Montana District Court
Case #: 2:21-cr-00014
Case Filed:Mar 25, 2021
Last checked: Saturday Apr 24, 2021 1:19 AM MDT
Defendant
Steven Douglas Shipe (1)
Represented By
Matthew Anthony McKeon
Datsopoulos Macdonald & Lind
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Ryan G. Weldon
U.S. Attorney'S Office - Missoula
contact info

GPO Jun 02 2021
FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS on Plea of Guilty as to Steven Douglas Shipe. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto on 6/2/2021. (APP)
GPO Jun 28 2021
ORDER adopting 30 Findings and Recommendations on Plea of Guilty and granting 21 Motion to Change Plea as to Steven Douglas Shipe (1). Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 6/28/2021. (ASG)
GPO Sep 29 2021
JUDGMENT as to Steven Douglas Shipe: Defendant sentenced to the custody of the BOP for a term of 60 months. Supervised release for a term of 5 years. Standard and special conditions imposed. Fine waived. Special assessment of $100. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 9/29/2021. (ASG)

Docket last updated: 04/24/2021 2:12 AM MDT
Thursday, March 25, 2021
1 1 SEALED INDICTMENT as to Steven Douglas Shipe (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3. (NOS)
Related: [-]
2 2 4 pgs Redacted Indictment as to Steven Douglas Shipe. (NOS)
Related: [-]
3 3 Criminal Cover Sheet filed by USA regarding the1 Indictment (Sealed) as to Steven Douglas Shipe. (NOS)
Related: [-]