Alabama Northern District Court
Judge:Anna M Manasco
Case #: 2:21-cv-00594
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Apr 27, 2021
Terminated:Sep 19, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Oct 24, 2021 4:10 AM CDT
Defendant
Christopher Godber
Represented By
Bruce L Gordon
Gordon Dana Gilmore LLC
contact info
John G Dana
Gordon Dana Gilmore & Maner LLC
contact info
Jonathan David Gilbert
Gordon, Dana & Gilmore, LLC
contact info
James A Stewart
Gordon, Dana, Knight & Gilmore LLC
contact info
Defendant
Deputy Ashanti McKinney
Represented By
Bruce L Gordon
Gordon Dana Gilmore LLC
contact info
John G Dana
Gordon Dana Gilmore & Maner LLC
contact info
Jonathan David Gilbert
Gordon, Dana & Gilmore, LLC
contact info
James A Stewart
Gordon, Dana, Knight & Gilmore LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Giovanni Loyola
Represented By
Jon C Goldfarb
Wiggins Childs Pantazis Fisher & Goldfarb
contact info
Lieselotte Carmen-Burks
Wiggins, Childs, Pantazis, Fisher & Goldfarb, LLC
contact info
Christina Maxine Malmat
Wiggins Childs Pantazis Fisher Goldbarb
contact info
L William Smith
Wiggins Childs Pantazis Fisher & Goldfarb
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Godber
Terminated: 09/17/2021
Represented By
Bruce L Gordon
Gordon Dana Gilmore LLC
contact info
John G Dana
Gordon Dana Gilmore & Maner LLC
contact info
Jonathan David Gilbert
Gordon, Dana & Gilmore, LLC
contact info
James A Stewart
Gordon, Dana, Knight & Gilmore LLC
contact info
Defendant
Jeremy Godber
Terminated: 10/01/2021

GPO Mar 13 2023
MEMORANDUM OPINION ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMMARY JUDGMENT - For the foregoing reasons, the motion for summary judgment 47 is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART as set out herein. Signed by Judge Anna M Manasco on 03/13/2023. (AKD)

Docket last updated: 04/02/2025 12:31 AM CDT
Tuesday, April 27, 2021
1 1 COMPLAINT against Godber, filed by Giovanni Loyola.(KEK)
Related: [-]