natarajan, Neetha John, Phani Ande, Tanuja Hegde, Sushma Vadyala, Kiran Mayee Jannuru, Mradula Choubey, Goodly Jena, Dhanashree Savant, Debarati Aich, Sruthi Reddy, Chandrika Saras Nekkanti, Anju Ettitara.(Wasden, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Complaint Plaintiff Charts I - III,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Amended Complaint Plaintiff Charts I-IV,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Broderick Declaration
Wednesday, May 19, 2021
12 12 motion Extension of Time-Other Wed 05/19 12:46 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time and Relief from Order Setting Initial Scheduling Deadlines , filed by Defendant Alejandro Mayorkas. Noting Date 5/28/2021, (Strong, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, May 17, 2021
11 11 order RAJ Joint Status Report Order Mon 05/17 11:40 AM
ORDER REGARDING FRCP 26(f) CONFERENCE, INITIAL DISCLOSURES, AND JOINT STATUS REPORT. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 6/1/2021, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 6/7/2021, Joint Status Report due by 6/14/2021, by Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 14, 2021
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 05/14 3:12 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney James C. Strong on behalf of Defendant Alejandro Mayorkas. (Strong, James)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 05/14 10:42 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Michelle R. Lambert on behalf of Defendant Alejandro Mayorkas. (Lambert, Michelle)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 03, 2021
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 05/03 12:38 PM
SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant Alejandro Mayorkas on 4/29/2021(Wasden, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Certified Mail Receipt
Wednesday, April 28, 2021
7 7 misc RAJ Standing Order Wed 04/28 9:55 AM
STANDING ORDER for Civil Cases Assigned to Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
Related: [-]
6 6 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Wed 04/28 9:38 AM
MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. The Honorable Thomas S. Zilly transfers the above captioned case as related to C21-393-RAJ to the Honorable Richard A. Jones. All future pleadings shall bear the cause number C21-546-RAJ. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (MW)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 26, 2021
5 5 service Summons Issued Mon 04/26 4:50 PM
Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) All Defendants(SG)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons,
Att: 2 Summons
utility Add and Terminate Judges Mon 04/26 3:53 PM
Judge Thomas S. Zilly added. (SG)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 23, 2021
4 4 order Order on Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 04/23 4:12 PM
ORDER re3 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Jonathan D. Wasden Plaintiffs Khushboo Agarwal, Roli Agarwal, Jhansi Asam, Chinmayee Bhalchandra Atre, Chandan Baluja, Aarti Bhadouria, Sahana Ramesh Bhagavan, Jodie Semp Blaskey, Satya Harika Challa, Julie Chantal Catheri Champigneulle, Priyanka Chava, Swati Dua, Ravinder Reddy Gajulapally, Sneha Gangal, Rekha Gopal, Kavya Gupta, Ritika Gupta, Fabian Janowski, Sai Smruthi Bhyrava Joshyula, Abhay Kapoor, Akash Kishor Khakole, Aditi Khemka, Snehalatha Koppisetti, Aditi Kumar, Anamika Kumari, Geeta Mandavilli, Vamshi Krishna Maringanti, Monisha Mitra, Nishita Movva, Sruthy Preman Mulloth, Pranathi Pachika, Bhargavi Palla, Andappa Pancham, Amruta Phatak, Roshni Prabhakaran, Mrudula Puppala, Venkatalakshmipravallika Ramachandruni, Divya Rathi, Lavanya Samineni, Sonali Sen, Rashmi Sethuram, Ami Shah, Niall Shannon, Keerthana Rajagopal Shanthi, Nandini Sharma, Shilpi Sharma, Madhavi Shinde, Surabhi Singh, Anthony Singleton, Uthra Sridhar, Naveen Kumar Sujatha, Anuradha Raja Surya, Ranadheer Thadasina, Srilatha Veeramaneni, Stalinitha Malini Vemavarapu, Swathi Ventrapragada, and FNU Vrinda by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (DS)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 04/23 3:42 PM
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Jonathan D. Wasden FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Khushboo Agarwal, Roli Agarwal, Jhansi Asam, Chinmayee Bhalchandra Atre, Chandan Baluja, Aarti Bhadouria, Sahana Ramesh Bhagavan, Jodie Semp Blaskey, Satya Harika Challa, Julie Chantal Catheri Champigneulle, Priyanka Chava, Swati Dua, Ravinder Reddy Gajulapally, Sneha Gangal, Rekha Gopal, Kavya Gupta, Ritika Gupta, Fabian Janowski, Sai Smruthi Bhyrava Joshyula, Abhay Kapoor, Akash Kishor Khakole, Aditi Khemka, Snehalatha Koppisetti, Aditi Kumar, Anamika Kumari, Geeta Mandavilli, Vamshi Krishna Maringanti, Monisha Mitra, Nishita Movva, Sruthy Preman Mulloth, Pranathi Pachika, Bhargavi Palla, Andappa Pancham, Amruta Phatak, Roshni Prabhakaran, Mrudula Puppala, Venkatalakshmipravallika Ramachandruni, Divya Rathi, Lavanya Samineni, Sonali Sen, Rashmi Sethuram, Ami Shah, Niall Shannon, Keerthana Rajagopal Shanthi, Nandini Sharma, Shilpi Sharma, Madhavi Shinde, Surabhi Singh, Anthony Singleton, Uthra Sridhar, Naveen Kumar Sujatha, Anuradha Raja Surya, Ranadheer Thadasina, Srilatha Veeramaneni, Stalinitha Malini Vemavarapu, Swathi Ventrapragada, FNU Vrinda (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7055674 (Upadhyay, Kripa)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Related Case Fri 04/23 3:38 PM
NOTICE of Related Case(s) 2:21-cv-00393-RAJ, by Plaintiffs Khushboo Agarwal, Roli Agarwal, Jhansi Asam, Chinmayee Bhalchandra Atre, Chandan Baluja, Aarti Bhadouria, Sahana Ramesh Bhagavan, Jodie Semp Blaskey, Satya Harika Challa, Julie Chantal Catheri Champigneulle, Priyanka Chava, Swati Dua, Ravinder Reddy Gajulapally, Sneha Gangal, Rekha Gopal, Kavya Gupta, Ritika Gupta, Fabian Janowski, Sai Smruthi Bhyrava Joshyula, Abhay Kapoor, Akash Kishor Khakole, Aditi Khemka, Snehalatha Koppisetti, Aditi Kumar, Anamika Kumari, Geeta Mandavilli, Vamshi Krishna Maringanti, Monisha Mitra, Nishita Movva, Sruthy Preman Mulloth, Pranathi Pachika, Bhargavi Palla, Andappa Pancham, Amruta Phatak, Roshni Prabhakaran, Mrudula Puppala, Venkatalakshmipravallika Ramachandruni, Divya Rathi, Lavanya Samineni, Sonali Sen, Rashmi Sethuram, Ami Shah, Niall Shannon, Keerthana Rajagopal Shanthi, Nandini Sharma, Shilpi Sharma, Madhavi Shinde, Surabhi Singh, Anthony Singleton, Uthra Sridhar, Naveen Kumar Sujatha, Anuradha Raja Surya, Ranadheer Thadasina, Srilatha Veeramaneni, Stalinitha Malini Vemavarapu, Swathi Ventrapragada, FNU Vrinda. (Upadhyay, Kripa)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 04/23 3:37 PM
COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Alejandro Mayorkas Related [+] Attorney Kripa Upadhyay added to party Khushboo Agarwal(pty:pla), Attorney Kripa Upadhyay added to party Roli Agarwal(pty:pla), Attorney Kripa Upadhyay added to party Jhansi Asam(pty:pla), Attorney Kripa Upadhyay added to party Chinmayee Bhalchandra Atre(pty:pla), Attorney Kripa Upadhyay added to party Chandan Baluja (pty:pla), Attorney Kripa Upadhyay added to party Aarti Bhadouria(pty:pla), Attorney Kripa Upadhyay added to party Sahana Ramesh Bhagavan(pty:pla), Attorney Kripa Upadhyay added to party Jodie Semp Blaskey(pty:pla), Attorney Kripa Upadhyay added to party Satya Harika Challa(pty:pla), Attorney Kripa Upadhyay added to party Julie Chantal Catheri Champigneulle (pty:pla), Attorney Kripa Upadhyay added to party Priyanka Chava(pty:pla), Attorney Kripa Upadhyay added to party Swati Dua(pty:pla), Attorney Kripa Upadhyay added to party Ravinder Reddy Gajulapally (pty:pla), Attorney Kripa Upadhyay added to party Sneha Gangal(pty:pla), Attorney Kripa Upadhyay added to party Rekha Gopal(pty:pla), Attorney Kripa Upadhyay added to party Kavya Gupta(pty:pla), Attorney Kripa Upadhyay added to party Ritika Gupta(pty:pla), Attorney Kripa Upadhyay added to party Fabian Janowski(pty:pla), Attorney Kripa Upadhyay added to party Sai Smruthi Bhyrava Joshyula(pty:pla), Attorney Kripa Upadhyay added to party Abhay Kapoor(pty:pla), Attorney Kripa Upadhyay added to party Akash Kishor Khakole(pty:pla), Attorney Kripa Upadhyay added to party Aditi Khemka(pty:pla), Attorney Kripa Upadhyay added to party Snehalatha Koppisetti(pty:pla), Attorney Kripa Upadhyay added to party Aditi Kumar(pty:pla), Attorney Kripa Upadhyay added to party Anamika Kumari(pty:pla), Attorney Kripa Upadhyay added to party Geeta Mandavilli(pty:pla), Attorney Kripa Upadhyay added to party Vamshi Krishna Maringanti(pty:pla), Attorney Kripa Upadhyay added to party Monisha Mitra(pty:pla), Attorney Kripa Upadhyay added to party Nishita Movva(pty:pla), Attorney Kripa Upadhyay added to party Sruthy Preman Mulloth(pty:pla), Attorney Kripa Upadhyay added to party Pranathi Pachika(pty:pla), Attorney Kripa Upadhyay added to party Bhargavi Palla(pty:pla), Attorney Kripa Upadhyay added to party Andappa Pancham(pty:pla), Attorney Kripa Upadhyay added to party Amruta Phatak(pty:pla), Attorney Kripa Upadhyay added to party Roshni Prabhakaran(pty:pla), Attorney Kripa Upadhyay added to party Mrudula Puppala(pty:pla), Attorney Kripa Upadhyay added to party Venkatalakshmipravallika Ramachandruni(pty:pla), Attorney Kripa Upadhyay added to party Divya Rathi(pty:pla), Attorney Kripa Upadhyay added to party Lavanya Samineni(pty:pla), Attorney Kripa Upadhyay added to party Sonali Sen (pty:pla), Attorney Kripa Upadhyay added to party Rashmi Sethuram (pty:pla), Attorney Kripa Upadhyay added to party Ami Shah (pty:pla), Attorney Kripa Upadhyay added to party Niall Shannon(pty:pla), Attorney Kripa Upadhyay added to party Keerthana Rajagopal Shanthi(pty:pla), Attorney Kripa Upadhyay added to party Nandini Sharma(pty:pla), Attorney Kripa Upadhyay added to party Shilpi Sharma(pty:pla), Attorney Kripa Upadhyay added to party Madhavi Shinde(pty:pla), Attorney Kripa Upadhyay added to party Surabhi Singh(pty:pla), Attorney Kripa Upadhyay added to party Anthony Singleton(pty:pla), Attorney Kripa Upadhyay added to party Uthra Sridhar (pty:pla), Attorney Kripa Upadhyay added to party Naveen Kumar Sujatha(pty:pla), Attorney Kripa Upadhyay added to party Anuradha Raja Surya(pty:pla), Attorney Kripa Upadhyay added to party Ranadheer Thadasina(pty:pla), Attorney Kripa Upadhyay added to party Srilatha Veeramaneni(pty:pla), Attorney Kripa Upadhyay added to party Stalinitha Malini Vemavarapu (pty:pla), Attorney Kripa Upadhyay added to party Swathi Ventrapragada(pty:pla), Attorney Kripa Upadhyay added to party FNU Vrinda(pty:pla), filed by Ami Shah, Aditi Kumar, FNU Vrinda, Sai Smruthi Bhyrava Joshyula, Shilpi Sharma, Venkatalakshmipravallika Ramachandruni, Kavya Gupta, Nandini Sharma, Srilatha Veeramaneni, Geeta Mandavilli, Roli Agarwal, Keerthana Rajagopal Shanthi, Rekha Gopal, Naveen Kumar Sujatha, Uthra Sridhar, Lavanya Samineni, Divya Rathi, Aditi Khemka, Akash Kishor Khakole, Abhay Kapoor, Jodie Semp Blaskey, Ranadheer Thadasina, Ravinder Reddy Gajulapally, Bhargavi Palla, Snehalatha Koppisetti, Priyanka Chava, Julie Chantal Catheri Champigneulle, Rashmi Sethuram, Anuradha Raja Surya, Surabhi Singh, Roshni Prabhakaran, Stalinitha Malini Vemavarapu, Aarti Bhadouria, Pranathi Pachika, Anamika Kumari, Niall Shannon, Andappa Pancham, Swathi Ventrapragada, Khushboo Agarwal, Fabian Janowski, Amruta Phatak, Chinmayee Bhalchandra Atre, Nishita Movva, Chandan Baluja, Vamshi Krishna Maringanti, Sonali Sen, Mrudula Puppala, Jhansi Asam, Madhavi Shinde, Sruthy Preman Mulloth, Monisha Mitra, Anthony Singleton, Sahana Ramesh Bhagavan, Sneha Gangal, Satya Harika Challa, Swati Dua, Ritika Gupta.(Upadhyay, Kripa)
Related: [-] ceipt # AWAWDC-7055636
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff Charts I - IV,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Summons USAG,
Att: 4 Summons USAO,
Att: 5 Summons DHS