New Jersey District Court
Judge:Matthew J Skahill
Referred: Matthew J Skahill
Case #: 1:21-cv-10276
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Apr 27, 2021
Terminated:Jul 21, 2022
Last checked: Sunday Oct 24, 2021 4:58 AM EDT
Defendant
NEW JERSEY SKYLANDS ASSOCIATION
Represented By
SEAN PATRICK HART
Kent & Mcbride, P.C.
contact info
KEVIN GERARD DRONSON
Kent & Mcbride, PC
contact info
Notice Only
arbtre
Plaintiff
DAVID ZUCKER
Represented By
BRAD S. TABAKIN
Tabakin Wolfe LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
MELISSA ZUCKER
Represented By
BRAD S. TABAKIN
Tabakin Wolfe LLP
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
NATIONAL GENERAL HOLDINGS CORPORATION
Terminated: 09/29/2021
Represented By
SEAN PATRICK HART
Kent & Mcbride, P.C.
contact info
KEVIN GERARD DRONSON
Kent & Mcbride, PC
contact info
Defendant
NEW JERSEY SKYLANDS MANAGEMENT LLC
Terminated: 09/29/2021
Represented By
SEAN PATRICK HART
Kent & Mcbride, P.C.
contact info
KEVIN GERARD DRONSON
Kent & Mcbride, PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/04/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, August 19, 2022
28 28 misc Stipulation of Dismissal (aty) Fri 08/19 12:23 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by NATIONAL GENERAL HOLDINGS CORPORATION, NEW JERSEY SKYLANDS ASSOCIATION, NEW JERSEY SKYLANDS MANAGEMENT LLC. (HART, SEAN)
Related: [-]
27 27 misc Letter Fri 08/19 12:19 PM
Letter from Plaintiffs. (TABAKIN, BRAD)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 21, 2022
26 26 1 pgs order Order 60-Day Administrative Termination Thu 07/21 4:35 PM
Order Administratively Terminating Action - 60 Day, Pending Consummation of Settlement. Administrative Termination deadline set for 9/19/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Skahill on 7/21/2022. (dmr)
Related: [-]
adr Report of Arbitration Thu 07/21 9:01 AM
REPORT of Settlement filed by Arbitrator.(jjq, )
Related: [-]
Friday, July 01, 2022
24 24 1 pgs order Order Appointing Arbitrator Fri 07/01 2:22 PM
Order Appointing Arbitrator, BARRY J. WENDT, ESQ. Arbitration Hearing set for 8/1/2022 at 10:00 AM via Zoom. Signed by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 7/1/2022. (jjq, )
Related: [-]
order Order Fri 07/01 3:32 PM
Text Order: Having conferenced with counsel, all discovery ordered to date is now complete, and this matter remains referred to arbitration for July 2022. There will be a status conference in this matter on September 19, 2022 at 10:00 a.m. The call-in number is 888-808-6929, access code 2170922#. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Skahill on 7/1/22. (Shaw, A)
Related: [-]
minutes Status Conference Tue 07/05 8:44 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Skahill: Telephone Status Conference held on 7/1/2022. (rss, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 24, 2022
order Order Thu 03/24 1:28 PM
Text Order: Having convened a settlement conference in this matter, and the parties having made progress in resolving this case but the matter having not settled, and for good cause shown, it is ORDERED: (1) Any remaining expert disclosures including a chiropractic IME and associated report and any additional disclosures and reports on behalf of plaintiff should all be complete by May 31, 2022, (2) Any rebuttal reports are due by June 30, 2022, and (3) The Clerk of the Court shall refer this matter to Arbitration in July 2022. The Court shall hold a conference call with counsel on July 1, 2022 at 10:00 a.m. to address any outstanding issues. The call-in number is 888-808-6929, access code 2170922#. Counsel may reach out if a conference is needed prior that date and it will be scheduled. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Skahill on 3/24/22. (Shaw, A)
Related: [-]
minutes Settlement Conference Thu 03/24 3:42 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Skahill: Settlement Conference held by Zoom on 3/24/2022. (rss, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 10, 2022
order Order Thu 02/10 10:55 AM
TEXT ORDER: Due to a scheduling conflict, the time of the settlement conference scheduled for March 24, 2022 is hereby moved to 10:00 a.m. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Skahill on 2/10/22. (Shaw, A)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 21, 2022
order Order Fri 01/21 12:38 PM
Text Order: At the request of counsel, the Settlement Conference is adjourned until March 24, 2022 at 2;00 p.m. and will be held via ZOOM. A link will be circulated to counsel closer to the conference. At least three (3) business days before the settlement conference the parties shall serve the Court with a confidential settlement memorandum not to exceed five (5) pages, or if already served, then any pertinent updated information including the current demand and offer. The materials should be submitted to njdnef_skahill@njd.uscourts.gov. The October 29, 2021 Amended Scheduling Order (Doc. No. 19) remains in effect, as the Court has not received any request for additional time in that regard. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Skahill on 1/21/22. (Shaw, A)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 06, 2021
order Order Mon 12/06 12:20 PM
TEXT ORDER: The Settlement Conference currently scheduled for December 9, 2021 is hereby rescheduled to January 19, 2022 at 2:00 p.m. via ZOOM. A link will be circulated to counsel closer to the conference. At least three (3) days before the settlement conference the parties shall serve the Court with a confidential settlement memorandum not to exceed five (5) pages. The parties may attach copies of relevant documents for the Court to review. The memoranda should be submitted no later than January 14, 2022 by email to njdnef_skahill@njd.uscourts.gov. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Skahill on 12/6/21. (Shaw, A)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 29, 2021
19 19 order Scheduling Order Fri 10/29 4:07 PM
AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Settlement Conference set vi Zoom, for 12/9/2021 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Skahill. Pretrial Factual Discovery due by 1/3/2022, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Skahill on 10/29/2021. (rtm, )
Related: [-]
minutes Status Conference Fri 10/29 2:18 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Skahill: Telephone Status Conference held on 10/29/2021. (rss, )
Related: [-]
Friday, October 08, 2021
18 18 misc Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Fri 10/08 4:40 PM
CONSENT ORDER to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by NEW JERSEY SKYLANDS ASSOCIATION, DAVID ZUCKER, MELISSA ZUCKER Signed by Judge Bumb on 10/8/21. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Skahill. (dd, )
Related: [-]
17 17 misc Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge SSA Fri 10/08 11:43 AM
CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by NEW JERSEY SKYLANDS ASSOCIATION.. (HART, SEAN)
Related: [-]
qc QC - Incorrect Event Selected Fri 10/08 11:40 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge, filed by Sean Hart on 10/7/2021 was submitted incorrectly as a Notice. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge USING "Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge". This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (rtm, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 07, 2021
16 16 notice Notice (Other) Thu 10/07 3:32 PM
NOTICE by NEW JERSEY SKYLANDS ASSOCIATION (Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge) (HART, SEAN)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 29, 2021
15 15 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (aty) Wed 09/29 10:54 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by NATIONAL GENERAL HOLDINGS CORPORATION, NEW JERSEY SKYLANDS MANAGEMENT LLC (HART, SEAN)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Notice (Other) Wed 09/29 10:53 AM
NOTICE by NATIONAL GENERAL HOLDINGS CORPORATION, NEW JERSEY SKYLANDS MANAGEMENT LLC re12 Notice (Other) (HART, SEAN)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 30, 2021
13 13 order Scheduling Order Mon 08/02 12:02 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER IN ARBITRATION CASE: Telephone Status Conference set for 10/29/2021 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Skahill. Amended Pleadings due by 10/1/2021. Pretrial Factual Discovery due by 11/1/2021. By copy of this Order, the Clerk will be requested to schedule the arbitration for a date in February 2022, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Skahill on 7/30/2021. (rss, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 28, 2021
12 12 notice Notice (Other) Wed 07/28 11:58 AM
NOTICE by DAVID ZUCKER, MELISSA ZUCKER MAGISTRATE JUDGE (TABAKIN, BRAD)
Related: [-]
minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Fri 07/30 2:53 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Skahill: Initial Conference by phone held on 7/28/2021. (se, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 22, 2021
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 07/22 10:49 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by SEAN PATRICK HART on behalf of All Defendants (HART, SEAN)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 20, 2021
10 10 discov Joint Discovery Plan Tue 07/20 3:54 PM
Joint Discovery Plan by DAVID ZUCKER, MELISSA ZUCKER.(TABAKIN, BRAD)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 09, 2021
9 9 order Order Fri 07/09 10:43 AM
TEXT ORDER: The initial conference scheduled for July 28, 2021 at 10:30 a.m. will take place via telephone. The call-in number is 888-808-6929, access code 2170922#. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Skahill on 7/9/21. (Shaw, A)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 07, 2021
8 8 misc Statement Wed 07/07 2:18 PM
STATEMENT Pursuant to R. 7.1.1 by DAVID ZUCKER, MELISSA ZUCKER. (TABAKIN, BRAD)
Related: [-]
7 7 6 pgs order Order Initial Scheduling Conference (Camden) Wed 07/07 9:28 AM
Order Initial Conference set for 7/28/2021 10:30 AM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Skahill.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Skahill on 7/7/2021. (rtm, )
Related: [-]
Friday, July 02, 2021
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 07/02 1:19 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by NATIONAL GENERAL HOLDINGS CORPORATION, NEW JERSEY SKYLANDS MANAGEMENT LLC.(DRONSON, KEVIN)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 29, 2021
5 5 order Order Tue 06/29 2:44 PM
TEXT ORDER: Pursuant to L. CIV. R. 7.1.1 (eff. June 21, 2021), the parties, including intervening parties, are required to file a statement (separate from any pleading) containing specific information regarding third-party litigation funding. See L. Civ. R. 7.1.1(a)(1-3). This statement shall be filed within 45 days of the effective date of this Rule, or no later than August 5, 2021. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Skahill on 6/29/2021. (se, )
Related: [-]
Friday, June 18, 2021
4 4 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 06/18 2:59 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by MELISSA ZUCKER, DAVID ZUCKER. NEW JERSEY SKYLANDS MANAGEMENT LLC waiver sent on 5/3/2021, answer due 7/2/2021. (TABAKIN, BRAD)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 06/18 2:58 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by MELISSA ZUCKER, DAVID ZUCKER. NATIONAL GENERAL HOLDINGS CORPORATION waiver sent on 5/3/2021, answer due 7/2/2021. (TABAKIN, BRAD)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 27, 2021
2 2 service Summons Issued Tue 04/27 4:40 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to NATIONAL GENERAL HOLDINGS CORPORATION, NEW JERSEY SKYLANDS MANAGEMENT LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (alb, )
Related: [-]
1 1 8 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 04/27 2:55 PM
COMPLAINT against NATIONAL GENERAL HOLDINGS CORPORATION, NEW JERSEY SKYLANDS MANAGEMENT LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12413793) with JURY DEMAND, filed by MELISSA ZUCKER, DAVID ZUCKER.(TABAKIN, BRAD)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Coversheet
utility Add and Terminate Judges Tue 04/27 4:19 PM
Judge Renee Marie Bumb and Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Skahill added. (dd, )
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Judicial Preferences Tue 04/27 4:40 PM
Notice of Judicial Preferences RMB.[LINK:Click here] for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (alb, )
Related: [-]
utility Case Referred to Arbitration Tue 04/27 4:45 PM
CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (alb, )
Related: [-]