Trustees Of The New York City v. Abalene Decorating, Inc.
Original Case: 1:20-cv-02559
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:21-cv-01037 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 26, 2021 |
Terminated: | May 09, 2022 |
Last checked: Tuesday May 10, 2022 4:32 AM EDT |
Defendant
Abalene Decorating, Inc.
|
|
Defendant - Appellant
City View Blinds of N.Y., Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Trustees Of The New York City, District Council Of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Trustees Of The New York City, Carpenters Relief and Charity Fund
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
The Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/10/2022 4:27 AM EDT |
Monday, April 26, 2021 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant City View Blinds of N.Y., Inc., FILED. [3087134] 21-1037 [Entered: 04/27/2021 03:42 AM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 11 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 15 pgs DISTRICT COURT OPINION AND ORDER, dated 04/13/2021, RECEIVED.[3087135] 21-1037 [Entered: 04/27/2021 03:45 AM] | |
3 | 3 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant City View Blinds of N.Y., Inc., district court receipt # ANYSDC-24451334, FILED.[3087136] 21-1037 [Entered: 04/27/2021 03:46 AM] | |
4 | 4 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3087137] 21-1037 [Entered: 04/27/2021 03:48 AM] | |
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed | ||
Att: 2 11 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED |