USA v. Campana et al
California Eastern District Court | |
Case #: | 1:21-cr-00107 |
Case Filed: | Apr 22, 2021 |
Last checked: Saturday Apr 24, 2021 12:43 AM PDT |
Defendant
Carlos Ivan Campana (1)
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jesus Adrian Pena-Gamez (2)
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
USA
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2021 1:17 AM PDT |
Tuesday, April 06, 2021 | ||
1 | 1 CRIMINAL COMPLAINT as to Carlos Ivan Campana (1). (Hall, S) [5:21-mj-00016-JLT] | |
4 | 4 SEALING ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/6/2021 as to Carlos Ivan Campana. (Hall, S) [5:21-mj-00016-JLT] | |
Wednesday, April 07, 2021 | ||
1 | 1 CRIMINAL COMPLAINT as to Jesus Adrian Pena-Gamez (1). (Hall, S) [5:21-mj-00017-JLT] | |
5 | 5 EX PARTE MOTION to UNSEAL by USA as to Carlos Ivan Campana. (Hall, S) [5:21-mj-00016-JLT] | |
6 | 6 ORDER GRANTING5 Ex Parte Motion to Unseal as to Carlos Ivan Campana, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/7/2021. (Hall, S) [5:21-mj-00016-JLT] | |
7 | 7 ARREST WARRANT RETURNED Executed on 4/7/2021 as to Carlos Ivan Campana. (Hall, S) [5:21-mj-00016-JLT] | |
Thursday, April 08, 2021 | ||
3 | 3 ARREST WARRANT RETURNED Executed on 04/07/2021 as to Jesus Adrian Pena-Gamez. (Maldonado, C) [5:21-mj-00017-JLT] | |
4 | 4 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held via video conference before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston: INITIAL APPEARANCE re CRIMINAL COMPLAINT as to Jesus Adrian Pena-Gamez held on 4/8/2021. Defendant consented to appearance by video conference. Oral motion for appointment of counsel by defendant; financial affidavit received- So Ordered, the Court appointed counsel to represent defendant. Defendant advised of rights, charges, maximum penalties; waived formal reading/rights. True name stated as charged. Preliminary Examination set for 4/22/2021 at 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. The matter of detention was addressed: government moved for detention, defendant consented to an interview by Pretrial Services. Detention Hearing set for 4/15/2021 at 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Defendant ORDERED TEMPORARILY DETAINED pending further proceedings. The Court has been notified that an interpreter is required in this action for Jesus Adrian Pena-Gamez. It is counsel's responsibility to timely notify the Court Staff Interpreter when a hearing requiring an interpreter is scheduled, continued or cancelled. Failure to do so may result in sanctions. See [LINK:LR 403 - Court Interpreter Services in Criminal Actions.] The court instructed government counsel under Rule 5(f) to comply with its disclosure obligations under Brady v. Maryland. Government Counsel: Christopher Baker present. Defense Counsel: Reed Grantham present. Pretrial Services Officer: Ryan Beckwith present. Certified Court Interpreter for the Spanish language, Javier Avelar (Oath on file), present. Custody Status: (C)- present. Court Reporter: Rachael Lundy. (Hall, S) [5:21-mj-00017-JLT] | |
5 | 5 ORDER (TEXT ONLY) signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/8/2021: According to the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure Rule 5(f), the government is ordered to comply with its discovery obligations as required by federal law, including those duties imposed by Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and all applicable decisions interpreting Brady. This order does not relieve any party of any other discovery obligation. The consequences for violating this order or the government's obligations under Brady may include sanctions, referral to a disciplinary authority, adverse jury instruction, exclusion of evidence, and dismissal of charges, among other consequences. (Hall, S) [5:21-mj-00017-JLT] | |
8 | 8 NOTICE of ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: David A. Torres appearing for Carlos Ivan Campana. Attorney Torres, David A. added. (Torres, David) [5:21-mj-00016-JLT] | |
9 | 9 ARREST WARRANT RETURNED Executed on 04/07/2021 as to Carlos Ivan Campana. (Maldonado, C) [5:21-mj-00016-JLT] | |
10 | 10 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held via video conference before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston: INITIAL APPEARANCE re CRIMINAL COMPLAINT as to Carlos Ivan Campana held on 4/8/2021. Defendant consented to appearance by video conference. Oral motion for appointment of counsel by defendant; financial affidavit received- So Ordered, the Court appointed counsel to represent defendant. Defendant advised of rights, charges, maximum penalties; waived formal reading/rights. True name stated as charged. Defendant waived the 14-day time period for the preliminary examination and, for the reasons set forth on the record, the Court finds good cause exists to waive the 14-day time period: Preliminary Examination set for 4/26/2021 at 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. The matter of detention was addressed: government moved for detention, defendant requested and consented to an interview by Pretrial Services. Detention Hearing set for 4/14/2021 at 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Defendant ORDERED TEMPORARILY DETAINED pending further proceedings. The Court has been notified that an interpreter is required in this action for Carlos Ivan Campana. It is counsel's responsibility to timely notify the Court Staff Interpreter when a hearing requiring an interpreter is scheduled, continued or cancelled. Failure to do so may result in sanctions. See [LINK:LR 403 - Court Interpreter Services in Criminal Actions.] The court instructed government counsel under Rule 5(f) to comply with its disclosure obligations under Brady v. Maryland. Government Counsel: Christopher Baker present. Defense Counsel: David Torres present. Pretrial Services Officer: Elizabeth Gutierrez present. Certified Court Interpreter for the Spanish language, Javier Avelar (Oath on file), present. Custody Status: (C)- present. Court Reporter/CD Number: Rachael Lundy. (Hall, S) [5:21-mj-00016-JLT] | |
11 | 11 ORDER (TEXT ONLY) signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/8/2021: According to the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure Rule 5(f), the government is ordered to comply with its discovery obligations as required by federal law, including those duties imposed by Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and all applicable decisions interpreting Brady. This order does not relieve any party of any other discovery obligation. The consequences for violating this order or the government's obligations under Brady may include sanctions, referral to a disciplinary authority, adverse jury instruction, exclusion of evidence, and dismissal of charges, among other consequences. (Hall, S) [5:21-mj-00016-JLT] | |
Friday, April 09, 2021 | ||
7 | 7 NOTICE of ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Reed Brian Grantham appearing for Jesus Adrian Pena-Gamez. Attorney Grantham, Reed Brian added. (Grantham, Reed) [5:21-mj-00017-JLT] | |
8 | 8 ARREST WARRANT RETURNED Executed on 4/7/2021 as to Jesus Adrian Pena-Gamez. (Hall, S) [5:21-mj-00017-JLT] | |
Wednesday, April 14, 2021 | ||
13 | 13 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/14/2021. Attorney David A. Torres appointed as to Carlos Ivan Campana. (Hall, S) [5:21-mj-00016-JLT] | |
14 | 14 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held via video conference before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston: DETENTION HEARING as to Carlos Ivan Campana held on 4/14/2021. Defendant consented to appearance by video conference. Government moved for detention, argued- defendant ORDERED RELEASED on bond with numerous pretrial conditions as set forth on the record, including third-party custody, a bond package of $20,500.00 (secured by $12,000.00 in cash and $8,500.00 secured by the salvaged title of a 2017 Honda Civic owned by defendant). Defendant's release is DELAYED pending posting of the bond. Defendant admonished against violating any condition of release. Defendant waived the 14-day time period for the preliminary examination; for the reasons set forth on the record, the Court finds good cause exists to waive the 14-day time period and the Preliminary Examination set for 4/26/2021 is CONTINUED to 5/4/2021 at 02:30 PM in Bakersfield before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Government Counsel: Christopher Baker present. Defense Counsel: David Torres present. Pretrial Services Officer: Elizabeth Gutierrez present. Certified Court Interpreter for the Spanish language, Juan Carlos Morales (Oath on file), present. Custody Status: (C)- present. Court Reporter: Rachael Lundy. (Hall, S) [5:21-mj-00016-JLT] | |
Thursday, April 15, 2021 | ||
9 | 9 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held via video conference before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston: DETENTION HEARING as to Jesus Adrian Pena-Gamez held on 4/15/2021. Defendant consented to proceeding via video conference. The defense advised that information was belatedly provided to Pretrial Services for consideration/investigation, and requested a continuance of the detention hearing to allow additional time for Pretrial Services to complete their investigation and prepare a report; defendant consented to the detention hearing being set beyond the statutory time requirement. For the reasons set forth on the record, the Court finds good cause exists to continue the detention hearing beyond the statutory time frame. Detention Hearing CONTINUED to 4/19/2021 at 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Government Counsel: Christopher Baker present. Defense Counsel: Reed Grantham present. Pretrial Services Officer: Ryan Beckwith present. Court Certified Interpreter: Javier Avelar, Language: Spanish, present. Custody Status: (C)- present. Court Reporter: Rachael Lundy. (Hall, S) [5:21-mj-00017-JLT] | |
Friday, April 16, 2021 | ||
15 | 15 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for modification of conditions of release. (Torres, David) [5:21-mj-00016-JLT] | |
16 | 16 STIPULATION and ORDER15 to MODIFY the CONDITIONS OF RELEASE, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/16/2021 as to Carlos Ivan Campana. The order for release is modified and the bond package of $20,500.00 shall be secured in full by cash. (Hall, S) [5:21-mj-00016-JLT] | |
Monday, April 19, 2021 | ||
10 | 10 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held via video conference before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston: DETENTION HEARING as to Jesus Adrian Pena-Gamez held on 4/19/2021. Defendant consented to proceeding via video conference. The matter of detention was argued- for the reasons set forth on the record, defendant ORDERED DETAINED. Preliminary Examination remains set for 4/22/2021 at 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Government Counsel: Christopher Baker present. Defense Counsel: Reed Grantham present. Pretrial Services Officer: Ryan Beckwith present. Certified Court Interpreter: Aimee Benavides, Language: Spanish, present. Custody Status: (C)- present. Court Reporter: Karen Hooven. (Hall, S) [5:21-mj-00017-JLT] | |
11 | 11 DETENTION ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/19/2021 as to Jesus Adrian Pena-Gamez. (Hall, S) [5:21-mj-00017-JLT] | |
Wednesday, April 21, 2021 | ||
17 | 17 CASH BOND POSTED as to Carlos Ivan Campana in amount of $ 20,500.00, Receipt # CAE100048144. (Sant Agata, S) [5:21-mj-00016-JLT] | |
18 | 18 ORDER SETTING CONDITIONS of RELEASE, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/21/2021 as to Carlos Ivan Campana. (Hall, S) [5:21-mj-00016-JLT] | |
19 | 19 APPEARANCE AND COMPLIANCE BOND, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/21/2021 as to Carlos Ivan Campana. (Hall, S) [5:21-mj-00016-JLT] | |
Thursday, April 22, 2021 | ||
20 | 20 INDICTMENT as to Carlos Ivan Campana (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3-4, 5, Jesus Adrian Pena-Gamez (2) count(s) 1, 5. (Rivera, O) | |
Att: 1 True Bill | ||
21 | 21 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held via video conference before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston: ARRAIGNMENT AND PLEA re INDICTMENT as to Jesus Adrian Pena-Gamez (2) Counts 1,5 held on 4/22/2021. Defendant consented to appearance via video conference. Defendant advised of rights, charges, maximum penalties; acknowledged receipt of indictment; waived further reading/rights. NOT GUILTY PLEA and DENIAL ENTERED. Discovery/reciprocal discovery requested- SO ORDERED. Status Conference set for 7/14/2021 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. Excludable started as to Jesus Adrian Pena-Gamez: XT Start: 4/22/2021 Stop: 7/14/2021. Time is to be excluded under the Speedy Trial Act in that good cause exists and that the ends of justice outweigh the interest of the public and the defendant in a speedy trial. For the reasons set forth on the record, the continuance requested is granted for good cause and the Court finds the ends of justice outweigh the interest of the public and the defendant in a speedy trial. Government Counsel: Christopher Baker present. Defense Counsel: Reed Grantham present. Custody Status: (C)- present. Court Reporter: Thresha Spencer. Certified Court Interpreter: Anna Watrous, Language: Spanish-Oath on File. (Hall, S) |