Rose v. Monsanto Company, et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 3:16-md-02741
Lead case: 3:16-md-02741
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Vince Chhabria |
Case #: | 3:21-cv-03167 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Apr 29, 2021 |
Case in other court: | New Mexico, 1:21-cv-00340 |
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 27, 2021 2:52 AM PDT |
Defendant
Monsanto Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Katrina Rose
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Tuesday, January 30, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
![]() NOTICE by Katrina Rose Plaintiff's Notice of Service Expert Disclosure (Dominguez, Paul) |
|
Friday, June 16, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Order Granting Motions to Move Cases to Later Waves. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 6/16/2023. Re Dkt. 16759, 16772-73, 16793-96, 16801-02, 16804-11, 16813, 16817-19, 16824, 16827-28, 16830, 16847. (crblc4, COURT STAFF) |
|
Monday, June 12, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
![]() MOTION Unopposed Motion to Move Case to Wave VII filed by Katrina Rose. Responses due by 6/26/2023. Replies due by 7/3/2023.(Dominguez, Paul) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Thursday, April 29, 2021 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Case transferred in from District of New Mexico; Case Number 1:21-cv-00340. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
utility
MDL Member Case
Thu 04/29 10:27 AM
MEMBER CASE OPENED MDL 2741: District of New Mexico, 1:21-cv-00340-KK-LF, Rose v. Monsanto Company, Opened in California Northern District as 3:21-cv-03167-VC pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 266 cc: JPMDL (wsnS, COURT STAFF) |
||
Monday, April 26, 2021 | ||
5 | 5
![]() |
|
Thursday, April 15, 2021 | ||
4 | 4
![]() |
|
Wednesday, April 14, 2021 | ||
3 | 3 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg) | |
2 | 2
![]() |
|
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-7641481 re1 Notice of Removal, filed by Monsanto Company (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Walker, Alex) | ||
United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa and United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing assigned. (jg) |