California Eastern District Court
Judge:Stanley A Boone
Case #: 1:21-cv-00687
Nature of Suit864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI
Cause42:402 Social Security Benefits
Case Filed:Apr 26, 2021
Terminated:Jul 05, 2022
Defendant
Commissioner of Social Security
Defendant
Party Name in Social Security Case - Unavailable
Plaintiff
Khalil Montazh Ames-Craig
Plaintiff
Party Name in Social Security Case - Unavailable

GPO Apr 27 2021
ORDER GRANTING 2 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/27/2021. (Sant Agata, S)
GPO May 12 2021
ORDER STAYING CASE signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/12/2021, Case stayed(Hernandez, M)
GPO Mar 21 2022
ORDER RE STIPULATION EXTENDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/21/2022. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED the deadline to file Plaintiff's opening brief is extended by sixty (60) days. (Gonzales, V)
GPO Jun 01 2022
ORDER REQUIRING PLAINTIFF TO SHOW CAUSE WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE OPENING BRIEF signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/01/2022. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that within three (3) days of entry of this order, Plaintiff shall show cause in writing why she should not be sanctioned for failing to comply with the Court's orders and timely submit an opening brief in this matter. Failure to comply with this order will result in the imposition of sanctions including but not limited to dismissal of this action.(Gonzales, V)
GPO Jun 02 2022
ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE OPENING BRIEF signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/02/2022. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED the June 1, 2022 order to show cause is DISCHARGED. Plaintiff's motion to extend the time to file an opening brief until June 8, 2022 is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall file an opening brief on or before June 8, 2022. (Gonzales, V)
GPO Jul 05 2022
ORDER re: Stipulated for Voluntary Remand Pursuant to 42 U.S.C. 405(g), signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 07/05/2022. CASE CLOSED.(Maldonado, C)
GPO Oct 14 2022
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION FOR AWARD OF ATTORNEYS' FEES AND EXPENSES PURSUANT TO THE EQUAL ACCESS TO JUSTICE ACT (28 U.S.C. § 2412(D)) AND DENYING MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AS MOOT signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/14/2022. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that pursuant to the stipulation of the parties, Plaintiff is awarded attorneys' fees in the amount of $8,500.00 under the EAJA, 28 U.S.C. § 2412(d). (ECF No. 31.) Plaintiff's motion for attorney's fees under the EAJA (ECF No. 30) is DENIED as MOOT. (Gonzales, V)

Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, October 14, 2022
32 32 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Attorney Fees Fri 10/14 10:53 AM
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION FOR AWARD OF ATTORNEYS' FEES AND EXPENSES PURSUANT TO THE EQUAL ACCESS TO JUSTICE ACT (28 U.S.C. § 2412(D)) AND DENYING MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AS MOOT signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/14/2022. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that pursuant to the stipulation of the parties, Plaintiff is awarded attorneys' fees in the amount of $8,500.00 under the EAJA, 28 U.S.C. § 2412(d). (ECF No.31 .) Plaintiff's motion for attorney's fees under the EAJA (ECF No.30 ) is DENIED as MOOT. (Gonzales, V)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 13, 2022
31 31 misc Stipulation and Proposed Order Thu 10/13 3:06 PM
STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for EAJA FEES by Khalil Montazh Ames-Craig. (Pena, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 03, 2022
30 30 motion Attorney Fees Mon 10/03 10:38 PM
MOTION for ATTORNEY FEES by Khalil Montazh Ames-Craig.(Pena, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Declaration
Tuesday, September 06, 2022
29 29 misc Designation of Counsel Tue 09/06 1:39 PM
DESIGNATION of COUNSEL FOR SERVICE. Added attorney Oscar Gonzalez de Llano, GOVT for Commissioner of Social Security, attorney Angela Thornton-Millard, GOVT; Meghan McEvoy and Sarah Preston, GOVT terminated (Gonzalez de Llano, Oscar)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 05, 2022
28 28 order Judgment Tue 07/05 10:50 AM
JUDGMENT dated *07/05/2022* pursuant to order in favor of Khalil Ames-Craig against Commissioner of Social Security. (Maldonado, C)
Related: [-]
27 27 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Order on Social Security Brief Tue 07/05 10:48 AM
ORDER re: Stipulated for Voluntary Remand Pursuant to 42 U.S.C. 405(g), signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 07/05/2022. CASE CLOSED.(Maldonado, C)
Related: [-]
Saturday, July 02, 2022
26 26 misc Stipulation and Proposed Order Sat 07/02 4:26 AM
STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Remand for Further Proceedings Pursuant to Sentence Four of 42 U.S.C. 405(g) by Commissioner of Social Security. Attorney Thornton-Millard, Angela added. (Thornton-Millard, Angela)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 08, 2022
25 25 motion Brief in Social Security Case Wed 06/08 1:13 PM
OPENING BRIEF In Support of Remand filed by Khalil Montazh Ames-Craig. (Trompeter, Dolly)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 02, 2022
24 24 2 pgs order Order Thu 06/02 11:12 AM
ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE OPENING BRIEF signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/02/2022. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED the June 1, 2022 order to show cause is DISCHARGED. Plaintiff's motion to extend the time to file an opening brief until June 8, 2022 is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall file an opening brief on or before June 8, 2022. (Gonzales, V)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 01, 2022
23 23 misc Response to Order to Show Cause Wed 06/01 2:47 PM
RESPONSE to22 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE by Khalil Montazh Ames-Craig. (Trompeter, Dolly)
Related: [-]
22 22 2 pgs order Order to Show Cause ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings Wed 06/01 1:56 PM
ORDER REQUIRING PLAINTIFF TO SHOW CAUSE WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE OPENING BRIEF signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/01/2022. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that within three (3) days of entry of this order , Plaintiff shall show cause in writing why she should not be sanctioned for failing to comply with the Court's orders and timely submit an opening brief in this matter. Failure to comply with this order will result in the imposition of sanctions including but not limited to dismissal of this action.(Gonzales, V)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 21, 2022
21 21 1 pgs order Order Mon 03/21 12:33 PM
ORDER RE STIPULATION EXTENDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/21/2022. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED the deadline to file Plaintiff's opening brief is extended by sixty (60) days. (Gonzales, V)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 18, 2022
20 20 misc Stipulation and Proposed Order Fri 03/18 1:45 PM
STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time by Khalil Montazh Ames-Craig. Attorney Trompeter, Dolly Marlo added.(Trompeter, Dolly)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration
Thursday, February 24, 2022
19 19 misc Stipulation Thu 02/24 9:40 AM
STIPULATION for 30-Day Extension of Time for Plaintiff to file Opening Brief by Khalil Montazh Ames-Craig. (Pena, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 27, 2022
18 18 service Certificate of Service Thu 01/27 1:09 PM
CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Commissioner of Social Security. (Preston, Sarah)
Related: [-]
17 17 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 01/27 12:42 PM
NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Sarah Preston, GOVT on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security. Attorney Preston, Sarah added. (Preston, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 23, 2021
16 16 service Certificate of Service Thu 12/23 4:13 PM
CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Khalil Montazh Ames-Craig. (Pena, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 09, 2021
15 15 misc Designation of Counsel Thu 12/09 3:44 AM
DESIGNATION of COUNSEL FOR SERVICE., attorney Jennifer E Whelan, GOVT terminated (McEvoy, Meghan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 24, 2021
14 14 2 pgs order Order Lifting Stay ~Util - Set/Clear Flags Wed 11/24 11:34 AM
ORDER ADVISING PARTIES OF LIFTING OF STAY OF ACTION signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/24/2021. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall proceed according to the scheduling guidelines contained within the scheduling order issued on April 27, 2021. (ECF No.5 .) (Gonzales, V)
Related: [-]
order Consent Minute Order Wed 11/24 7:27 AM
CONSENT MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) signed by Chief Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 11/24/2021: All parties have consented to the jurisdiction of a United States Magistrate Judge for all further proceedings in this action, including trial and entry of judgment, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(1). Accordingly, this Court AUTHORIZES the action to proceed before the assigned United States Magistrate Judge for all further proceedings including trial and entry of judgment. All further papers filed in this action shall bear the case number 1:21-CV-00687-SAB.(Maldonado, C)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 23, 2021
12 12 notice Notice of Lodging Social Security Administrative Transcript Tue 11/23 10:27 AM
NOTICE OF LODGING SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATIVE TRANSCRIPT IN ELECTRONIC FORMAT by Commissioner of Social Security. Attorney Lodge, Jeffrey James added.(Lodge, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Complete Certified Administrative Record,
Att: 2 Administrative Record in OCR Format
11 11 misc Consent/Decline of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Tue 11/23 5:42 AM
CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Whelan, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 09, 2021
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 11/09 8:36 PM
NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Jennifer E Whelan, GOVT on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security. Attorney Whelan, Jennifer E added. (Whelan, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 12, 2021
9 9 2 pgs order Order Staying Case ~Util - Case Stayed Wed 05/12 1:56 PM
ORDER STAYING CASE signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/12/2021, Case stayed(Hernandez, M)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 11, 2021
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed as to USA Tue 05/11 2:39 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Commissioner of Social Security served on 5/7/2021, answer due 7/6/2021. (Marrujo, C)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 03, 2021
7 7 misc Consent/Decline of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Mon 05/03 9:45 AM
CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Pena, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Submitting Documents to USM Mon 05/03 9:44 AM
NOTICE OF SUBMITTING SERVICE DOCUMENTS to the U.S. Marshal by Khalil Montazh Ames-Craig pursuant to order of the court. (Pena, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 27, 2021
5 5 order Social Security New Case Documents for MJ as Presider Tue 04/27 11:59 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER and ORDER RE CONSENT in SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL. Consent or Decline due by 7/29/2021. (Sant Agata, S)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Order re Consent,
Att: 2 Consent Form,
Att: 3 USM SS Instructions
4 4 service Summons Tue 04/27 11:58 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Commissioner of Social Security* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Jonathan Omar Pena* *2440 Tulare Street* *Suite 320* *Fresno, CA 93721*. (Sant Agata, S)
Related: [-]
3 3 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 04/27 11:58 AM
ORDER GRANTING2 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/27/2021. (Sant Agata, S)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 26, 2021
2 2 motion In Forma Pauperis Mon 04/26 8:47 AM
MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Khalil Montazh Ames-Craig.(Pena, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
1 1 cmp Complaint (Social Security Appeal) Mon 04/26 8:46 AM
SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security by Khalil Montazh Ames-Craig.(Pena, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
misc IFP Application Mon 04/26 9:53 AM
APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Court Action Required. (Sant Agata, S)
Related: [-]