California Eastern District Court
Case #: 2:21-cr-00078
Case Filed:Apr 22, 2021
Last checked: Saturday Apr 24, 2021 12:52 AM PDT
Defendant
Amandeep Multani (3)
Represented By
Kirk M. Holmen
The Law Office Of Allen Sawyer
contact info
Neat Allen Sawyer
Rosenfeld & Sawyer
contact info
Armando Villapudua
Law Offices Of Armando Villapudua
contact info
Defendant
Parampreet Singh (1)
Represented By
David A. Torres
Law Office Of David Torres
contact info
Defendant
Ranvir Singh (2)
Represented By
Dina Lee Santos
Law Offices Of Dina L. Santos
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
David W. Spencer, GOVT
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info

GPO Apr 13 2021
STIPULATION and ORDER as to Parampreet Singh signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 4/12/2021 CONTINUING the Detention Hearing to 4/13/2021 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 25 (KJN) before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman. (cc: Duty MJ Sac)[2:21-mj-00056-CKD]
GPO Apr 16 2021
ORDER OF DETENTION Pending Trial signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 4/16/2021 as to Amandeep Multani. (Reader, L)[2:21-mj-00056-CKD]
GPO Apr 23 2021
ORDER FOR RELEASE OF PERSON IN CUSTODY signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 4/23/21 as to Ranvir Singh. (Hand delivered to USM) (Kastilahn, A)
GPO Apr 28 2021
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 4/28/21. (Zignago, K.)STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 4/28/21. (Zignago, K.)STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 4/28/21. (Zignago, K.)
GPO Apr 29 2021
ORDER FOR RELEASE OF PERSON IN CUSTODY signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 4/29/21 as to Parampreet Singh. (Copy hand delivered to the USM) (Kastilahn, A)
GPO May 17 2021
ORDER as to Amandeep Multani signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 5/13/2021 ORDERING that the Exhibits in the Supplemental to Renewed Motion to Release Defendant of Bond be filed under SEAL. (Zignago, K.)
GPO May 17 2021
ORDER as to Amandeep Multani signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 5/13/2021 ORDERING that the Exhibits in the Defense's Response to United States' Opposition to Motion for Bail Review be filed under SEAL. (Zignago, K.)
GPO May 17 2021
ORDER as to Amandeep Multani signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 5/13/2021 ORDERING that the Motion for Bond Exhibits be filed under SEAL. (Zignago, K.)
GPO Aug 23 2021
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 8/20/2021 CONTINUING the Status Conference to 12/14/2021 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. Excludable started as to Parampreet Singh, Ranvir Singh, Amandeep Multani: T4 Start: 8/24/2021 Stop: 12/14/2021. (Tupolo, A)STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 8/20/2021 CONTINUING the Status Conference to 12/14/2021 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. Excludable started as to Parampreet Singh, Ranvir Singh, Amandeep Multani: T4 Start: 8/24/2021 Stop: 12/14/2021. (Tupolo, A)STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 8/20/2021 CONTINUING the Status Conference to 12/14/2021 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. Excludable started as to Parampreet Singh, Ranvir Singh, Amandeep Multani: T4 Start: 8/24/2021 Stop: 12/14/2021. (Tupolo, A)
GPO Dec 08 2021
STIPULATION and ORDER as to Parampreet Singh, Ranvir Singh, Amandeep Multani signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 12/07/2021 CONTINUING the Status Conference to 3/22/2022 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. Excludable started as to Parampreet Singh, Ranvir Singh, Amandeep Multani: T4 Start: 12/14/2021 Stop: 03/22/2022. (cc Sac Criminal Agencies). (Rodriguez, E)STIPULATION and ORDER as to Parampreet Singh, Ranvir Singh, Amandeep Multani signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 12/07/2021 CONTINUING the Status Conference to 3/22/2022 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. Excludable started as to Parampreet Singh, Ranvir Singh, Amandeep Multani: T4 Start: 12/14/2021 Stop: 03/22/2022. (cc Sac Criminal Agencies). (Rodriguez, E)STIPULATION and ORDER as to Parampreet Singh, Ranvir Singh, Amandeep Multani signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 12/07/2021 CONTINUING the Status Conference to 3/22/2022 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. Excludable started as to Parampreet Singh, Ranvir Singh, Amandeep Multani: T4 Start: 12/14/2021 Stop: 03/22/2022. (cc Sac Criminal Agencies). (Rodriguez, E)
GPO Mar 18 2022
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 3/18/2022 CONTINUING the Status Conference to 7/26/2022 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. Excludable time pursuant to T4 Start: 3/22/2022 Stop: 7/26/2022 (Coll, A)STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 3/18/2022 CONTINUING the Status Conference to 7/26/2022 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. Excludable time pursuant to T4 Start: 3/22/2022 Stop: 7/26/2022 (Coll, A)STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 3/18/2022 CONTINUING the Status Conference to 7/26/2022 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. Excludable time pursuant to T4 Start: 3/22/2022 Stop: 7/26/2022 (Coll, A)
GPO Jul 18 2022
STIPULATION and ORDER as to Parampreet Singh (1), Ranvir Singh (2), and Amandeep Multani (3) signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 7/18/2022 CONTINUING Status Conference to 12/13/2022, at 09:30 AM, in Courtroom 6 (JAM), before District Judge John A. Mendez. Excludable started as to Parampreet Singh, Ranvir Singh, and Amandeep Multani: T4 Start: 7/26/2022 Stop: 12/13/2022. (York, M)STIPULATION and ORDER as to Parampreet Singh (1), Ranvir Singh (2), and Amandeep Multani (3) signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 7/18/2022 CONTINUING Status Conference to 12/13/2022, at 09:30 AM, in Courtroom 6 (JAM), before District Judge John A. Mendez. Excludable started as to Parampreet Singh, Ranvir Singh, and Amandeep Multani: T4 Start: 7/26/2022 Stop: 12/13/2022. (York, M)STIPULATION and ORDER as to Parampreet Singh (1), Ranvir Singh (2), and Amandeep Multani (3) signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 7/18/2022 CONTINUING Status Conference to 12/13/2022, at 09:30 AM, in Courtroom 6 (JAM), before District Judge John A. Mendez. Excludable started as to Parampreet Singh, Ranvir Singh, and Amandeep Multani: T4 Start: 7/26/2022 Stop: 12/13/2022. (York, M)
GPO Dec 07 2022
STIPULATION and ORDER as to Parampreet Singh, Ranvir Singh, Amandeep Multani signed by Senior Judge John A. Mendez on 12/7/22 CONTINUING the Status Conference to 3/7/2023 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before Senior Judge John A. Mendez. Excludable started as to Parampreet Singh, Ranvir Singh, Amandeep Multani: T4 Start: 12/13/22 Stop: 3/7/23. (cc: Sac Criminal Agencies) (Woodworth, M.)STIPULATION and ORDER as to Parampreet Singh, Ranvir Singh, Amandeep Multani signed by Senior Judge John A. Mendez on 12/7/22 CONTINUING the Status Conference to 3/7/2023 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before Senior Judge John A. Mendez. Excludable started as to Parampreet Singh, Ranvir Singh, Amandeep Multani: T4 Start: 12/13/22 Stop: 3/7/23. (cc: Sac Criminal Agencies) (Woodworth, M.)STIPULATION and ORDER as to Parampreet Singh, Ranvir Singh, Amandeep Multani signed by Senior Judge John A. Mendez on 12/7/22 CONTINUING the Status Conference to 3/7/2023 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before Senior Judge John A. Mendez. Excludable started as to Parampreet Singh, Ranvir Singh, Amandeep Multani: T4 Start: 12/13/22 Stop: 3/7/23. (cc: Sac Criminal Agencies) (Woodworth, M.)
GPO Jan 18 2023
ORDER signed as to Parampreet Singh by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 01/18/2023 GRANTING 107 Stipulation and Proposed Order for International Travel. ORDERING defendant Parampreet Singh be allowed to travel to India to attend his father's funeral. He is to return on 01/30/2023, and at all times maintain contact with his Pretrial Services Officer, Margarita Zepeda. Moreover, Mr. Singh's passport is to be RELEASED forthwith to allow him to travel, and he is ORDERED to RETURN said passport to Ms. Zepeda immediately upon returning to the United States of America. (cc Sac Criminal Agencies). (Rodriguez, E)
GPO Mar 03 2023
STIPULATION and ORDER as to Parampreet Singh, Ranvir Singh signed by Senior Judge John A. Mendez on 03/03/2023 CONTINUING the Status Conference to 7/25/2023 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before Senior Judge John A. Mendez. Excludable started as to Parampreet Singh, Ranvir Singh: t4 Start: 03/07/2023 Stop: 07/25/2023. (cc Sac Criminal Agencies). (Rodriguez, E)STIPULATION and ORDER as to Parampreet Singh, Ranvir Singh signed by Senior Judge John A. Mendez on 03/03/2023 CONTINUING the Status Conference to 7/25/2023 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before Senior Judge John A. Mendez. Excludable started as to Parampreet Singh, Ranvir Singh: t4 Start: 03/07/2023 Stop: 07/25/2023. (cc Sac Criminal Agencies). (Rodriguez, E)
GPO May 10 2023
STIPULATION and ORDER as to Parampreet Singh signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 5/10/2023 MODIFYING Special Condition 16 of the Pretrial Release Conditions. (Perdue, C.)
GPO Jul 20 2023
STIPULATION and ORDER as to Parampreet Singh, Ranvir Singh signed by Senior Judge John A. Mendez on 7/19/2023 CONTINUING the Status Conference to 10/31/2023 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before Senior Judge John A. Mendez. Excludable started as to Parampreet Singh, Ranvir Singh: T4 Start: 7/25/2023 Stop: 10/31/2023. (cc: Sac Criminal Agencies) (Perdue, C.)STIPULATION and ORDER as to Parampreet Singh, Ranvir Singh signed by Senior Judge John A. Mendez on 7/19/2023 CONTINUING the Status Conference to 10/31/2023 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before Senior Judge John A. Mendez. Excludable started as to Parampreet Singh, Ranvir Singh: T4 Start: 7/25/2023 Stop: 10/31/2023. (cc: Sac Criminal Agencies) (Perdue, C.)
GPO Oct 27 2023
STIPULATION and ORDER as to Parampreet Singh, Ranvir Singh signed by Senior Judge John A. Mendez on 10/26/23 RESETTING Status Conference for 1/9/2024 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before Senior Judge John A. Mendez. Excludable time as to Parampreet Singh, Ranvir Singh per T4 Start: 10/31/23 Stop: 01/09/24. (Benson, A.)STIPULATION and ORDER as to Parampreet Singh, Ranvir Singh signed by Senior Judge John A. Mendez on 10/26/23 RESETTING Status Conference for 1/9/2024 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before Senior Judge John A. Mendez. Excludable time as to Parampreet Singh, Ranvir Singh per T4 Start: 10/31/23 Stop: 01/09/24. (Benson, A.)
GPO Jan 04 2024
STIPULATION and ORDER as to Parampreet Singh, Ranvir Singh signed by Senior Judge John A. Mendez on 1/3/2024 CONTINUING the Status Conference to 5/7/2024 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before Senior Judge John A. Mendez. Excludable started as to Parampreet Singh, Ranvir Singh: T4 Start: 1/9/2024 Stop: 5/7/2024 (cc Sac Criminal Agencies) (Clemente Licea, O)STIPULATION and ORDER as to Parampreet Singh, Ranvir Singh signed by Senior Judge John A. Mendez on 1/3/2024 CONTINUING the Status Conference to 5/7/2024 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before Senior Judge John A. Mendez. Excludable started as to Parampreet Singh, Ranvir Singh: T4 Start: 1/9/2024 Stop: 5/7/2024 (cc Sac Criminal Agencies) (Clemente Licea, O)
GPO Aug 09 2024
ORDER signed by Senior District Judge John A. Mendez on 08/09/24 GRANTING 142 Request to Seal. (Licea Chavez, V)ORDER signed by Senior District Judge John A. Mendez on 08/09/24 GRANTING 142 Request to Seal. (Licea Chavez, V)
GPO Aug 16 2024
STIPULATION and ORDER as to Parampreet Singh (1) and Ranvir Singh (2) signed by Senior District Judge John A. Mendez on 08/16/2024 APPROVING 151 Stipulation and SETTING MOTIONS SCHEDULE, TRIAL CONFIRMATION HEARING, AND JURY TRIAL as follows: (1) By 09/24/2024, all Rule 12 and other pre-trial non-in-limine motions shall be filed by the defendants, including any discovery motions; (2) by 10/08/2024, the United States shall respond to any motions; (3) By 10/15/2024, the defendants shall file any replies; (4) On 11/05/2024, at 9:00 a.m., the parties shall appear for a hearing on any pending motions; (5) By 12/17/2024, all expert notice required under Rule 16 shall be completed by both parties.Trial Confirmation Hearing RESET for 12/10/2024, and Jury Trial RESET for 01/27/2025, both, at 09:00 AM, in Courtroom 6 (JAM), 14th Floor, before Senior District Judge John A. Mendez. TIME EXCLUDED as to Parampreet Singh (1) and Ranvir Singh (2), pursuant to 18 U.S.C. sections 3161(h)(&)(A), (B)(ii), (Local Code T2) and (B)(iv) (Local code T4), between 08/16/2024 and 01/27/2025. (cc: Sac. Interpreter) (York, M)STIPULATION and ORDER as to Parampreet Singh (1) and Ranvir Singh (2) signed by Senior District Judge John A. Mendez on 08/16/2024 APPROVING 151 Stipulation and SETTING MOTIONS SCHEDULE, TRIAL CONFIRMATION HEARING, AND JURY TRIAL as follows: (1) By 09/24/2024, all Rule 12 and other pre-trial non-in-limine motions shall be filed by the defendants, including any discovery motions; (2) by 10/08/2024, the United States shall respond to any motions; (3) By 10/15/2024, the defendants shall file any replies; (4) On 11/05/2024, at 9:00 a.m., the parties shall appear for a hearing on any pending motions; (5) By 12/17/2024, all expert notice required under Rule 16 shall be completed by both parties.Trial Confirmation Hearing RESET for 12/10/2024, and Jury Trial RESET for 01/27/2025, both, at 09:00 AM, in Courtroom 6 (JAM), 14th Floor, before Senior District Judge John A. Mendez. TIME EXCLUDED as to Parampreet Singh (1) and Ranvir Singh (2), pursuant to 18 U.S.C. sections 3161(h)(&)(A), (B)(ii), (Local Code T2) and (B)(iv) (Local code T4), between 08/16/2024 and 01/27/2025. (cc: Sac. Interpreter) (York, M)
GPO Sep 19 2024
STIPULATION and ORDER as to Parampreet Singh (1) and Ranvir Singh (2) signed by Senior District Judge John A. Mendez on 09/19/2024 APPROVING 155 Stipulation and MODIFYING MOTIONS BRIEFING SCHEDULE as follows:(1) All Rule 12 and other pre-trial non-in-limine motions, including any discovery motions shall be filed by the defendants on or before 10/01/2024 (2) The United States shall respond to any motions on or before 10/15/2024; and (3) The defendants shall file any replies on or before 10/22/2024.The parties shall appear for a hearing on any pending motions on 11/05/2024, at 09:00 AM, in person, in Courtroom 6 (JAM), 14th Floor, before Senior District Judge John A. Mendez.The Trial Confirmation Hearing REMAIN AS SCHEDULED on 12/10/2024, and the Jury Trial REMAIN AS SCHEDULED on 01/27/2025. Time already excluded through 01/27/2025. (cc: Sac. Interpreter) (York, M)STIPULATION and ORDER as to Parampreet Singh (1) and Ranvir Singh (2) signed by Senior District Judge John A. Mendez on 09/19/2024 APPROVING 155 Stipulation and MODIFYING MOTIONS BRIEFING SCHEDULE as follows:(1) All Rule 12 and other pre-trial non-in-limine motions, including any discovery motions shall be filed by the defendants on or before 10/01/2024 (2) The United States shall respond to any motions on or before 10/15/2024; and (3) The defendants shall file any replies on or before 10/22/2024.The parties shall appear for a hearing on any pending motions on 11/05/2024, at 09:00 AM, in person, in Courtroom 6 (JAM), 14th Floor, before Senior District Judge John A. Mendez.The Trial Confirmation Hearing REMAIN AS SCHEDULED on 12/10/2024, and the Jury Trial REMAIN AS SCHEDULED on 01/27/2025. Time already excluded through 01/27/2025. (cc: Sac. Interpreter) (York, M)
GPO Oct 04 2024
ORDER signed by Senior District Judge John A. Mendez on 10/3/24 as to Ranvir Singh, ORDERING that Exhibit A to Defendant's 157 Joint Motion to Dismiss shall be SEALED until further order of the Court. (Salmeron, A)
GPO Oct 17 2024
SEALING ORDER signed by Senior District Judge John A. Mendez on 10/17/2024 GRANTING 165 Request to Seal as to Parampreet Singh, Ranvir Singh. (Mena-Sanchez, L)SEALING ORDER signed by Senior District Judge John A. Mendez on 10/17/2024 GRANTING 165 Request to Seal as to Parampreet Singh, Ranvir Singh. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
GPO Oct 21 2024
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 10/21/2024 CONTINUING 159 Motion Hearing from 11/5/2024 to 11/12/2024 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 26 (AC) before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire as to Parampreet Singh, Ranvir Singh. (Mena-Sanchez, L)STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 10/21/2024 CONTINUING 159 Motion Hearing from 11/5/2024 to 11/12/2024 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 26 (AC) before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire as to Parampreet Singh, Ranvir Singh. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
GPO Oct 23 2024
STIPULATION and ORDER as to Parampreet Singh (1) and Ranvir Singh (2) signed by Senior District Judge John A. Mendez on 10/23/2024 APPROVING 171 Stipulation. Defendants' reply is due on 10/25/2024. (York, M)STIPULATION and ORDER as to Parampreet Singh (1) and Ranvir Singh (2) signed by Senior District Judge John A. Mendez on 10/23/2024 APPROVING 171 Stipulation. Defendants' reply is due on 10/25/2024. (York, M)
GPO Oct 29 2024
ORDER signed by Senior District Judge John A. Mendez on 10/28/24 GRANTING 174 Request to Seal as to Ranvir Singh (2). (Licea Chavez, V)
GPO Dec 13 2024
STIPULATION and ORDER as to Parampreet Singh, Ranvir Singh signed by Senior District Judge John A. Mendez on 12/13/2024 RESETTING Trial Confirmation Hearing for 1/21/2025 at 09:00 AM and Jury Trial for 3/10/2025 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before Senior District Judge John A. Mendez. Excludable started as to Parampreet Singh, Ranvir Singh: T2, T4 Start: 12/13/2024 Stop: 3/10/2025. (Zignago, K.)STIPULATION and ORDER as to Parampreet Singh, Ranvir Singh signed by Senior District Judge John A. Mendez on 12/13/2024 RESETTING Trial Confirmation Hearing for 1/21/2025 at 09:00 AM and Jury Trial for 3/10/2025 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before Senior District Judge John A. Mendez. Excludable started as to Parampreet Singh, Ranvir Singh: T2, T4 Start: 12/13/2024 Stop: 3/10/2025. (Zignago, K.)
GPO Jan 15 2025
STIPULATION and ORDER as to Parampreet Singh, Ranvir Singh signed by Senior District Judge John A. Mendez on 1/15/25 VACATING the 01/21/25 Trial Confirmation Hearing and the 03/10/25 Jury Trial and RESSETING the Trial Confirmation Hearing to 8/19/2025 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before Senior District Judge John A. Mendez. and the Jury Trial to 10/6/2025 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before Senior District Judge John A. Mendez. Excludable started as to Parampreet Singh, Ranvir Singh: T4 Start: 1/15/25 Stop: 10/6/25. (cc Sac Criminal Agencies) (Deputy Clerk VLC)STIPULATION and ORDER as to Parampreet Singh, Ranvir Singh signed by Senior District Judge John A. Mendez on 1/15/25 VACATING the 01/21/25 Trial Confirmation Hearing and the 03/10/25 Jury Trial and RESSETING the Trial Confirmation Hearing to 8/19/2025 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before Senior District Judge John A. Mendez. and the Jury Trial to 10/6/2025 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before Senior District Judge John A. Mendez. Excludable started as to Parampreet Singh, Ranvir Singh: T4 Start: 1/15/25 Stop: 10/6/25. (cc Sac Criminal Agencies) (Deputy Clerk VLC)

Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 10:37 PM PDT
Wednesday, April 07, 2021
1 1 36 pgs COMPLAINT as to Parampreet Singh (1), Ranvir Singh (2), and Amandeep Multani (3). (Becknal, R) [2:21-mj-00056-CKD]
Related: [-]
5 5 AO257 (Sealed) as to Parampreet Singh, Ranvir Singh, Amandeep Multani. (Becknal, R) [2:21-mj-00056-CKD]
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER to SEAL CASE signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 4/7/2021. (Becknal, R) [2:21-mj-00056-CKD]
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 08, 2021
7 7 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy J. Streeter for Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 04/08/2021 as to Parampreet Singh, Ranvir Singh, Amandeep Multani: re6 Order to Seal Case. CASE UNSEALED at the request of AUSA David Spencer. (Text Only) (Streeter, J) [2:21-mj-00056-CKD]
Related: [-]
Friday, April 09, 2021
8 8 NOTICE of ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: David A. Torres appearing for Parampreet Singh. Attorney Torres, David A. added. (Torres, David) [2:21-mj-00056-CKD]
Related: [-]
9 9 NOTICE of ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Armando Villapudua appearing for Amandeep Multani. Attorney Villapudua, Armando added. (Villapudua, Armando) [2:21-mj-00056-CKD]
Related: [-]
10 10 1 pgs NOTICE to WITHDRAW of Counsel by Amandeep Multani. Motion Hearing set for 4/9/2021 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 24 (CKD) before Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney. (Villapudua, Armando) Modified on 4/12/2021 (Streeter, J). [2:21-mj-00056-CKD]
Related: [-]
11 11 MINUTES (Text Only) for INITIAL APPEARANCE held via video conference before Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney as to Parampreet Singh, Ranvir Singh, Amandeep Multani on 4/9/2021. Retained Counsel, Dina Lee Santos for Ranvir Singh, Retained Counsel,Kirk M. Holmen for Amandeep Multani. Retained Counsel for David Torres for Parampreet Singh. The defendants waived a formal reading and the Court advised the defendants of their rights and the pending charges/penalties. Detention Hearing set, as to Defendant Parampreet Singh, for 4/12/2021 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9 (JDP) before Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson. Detention Hearing set, as to Defendants Ranvir Singh and Amandeep Multani. for 4/14/2021 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9 (JDP) before Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson. The Court has been notified that an interpreter is required in this action for Parampreet Singh, Ranvir Singh, Amandeep Multani. The court instructed government counsel under Rule 5(f) to comply with its disclosure obligations under Brady v. Maryland. It is counsel's responsibility to timely notify the Court Staff Interpreter when a hearing requiring an interpreter is scheduled, continued or cancelled. Failure to do so may result in sanctions. See [LINK:LR 403 - Court Interpreter Services in Criminal Actions] Government Counsel: David Spencer present. Defense Counsel: David Torres, Dina Santos and Kirk Holmen present. Custody Status: In Custody. Court Reporter/CD Number: Kimberly Bennett. Interpreter: Kamal Judge, Language: Punjabi, for Deft Ranvir Singh. (Streeter, J) Modified on 4/12/2021 (Streeter, J). [2:21-mj-00056-CKD]
Related: [-]
12 12 ORDER (TEXT ONLY) as to Plaintiff USA signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 04/09/2021: According to the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure Rule 5(f), the government is ordered to comply with its discovery obligations as required by federal law, including those duties imposed by Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and all applicable decisions interpreting Brady. This order does not relieve any party of any other discovery obligation. The consequences for violating this order or the government's obligations under Brady may include sanctions, referral to a disciplinary authority, adverse jury instruction, exclusion of evidence, and dismissal of charges, among other consequences. (Streeter, J) [2:21-mj-00056-CKD]
Related: [-]
Monday, April 12, 2021
13 13 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for continuance of detention hearing as to Parampreet Singh. (Torres, David) Modified on 4/14/2021 (Zignago, K.). [2:21-mj-00056-CKD]
Related: [-]
14 14 AMENDED STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for continuance of dentention hearing as to Parampreet Singh. (Torres, David) Modified on 4/14/2021 (Zignago, K.). [2:21-mj-00056-CKD]
Related: [-]
15 15 MOTION for BAIL REVIEW by Parampreet Singh.(Torres, David) Modified on 4/14/2021 (Zignago, K.). [2:21-mj-00056-CKD]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit
Tuesday, April 13, 2021
16 16 NOTICE of ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Neat Allen Sawyer appearing for Amandeep Multani. Attorney Sawyer, Neat Allen added. (Sawyer, Neat) [2:21-mj-00056-CKD]
Related: [-]
17 17 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Detention Hearing by Amandeep Multani. (Sawyer, Neat) Modified on 4/14/2021 (Zignago, K.). [2:21-mj-00056-CKD]
Related: [-]
18 18 STIPULATION and ORDER as to Parampreet Singh signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 4/12/2021 CONTINUING the Detention Hearing to 4/13/2021 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 25 (KJN) before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman. (cc: Duty MJ Sac) [2:21-mj-00056-CKD]
Related: [-]
19 19 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy for Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 4/13/2021 as to Amandeep Multani GRANTING the defendant's Motion to Continue (ECF No.17 ). The Detention Hearing as to defendant Multani is RESET for 4/16/2021 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9 (JDP) before Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson. (Text Only Entry) (Waldrop, A) [2:21-mj-00056-CKD]
Related: [-]
20 20 USM number for Ranvir Singh is # 39071-509. (Cannarozzi, N) [2:21-mj-00056-CKD]
Related: [-]
21 21 USM number for Amandeep Multani is # 39090-509. (Cannarozzi, N) [2:21-mj-00056-CKD]
Related: [-]
22 22 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held via video conference (Zoom) before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman: DETENTION HEARING as to Parampreet Singh on 4/13/2021. All parties consented to appear by Zoom. Defendant advised rights. The Government concurred with Pretrial Services recommendation and did not seek detention. Defense submitted on the Pretrial Services report. The Court ORDERED the defendant released on a $6 million dollar Secured Appearance Bond. The Bond secured by properties as stated as stated on the record in open court. The Court also instructed defense counsel to provide title reports and appraisals to the Government when the properties are posted. Defendant is to be released to the third party custody of Prabhjot Kahlon and Pretrial Release conditions as stated on the record in open Court. The Court added the following additional conditions in open court: Within one week from today's date defendant must provide the Government and his Pretrial Services officer a complete listing of all real properties that defendant owns or has any interest in as well as all bank accounts that defendant has any interest in. Defendant is ordered not to dispose of or otherwise encumber any of those real properties or to liquidate any of the bank accounts. Defendant may not engage in any financial transactions in excess of $5,000 without the prior approval of the Pretrial Services Officer. The defendant's release is delayed until the secured bonds are posted. Preliminary Examination set for 4/27/2021 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 26 (AC) before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire and the parties agreed to waive time for the date of the preliminary examination as the defendant's initial appearance was 4/9/2021. Government Counsel: David Spencer present. Defense Counsel: David Torres present. Custody Status: In Custody. Court Reporter: Thresha Spencer. (Waldrop, A) [2:21-mj-00056-CKD]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 14, 2021
23 23 SPECIAL CONDITIONS of PRETRIAL RELEASE as to Parampreet Singh. (Waldrop, A) [2:21-mj-00056-CKD]
Related: [-]
24 24 4 pgs MEMORANDUM by USA as to Ranvir Singh re: Detention Hearing. (Spencer, David) [2:21-mj-00056-CKD]
Related: [-]
25 25 MINUTES (Text Only) for DETENTION HEARING as to Ranvir Singh held on 4/14/2021 via video conference before Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson: All parties present and consented to proceed by video conference. The Govt did not move for detention, however requested additional conditions of release be imposed to include a third-party custodian. Arguments heard. After consideration and for the reasons as stated on the record, the court ordered the deft released on a $700,000 collateral bond secured by the combination of the deft's property, Tajinderpal and Rajinderpal Singh Sarkarias property in Washington, and cash posted by Sarbgit Singh. Additionally the court ordered Sarbjit Singh to act as a third-party custodian. The deft's release on bond will be delayed until the posting of the $700,000 bond and until his travel documents have been surrendered to the Clerks Office. Lastly, the parties agreed to waive time and the court specially set the Preliminary Examination for 4/27/2021 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 26 (AC) before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. Government Counsel: David Spencer present. Defense Counsel: Dina Santos present. Custody Status: in custody. Court Reporter/CD Number: Kimberly Bennett. Interpreter: Hardip Judge, Language: Punjabi (Cannarozzi, N) [2:21-mj-00056-CKD]
Related: [-]
26 26 SPECIAL CONDITIONS of RELEASE as to Ranvir Singh. (Cannarozzi, N) [2:21-mj-00056-CKD]
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 15, 2021
27 27 10 pgs MOTION for BOND by Amandeep Multani. Motion Hearing set for 4/16/2021 at 02:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney. (Sawyer, Neat) Modified on 4/16/2021 (Zignago, K.). [2:21-mj-00056-CKD]
Related: [-]
29 29 1 pgs ARREST WARRANT RETURNED Executed on 4/8/2021 as to Parampreet Singh. (Zignago, K.) [2:21-mj-00056-CKD]
Related: [-]
30 30 ARREST WARRANT RETURNED Executed on 4/8/2021 as to Ranvir Singh. (Zignago, K.) [2:21-mj-00056-CKD]
Related: [-]
31 31 1 pgs ARREST WARRANT RETURNED Executed on 4/8/2021 as to Amandeep Multani. (Zignago, K.) [2:21-mj-00056-CKD]
Related: [-]
Friday, April 16, 2021
28 28 10 pgs MEMORANDUM by USA as to Amandeep Multani. re: Detention Hearing (Spencer, David) [2:21-mj-00056-CKD]
Related: [-]
32 32 4 pgs MOTION for BAIL REVIEW reply to Government's Opposition , MOTION for BOND Reply to Government Opposition by Amandeep Multani. Motion Hearing set for 4/16/2021 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney.(Sawyer, Neat) [2:21-mj-00056-CKD]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 7 pgs Exhibit Exhibit "1",
Att: 2 1 pgs Exhibit Exhibit "2",
Att: 3 25 pgs Exhibit Exhibit "3"
33 33 MINUTES (Text Only) for DETENTION HEARING as to Amandeep Multani (3) held on 4/16/2021 via video conference before Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson: All parties present and consented to proceed by video conference. The Govt continued to move for detention. Defense counsel argued for release on a secured bond and under conditions to include ankle monitoring, weekly check in with pretrial services, as well as restrictions on whom he may associate with, or places he may visit, while this case is pending. After consideration and for the reasons as stated on the record, the court ordered the deft detained without prejudice as a risk of non-appearance and a danger to the community pending further proceedings. The parties agreed to waive time and the Preliminary Examination was specially set on 4/27/2021 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 26 ( AC) before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. Government Counsel: David Spencer present. Defense Counsel: Allen Sawyer present. Custody Status: in custody. Court Reporter/CD Number: ECRO. (Cannarozzi, N) [2:21-mj-00056-CKD]
Related: [-]
34 34 3 pgs ORDER OF DETENTION Pending Trial signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 4/16/2021 as to Amandeep Multani. Related [+] [2:21-mj-00056-CKD]
Related: [-] ader, L
Thursday, April 22, 2021
35 35 5 pgs INDICTMENT as to Parampreet Singh (1) counts 1-2, Ranvir Singh (2) counts 1-2, Amandeep Multani (3) counts 1-2. (Zignago, K.)
Related: [-]
36 36 AO257 (Sealed) as to Parampreet Singh, Ranvir Singh, Amandeep Multani. (Zignago, K.)
Related: [-]