Arkansas Western District Court
Judge:Susan O Hickey
Referred: Barry A Bryant
Case #: 6:21-cv-06062
Nature of Suit555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Apr 28, 2021
Terminated:Aug 10, 2021

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 27 minutes ago
Tuesday, August 10, 2021
7 7 1 pgs order Order Adopting Report and Recommendations Tue 08/10 11:57 AM
ORDER ADOPTING in toto4 Report and Recommendations. Accordingly, this case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on August 10, 2021. (mjm)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 02, 2021
6 6 notice Notice of Change of Address Mon 08/02 12:02 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address for David Boring. There are no documents to resend. (jlm)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 09, 2021
5 5 notice Notice of Change of Address Fri 07/09 10:04 AM
NOTICE of Change of Address for David Boring.. There are no documents to resend. (mjm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 17, 2021
4 4 motion Report and Recommendations Thu 06/17 4:06 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re1 Complaint Referred (42:1983), filed by David Boring. Objections to R&R due by 7/6/2021. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on June 17, 2021. (cnn)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 28, 2021
3 3 notice Magistrate Notice/Consent Form Wed 04/28 1:05 PM
Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (jlm)
Related: [-]
2 2 3 pgs order Order - PC Complaint 42:1983 - Initial ~Util - Set Deadlines Wed 04/28 1:04 PM
ORDER directing the Clerk to provisionally file this matter as the undersigned finds that additional information is needed. The Plaintiff is directed to submit a completed in forma pauperis application or pay the $350.00 filing fee by 05/27/2021. Plaintiff is directed to submit an amended complaint on the court-approved form by 05/27/2021. Failure to comply within the time period specified could result in summary dismissal for failure to obey a court order. If Plaintiff is transferred to another jail or prison or released, he shall have 30 days from the date of transfer or release in which to notify the Court of his new address . Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on April 28, 2021.(jlm)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Referred (42:1983) Wed 04/28 1:02 PM
COMPLAINT REFERRED (42:1983) against William Barr, Tim Beckham, Jeff Bezos, Trent Daniels, Richard Davis, John Doe 1, John Doe DEA Director, John Doe Director of CDC, John Doe Director of CIA, John Doe Director of FBI, Betty Doe II, Elrod, Hernsberger, Asa Hutchinson, B. Johnson, Joe Jones, Jack Ma, Mike McCormick, Ohms, Leslie Rutledge, Stapleton, Donald Trump, United States Congress, United States Senate, Homer Wright, filed by David Boring.(jlm)
Related: [-]